McKee v. PetSmart Inc.

Defendant: PetSmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicholas McKee
Case Number: 1:2012cv01117
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to PetSmart, Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue To The United States District Court For The District Of Arizona, with Certificate of Service filed by PetSmart Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 4/8/2013. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/20/13. (cak)
October 15, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/15/2014. (lih)
June 5, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 denying 10 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/5/2013. (nmfn)
December 9, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/9/2013. (nmfn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKee v. PetSmart Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PetSmart Inc.
Represented By: William R. Denny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas McKee
Represented By: Norman M. Monhait
Represented By: Seth R. Lesser
Represented By: Mike Palitz
Represented By: Fran Rudich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]