Allen v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Keile Allen
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00740
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 8 Record of case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:12-cv-20842. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 13, 2012 7 Transmittal Letter Requesting Case with attached Certified TRANSFER ORDER (TO-dated 6/12/2012) transferring case to the District of Delaware re: MDL 2358 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. (Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel). (Attachments: # 1 Certified Transfer Order) (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/14/2012.]
June 12, 2012 6 Courtesy Copy of TRANSFER ORDER (TO-dated 6/12/2012) transferring case to the District of Delaware re: MDL 2358 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. (Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel). ** awaiting certified copy from the transferee court ** (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/14/2012.]
March 6, 2012 5 Courtesy Copy of Motion to Transfer of Action to the Northern District of California pursuant to 28 USC 1407 sent before the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (with Attachments) (gp) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/16/2012) (ail). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/14/2012.]
March 2, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE RE PENDING MDL TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/2/2012. (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/14/2012.]
March 1, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (jua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/14/2012.]
February 29, 2012 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro (jua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/14/2012.]
February 29, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4512687, filed by Keile Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s))(Harke, Lance) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/14/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keile Allen
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman
Represented By: Lance August Harke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]