Smith v. Greater New Haven Transit District et al

Plaintiff: Maurice W. Smith
Defendant: Greater New Haven Transit District, Donna K. Carter, Al Naudus and Tyleim Salters
Case Number: 3:2013cv00502
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Chatigny
Referring Judge: Donna F. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: the parties Rule 26(f) report. See attached. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 11/14/13.(Constantine, A.)
February 26, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The defendants' "motion to strike references to Brandon E. Foster as a defendant" 31 is granted. See attached order and ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 2/26/14. (Constantine, A.)
September 29, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/29/2014. (Saner, K)
May 19, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF OPINION re: 86 Oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/19/15. (Reardon, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Greater New Haven Transit District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater New Haven Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna K. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Naudus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyleim Salters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.