US Bank National Association et al v. Gunn

Defendant: La Mar Gunn
Counter_claimant: La Mar Gunn
Counter_defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. and US Bank National Association
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01155
Filed: November 21, 2011
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 107 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 91 MOTION for Reconsideration re 84 Order, and 105 MOTION for Reconsideration re 103 Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/1/2012. (nms)
September 10, 2012 118 Featured Case MEMORANDUM re 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued by Defendant After the Discovery Cut Off, 89 MOTION for Mandatory Judicial Notice and Request for an Evidentiary Hearing, and 111 SECOND MOTION for Reconsideration re 103 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2012. (nms)
December 10, 2012 137 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/10/2012. (ksr, )
December 10, 2012 140 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/10/2012. (ksr, )
April 8, 2013 152 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 124 MOTION to Interplead or in the Alternative Dismiss Action Under Rules 12(B)(7) and 19(A) and (B) for Failure to Join Parties, 128 MOTION to Strike Answer For Lack of Capacity, 143 MOTION for Reconsideration, and 144 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Explanation of the Court's Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2013. (nms)
April 8, 2013 154 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER that within 30 days from the date of this Order, Defendant shall remit payment in the sum of $2,682.00 directly to Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC, the law firm that represents Plaintiffs (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2013. (nms)
March 4, 2014 174 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 150 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, 159 Motion to Dismiss, 164 and 171 Motions to Strike, 165 Motion to Disqualify, and 166 Motion for an Independent Inquiry and Rule to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2014. (nms)
March 25, 2014 180 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 159 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/25/2014. (nms)
March 16, 2012 38 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and 34 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/16/2012. (nms)
March 26, 2012 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting with prejudice re 10 MOTION to Dismiss as it relates to the Ninth Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2012. (nms)
May 17, 2012 62 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 41 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer with Counterclaims and to add parties, 45 MOTION for Reconsideration, and 48 MOTION to Dismiss or to Transfer. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/17/2012. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: US Bank National Association et al v. Gunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Mar Gunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: La Mar Gunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Represented By: Jill Kornhauser Agro
Represented By: Francis G.X. Pileggi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Jill Kornhauser Agro
Represented By: Francis G.X. Pileggi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Francis G.X. Pileggi
Represented By: Jill Kornhauser Agro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Represented By: Francis G.X. Pileggi
Represented By: Jill Kornhauser Agro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]