Pacilli et al v. Carrier IQ Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Motorola Mobility Inc., HTC Corp., T-Mobile USA Inc., Carrier IQ Inc., AT & T Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, HTC America Inc., Apple Inc. and Samsung Electronics America Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Pacilli, Saima Mian, Amandeep Singh and Marilyn Robledo
Case Number: 1:2011cv01199
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2012 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of 13 Exhibit to a Document by R.C. Santos on 5/2/2012, USDC/ND/CA. (fms)
April 30, 2012 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT that case transferred from Delaware has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:12-cv-02137. (dab)
April 25, 2012 23 Letter to Rufino Santos, Deputy Clerk, from Francesca Scarpato, Deputy Clerk dated 4/25/2012, enclosing paper document (D.I. 13). (fms)
April 24, 2012 Case transferred electronically to District of USDC/ND/CA, San Francisco Division. (fms)
April 23, 2012 22 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER re MDL No. 2330 (fms) Modified on 4/24/2012 (fms).
April 23, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 20 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Apple Inc., Apple Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/23/2012. (fms)
April 19, 2012 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal [STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT APPLE INC.] by Apple Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
April 16, 2012 21 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER to MDL No. 2330 (Awaiting a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district). (fms)
March 16, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/16/2012. (nmf)
February 22, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 9, 2012 Case Stayed per DI 15 (cak)
January 9, 2012 18 Featured Case SO ORDERED re 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending JPML filed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Marilyn Robledo, Jeffrey Pacilli. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/9/2012. (cak)
January 3, 2012 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Horwitz on behalf of Apple Inc. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 30, 2011 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Stipulated Request for Stay Pending JPML by Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo, Amandeep Singh re 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending JPML (Straite, David)
December 30, 2011 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending JPML - filed by Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo, Amandeep Singh. (Straite, David)
December 15, 2011 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Carrier IQ Inc., HTC America Inc., Motorola Mobility Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corp.- filed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo.(Straite, David)
December 14, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Please include the initials of the Judge (MPT) after the case number on all documents filed. This case has been randomly selected for direct assignment to a Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to the case proceeding before a Magistrate Judge, they should submit Form AO 85 (Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge), signed by all parties or their attorneys, within sixty (60) days; that is, on or before 2/13/2012. All parties have a right to proceed before a District Judge. Accordingly, this case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge upon the earlier of: (a) the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., motion to dismiss, motion for judgment on the pleadings, or motion for summary judgment) or (b) the expiration of sixty (60) days without the filing of a signed copy of Form AO 85. No request to extend the sixty day period shall be filed. More information on the Court`s Pilot Program on direct assignment of cases to Magistrate Judges is available in the Court`s Standing Order, dated November 3, 2011, available on the Court`s website. (rjb)
December 13, 2011 13 Paper Copy of Supporting Documentation to DI 12 re: COPY of Subsequent Motion of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Pacilli, Saima Mian, Amandeep Singh, and Marilyn Robledo for Consolidation and Transfer of related action to the District Court for the District of Delaware - filed before the MDL Panel in MDL Docket No: 2330 (rbe)
December 13, 2011 12 COPY of Subsequent Motion of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Pacilli, Saima Mian, Amandeep Singh, and Marilyn Robledo for Consolidation and Transfer of related action to the District Court for the District of Delaware - filed before the MDL Panel in MDL Docket No: 2330 (rbe)
December 7, 2011 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. Samsung Electronics America Inc. served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Straite, David)
December 7, 2011 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. Sprint Nextel Corporation served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Straite, David)
December 7, 2011 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. Apple Inc. served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Straite, David)
December 7, 2011 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. HTC America Inc. served on 12/6/2007, answer due 12/27/2007. (Straite, David)
December 6, 2011 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. Samsung Telecommunications America LLC served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Straite, David)
December 6, 2011 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. T-Mobile USA Inc. served on 12/6/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Straite, David)
December 6, 2011 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. AT & T Inc. served on 12/5/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Straite, David)
December 6, 2011 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. Carrier IQ Inc. served on 12/5/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Straite, David)
December 6, 2011 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. Motorola Mobility Inc. served on 12/5/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Straite, David)
December 5, 2011 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to AT & T Inc. on 12/5/2011; Apple Inc. on 12/5/2011; Carrier IQ Inc. on 12/5/2011; HTC America Inc. on 12/5/2011; Motorola Mobility Inc. on 12/5/2011; Samsung Electronics America Inc. on 12/5/2011; Samsung Telecommunications America LLC on 12/5/2011; Sprint Nextel Corporation on 12/5/2011; T-Mobile USA Inc. on 12/5/2011. Requesting party should contact the Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to arrange for pick-up or mailing of the summons. (ksr, )
December 2, 2011 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against AT & T Inc., Apple Inc., Carrier IQ Inc., HTC America Inc., Motorola Mobility Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, T-Mobile USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-984475.) - filed by Amandeep Singh, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ksr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacilli et al v. Carrier IQ Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier IQ Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT & T Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Pacilli
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Ralph Nicholas Sianni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saima Mian
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Ralph Nicholas Sianni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amandeep Singh
Represented By: Ralph Nicholas Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Robledo
Represented By: Ralph Nicholas Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]