Church-El v. Bank of New York

Plaintiff: Khyon Ernest Church-El
Defendant: Bank of New York
Case Number: 1:2011cv00877
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION re 23 Order. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/21/2013. (bkb) Modified on 3/21/2013 (bkb).
December 31, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/31/13. (rwc)
February 19, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion [Doc. No. 50] to dismiss, insofar as such motion was filed by Defendant Bank of New York, is hereby DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion [Doc. No. 50] to dismiss, insofar as su ch motion was filed by non-parties Bank of America, EquiCorp and Select, is hereby DISMISSED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion [Doc. No. 54] for summary judgment, which is contained within his opposition papers, is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/18/15. [Copy of Opinion and Order mailed this date to plaintiff at the address noted on the Opinion and Order] (bkb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church-El v. Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khyon Ernest Church-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.