Oldenburg v. Google Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jason Oldenburg
Defendant: Google Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00800
Filed: June 25, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (els)
June 25, 2012 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (els)
June 25, 2012 9 Record of case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:12-cv-00267. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 22, 2012 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring this action to USDC-Delaware for inclusion in MDL 2358 signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 6/22/2012 (cc: all counsel)(djd) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 26, 2012 7 NOTICE of Related Action filed by Google Inc in MDL No 2358 (djd) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 26, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 3/26/2012 GRANTING 5 Motion to Stay. See Order for details.(cc: all counsel)(llc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 23, 2012 5 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay (on Behalf of All Parties) by Jason Oldenburg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION)(Mather, Corey) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 20, 2012 Summons Issued as to Google Inc (djd) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 20, 2012 4 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jason Oldenburg. (Mather, Corey) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 20, 2012 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Jason Oldenburg (Mather, Corey) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 20, 2012 Case Opening Modification; The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and RESUBMIT the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the attorney case opening instructions, the summons instructions and the party name guidelines for further guidance (djd) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 19, 2012 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 19, 2012 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jason Oldenburg. (Mather, Corey) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 19, 2012 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Google Inc by Jason Oldenburg. ( Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt number 0757-1454279) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mather, Corey) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/25/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Oldenburg v. Google Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Oldenburg
Represented By: Guri Ademi
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: Corey Mather
Represented By: David J Syrios
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]