Paul v. Intel Corporation - Consolidated Action

 
Case Number: 1:2005cv00485
Filed: July 12, 2005
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2009 1699 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Regarding Class Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony of AMD's Rule 30(B)(6) Witness On Certain Issues Raised By Plaintiffs' Pending Motion For Class Certification. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/18/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) (nms).
August 28, 2009 1714 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master (DM 36) re Intel's Motion To Compel, and their Request For Production Of A Privilege Log. Signed by Special Master Vincent J. Poppiti on 8/28/2009. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00441-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms) (nms).
July 13, 2010 2069 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING (2382 in 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1984 in 1:05-cv-00485-JJF) Report and Recommendations of the Special Master (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/13/2010. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-JJF, 1:05-cv-00485-JJF(nms)
September 28, 2012 2115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report no later than 10/15/12; the following motions are terminated: Amended Motion to Modify Protective Order and Approve Protocol for Unsealing Documents 1520 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions 2291 ; and Intel's Motion to Strike Declaration of Shaun M. Simmons 2354 . Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/28/12. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS, 1:05-cv-00485-LPS(ntl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Paul v. Intel Corporation - Consolidated Action
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]