Market America Inc. v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Market America Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc. and LTech Consulting LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00494
Filed: July 7, 2009
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 9/22/2010. (mmm)
August 13, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Count IV of the Amended Complaint to September 22, 2010 filed by Google Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/13/10. (mmm)
August 12, 2010 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Count IV of the Amended Complaint to September 22, 2010 - filed by Google Inc.. (Levine, James Harry)
August 9, 2010 35 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [TO DISMISS COUNTS I, II AND III OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed by LTech Consulting LLC, 26 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/9/10. (mmm)
July 23, 2010 34 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Google Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney James Harry Stone Levine. Attorney Maria L. Panichelli terminated. (mmm)
January 4, 2010 33 NOTICE of Substitution of Lead Counsel by Market America Inc. Matthew Linter withdrawing and Richard Herrmann substituting as lead counsel (Herrmann, Richard)
November 12, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document D.I. 31 REPLY BRIEF has been replaced with its corrected version. (asw)
November 12, 2009 32 JOINDER by LTech Consulting LLC, joining in 31 Reply Brief, 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
November 12, 2009 31 REPLY BRIEF re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Panichelli, Maria)
November 2, 2009 30 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [TO DISMISS COUNTS I, II AND III OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT], 26 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint (Combined Opposition Brief) filed by Market America Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/12/2009. (Herrmann, Richard)
October 19, 2009 29 JOINDER by LTech Consulting LLC, joining in 27 Opening Brief in Support, 26 Motion to Dismiss COUNTS I, II AND III OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Bonkowski, Michael)
October 19, 2009 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [TO DISMISS COUNTS I, II AND III OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT] - filed by LTech Consulting LLC. (Bonkowski, Michael)
October 19, 2009 27 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Panichelli, Maria)
October 19, 2009 26 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint - filed by Google Inc.. (Panichelli, Maria)
October 15, 2009 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Google Inc.. (Panichelli, Maria)
October 15, 2009 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by LTech Consulting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
September 30, 2009 23 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Combined Opposition) filed by Market America Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/13/2009. (Herrmann, Richard)
September 30, 2009 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc., LTech Consulting LLC- filed by Market America Inc..(Herrmann, Richard)
August 31, 2009 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document in D.I. 17 Motion to Dismiss and D.I. 18 Opening Brief has been replaced with its corrected version. (asw)
August 31, 2009 21 DECLARATION re 20 Opening Brief in Support, by LTech Consulting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through C, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
August 31, 2009 20 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by LTech Consulting LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
August 31, 2009 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted - filed by LTech Consulting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
August 31, 2009 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Panichelli, Maria) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2009: # 2 Main Document) (asw).
August 31, 2009 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Google Inc.. (Panichelli, Maria) (asw).
August 27, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Frazza, Esquire filed by LTech Consulting LLC, 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donald P. Jacobs, Esquire filed by LTech Consulting LLC, 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allen L. Harris, Esquire filed by LTech Consulting LLC. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/27/2009. (asw)
August 27, 2009 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allen L. Harris, Esquire - filed by LTech Consulting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Counsel to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
August 27, 2009 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donald P. Jacobs, Esquire - filed by LTech Consulting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Counsel to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
August 27, 2009 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Frazza, Esquire - filed by LTech Consulting LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Counsel to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
August 26, 2009 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by LTech Consulting LLC identifying Corporate Parent Matlen Silver Group, Inc. for LTech Consulting LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
August 26, 2009 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Bonkowski on behalf of LTech Consulting LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bonkowski, Michael)
August 13, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy B. Ginensky filed by Google Inc., 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Toy Ohta filed by Google Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/13/09. (mmm)
August 13, 2009 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 8/31/2009; LTech Consulting LLC answer due 8/31/2009. (mmm)
August 13, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to August 31, 2009 filed by Google Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/13/09. (mmm)
August 12, 2009 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy B. Ginensky - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Panichelli, Maria)
August 12, 2009 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrea Toy Ohta - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Panichelli, Maria)
August 12, 2009 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to August 31, 2009 - filed by Google Inc.. (Panichelli, Maria)
August 12, 2009 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc.. (Panichelli, Maria)
August 12, 2009 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria L. Panichelli on behalf of Google Inc. (Panichelli, Maria)
August 12, 2009 6 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Duncan Grant on behalf of Google Inc. (Grant, M.)
July 24, 2009 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Market America Inc.. Google Inc. served on 7/8/2009, answer due 7/28/2009. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 24, 2009 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on LTech Consulting, LLC on July 13, 2009, filed by Market America Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
July 15, 2009 Case assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 8, 2009 Summons Issued as to Google Inc. on 7/8/2009; LTech Consulting LLC on 7/8/2009. (fms)
July 7, 2009 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Market America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Market America Worldwide Inc. for Market America Inc. (fms)
July 7, 2009 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (fms)
July 7, 2009 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc., LTech Consulting LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 03110000000000605892.) - filed by Market America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(fms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Market America Inc. v. Google Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Market America Inc.
Represented By: Matthew F. Lintner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTech Consulting LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]