Perales v. Fullerton Public Library et al Featured Case

Defendant: City of Fullerton, Griffin Structures Inc., Swinerton Builders, White House, California Governors Office and Fullerton Public Library
Plaintiff: Azael Dythian Perales
Case Number: 1:2011cv01218
Filed: December 12, 2011
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER- granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/5/2012. (lih)
January 3, 2012 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Azael Dythian Perales. (lih)
December 22, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER - Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application and complete all questions. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/17/2012.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/22/11. (rwc)
December 21, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01218-SLR, 1:11-cv-01219-SLR(rjb)
December 12, 2011 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzs, )
December 12, 2011 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against California Governors Office, City of Fullerton, Fullerton Public Library, Griffin Structures Inc., Swinerton Builders, White House - filed by Azael Dythian Perales. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzs, )
December 12, 2011 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Azael Dythian Perales. (dzs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2011: # 1 Motion for Continuence) (dzs, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perales v. Fullerton Public Library et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fullerton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin Structures Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swinerton Builders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White House
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Governors Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fullerton Public Library
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azael Dythian Perales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]