Chase Bank USA N.A. v. Hess Kennedy Chartered LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chase Bank USA N.A.
Defendant: Hess Kennedy Chartered LLC, Laura L. Hess, Edward T. Kennedy, Laura Hess & Associates P.A., Hess Kennedy Holdings Ltd., Hess Kennedy Company Chartered BWI, Consumer Law Center LLC, Consumer Law Center of Delray Beach LLC, Consumer Law Center of Boca Raton Inc., Campos Chartered Law Firm, Jeff Campos, Jeffrey S. Campos, Legal Debt Center LLC and John Does 1-50
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00121
Filed: February 29, 2008
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2010 114 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING 96 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Leave Of Court To Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery And For Extension Of Time, GRANTING 87 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery and For An Extension Of Time, and DENYING with Leave To Renew 84 MOTION to Dismiss (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/29/2010. (nms)
January 6, 2011 131 Featured Case OPINION re 100 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(7) or, alternatively, Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) - filed by Home Plate Consultants, LLC, Self Made, LLC, Eric Siversen; re 105 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorp orated Memorandum of Law for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Res Judicata and Improper Venue - filed by Laura L. Hess; re 84 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Res Judicata and Improper Venue - filed by Edward Cherry; and re 128 MOTION for Sanctions with Memorandum of Law - filed by Edward Cherry. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/6/2011. (rpg)
September 26, 2011 175 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 136 MOTION to Stay and certify interlocutory appeal filed by Edward Cherry. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/26/11. (ntl)
April 17, 2012 189 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 144 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, with Text of Proposed Order and Memorandum of Law filed by Chase Bank USA N.A. Please note that when filing Objections pu rsuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2012. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/17/2012. (cak)
May 23, 2012 201 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- granting 144 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 189 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/23/12. (ntl)
November 8, 2012 223 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 221 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief filed by Laura L. Hess is GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/8/2012. (cak)
March 7, 2013 226 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 204 DENIED AS MOOT - MOTION to Strike 196 Answer to Amended Complaint of Defendant Laura L. Hess with Certificate of Service filed by Chase Bank USA N.A., 213 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ( see order ) - MOTION for Summary Judgment against Defendant Laura L. Hess, with Opening Brief, Text of Proposed Order and Certificate of Service filed by Chase Bank USA N.A.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2013. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/7/13. (kjk)
September 20, 2013 231 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER: denying 204 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 213 Motion for Summary Judgment ; Hess' objections 227 are OVERRULED; Chase's objections 228 are GRANTED re 226 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/20/13. (ntl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chase Bank USA N.A. v. Hess Kennedy Chartered LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Bank USA N.A.
Represented By: Beth Moskow-Schnoll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Kennedy Chartered LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura L. Hess
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward T. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Hess & Associates P.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Kennedy Holdings Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Kennedy Company Chartered BWI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Law Center LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Law Center of Delray Beach LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Law Center of Boca Raton Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campos Chartered Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Campos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Campos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Debt Center LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]