Franchise Dynamics LLC v. Google Inc Featured Case

Defendant: Google Inc.
Plaintiff: Franchise Dynamics LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00793
Filed: June 26, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (els)
June 26, 2012 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (els)
June 26, 2012 8 Record of case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number in Other District: 1:12-cv-02920. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 22, 2012 7 TRANSFERRED to the District of Delaware the electronic record with documents numbered 1-6, copy of transfer order. (nf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/26/2012.]
June 22, 2012 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Delaware.(nf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/26/2012.]
June 13, 2012 5 MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status hearing set for 6/19/2012 is stricken and reset to 7/24/2012 at 09:30 AM by request of the parties. Mailed notice (rj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/26/2012.]
May 2, 2012 4 MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall:Status Hearing set for 06/19/12 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defedants of the status hearing forthwith. Parties are directed to discuss settlement of case, consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge and a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management information about pretrial case management procedures. This information is located on the website: http//www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (nf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/26/2012.]
April 20, 2012 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Arlander Keys. (jn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/26/2012.]
April 19, 2012 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Franchise Dynamics LLC by Clinton A. Krislov (Krislov, Clinton) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/26/2012.]
April 19, 2012 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Krislov, Clinton) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/26/2012.]
April 19, 2012 1 COMPLAINT filed by Franchise Dynamics LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7068315.(Krislov, Clinton) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/26/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Franchise Dynamics LLC v. Google Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Weibell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franchise Dynamics LLC
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]