Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al v. Intel Corporation et al

 
Case Number: 1:2005cv00441
Filed: June 27, 2005
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2009 1179 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Regarding Length and Scope of Intel's Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) Notice of Deposition Concerning AMD's Evidence Preservation Objections to R&R due by 2/4/2009. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 1/22/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) Modified on 1/26/2009 (nms).
February 3, 2009 1207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1291 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1507 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1179 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/3/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
February 19, 2009 1268 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Regarding Motion of AMD and Class Plaintiffs to Compel Further Discovery from Non-Party Toshiba Corporation Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2009. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 2/19/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
April 9, 2009 1339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1597 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1364 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1268 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/9/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
June 22, 2009 1581 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re DM-4 di.3 on the Motion of Defendants Intel Corporation and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha to Compel further testimony. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 6/22/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms) Modified on 6/23/2009 (nms).
June 25, 2009 1591 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING (1785 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1442 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1529 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) MOTION Pursuant To Rules 16 And 56, For A Pretrial Conference To Seek The Court's Determination Of Key Issues Of Law That Will Govern Completion Of Preparation And Trial filed by Intel Kabushiki Kaisha, Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/25/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
July 7, 2009 1620 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1581 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1933 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re DM-4 di.3 on the Motion of Defendants Intel Corporation and Intel Kabushiki Kaisha to Compel further testimony. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/7/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF(nms)
August 5, 2009 1669 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Modifying the July 31, 2009 Report and Recommendation On AMD'S Motion To Compel (DM35)(see original Report and Recommendation found at: #2038 in 05-md-1717-JJF, #1662 in 05-cv-441-JJF, and #1684 in 05-cv-485-JJF). Signed by Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/5/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 10, 2009 1675 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND Partial Amending REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Special Master Modifying the July 31, 2009 Report and Recommendation on AMD's Motion To Compel (DM 35). Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/10/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
August 18, 2009 1683 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony of AMD's Rule 30(B)(6) Witness On Certain Issues Raised By Plaintiffs' Pending Motion For Class Certification. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) (nms).
August 28, 2009 1694 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master (DM 36) re Intel's Motion To Compel, and their Request For Production Of A Privilege Log. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/28/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) (nms).
September 8, 2009 1708 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1699 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 1683 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, and 2061 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF) Report and Recommendations - Special Master,. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 8, 2009 1709 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (1662, 1669, 1675 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 2038, 2045, 2051 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, and 1684, 1691, 1694 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Report and Recommendations - Special Master. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 9/8/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
October 3, 2009 1772 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING (1714 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF, 2079 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1694 in 1:05-cv-00441-JJF) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Special Master. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 10/3/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al v. Intel Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]