Heretick v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Heretick
Defendant: Google Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00791
Filed: June 26, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (els)
June 26, 2012 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (els)
June 26, 2012 15 Record of case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:12-cv-20888. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 25, 2012 14 Transmittal Letter with attached Certified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the District of Delaware re: MDL 2358 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (Attachments: # 1 Certified CTO-1) (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
June 25, 2012 13 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the District of Delaware re: MDL 2358 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). ** awaiting certified copy from the transferee court ** (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
June 18, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report ( Status Report due by 8/17/2012). Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/18/2012. (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
June 14, 2012 11 STATUS REPORT Joint by Kenneth W. Heretick (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transfer Order, # 2 Exhibit Clerk letter)(Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 30, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 8 Motion to Stay. The parties shall submit a joint status report by 7/27/12. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/29/2012. (tp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 29, 2012 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by MDL Panel. Document not filed in Text Searchable Format; ERROR - The document was not filed in Text Searchable Format. All future filings must be submitted in Text Searchable format as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedure 3G(5) -Page 10-. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jcy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 28, 2012 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by MDL Panel by Kenneth W. Heretick. Responses due by 4/16/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 16, 2012 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re 6 Acknowledgment of Service. Document not filed in Text Searchable Format; ERROR - The document was not filed in Text Searchable Format. All future filings must be submitted in Text Searchable format as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedure 3G(5) -Page 10-. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jcy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 15, 2012 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 3 Summons Issued Acknowledgment filed by Kenneth W. Heretick. (Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 12, 2012 5 Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Related Actions sent before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 6, 2012 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re 1 Complaint. Document not filed in Text Searchable Format; ERROR - The document was not filed in Text Searchable Format. All future filings must be submitted in Text Searchable format as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedure 3G(5) -Page 10-. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jcy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 5, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. (yha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 5, 2012 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (yha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]
March 5, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4521732, filed by Kenneth W. Heretick. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s))(Yanchunis, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 6/26/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Heretick v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Heretick
Represented By: John Allen Yanchunis, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Weibell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]