Kickflip Inc. v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Kickflip Inc.
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01369
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 20 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on the pending motions on July 29, 2013 beginning at 10:00 a.m. Each side will be allocated up to one (1) hour to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/13. (ntl)
February 25, 2013 19 REPLY BRIEF re 14 MOTION to Strike 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kickflip Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 15, 2013 18 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Strike 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Facebook Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14)(Lydon, Tiffany)
February 15, 2013 17 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding request for oral argument on Facebook's Motion to Dismiss - re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Lydon, Tiffany)
February 11, 2013 16 REPLY BRIEF re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14)(Lydon, Tiffany)
February 1, 2013 15 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kickflip Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/11/2013. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 1, 2013 14 MOTION to Strike 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Kickflip Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 17, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas O. Barnett,Jonathan Gimblett for Facebook Inc. added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
January 17, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Caitlin R. Cottingham for Facebook Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
January 8, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Derek Linke for Kickflip Inc. added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
January 4, 2013 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
January 4, 2013 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Facebook Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Mayo, Andrew)
January 4, 2013 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew)
January 4, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas O. Barnett, Jonathan Gimblett, and Caitlin R. Cottingham filed by Facebook Inc; 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to January 4, 2013 filed by Kickflip Inc., Facebook Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/4/13. (ntl)
January 4, 2013 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas O. Barnett, Jonathan Gimblett, and Caitlin R. Cottingham - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany)
December 28, 2012 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to January 4, 2013 - filed by Facebook Inc., Kickflip Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
December 19, 2012 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Balick on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Balick, Steven)
November 21, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to January 2, 2013 filed by Kickflip Inc., Facebook Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/21/2012. (rpg)
November 19, 2012 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to January 2, 2013 - filed by Facebook Inc., Kickflip Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 9, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Derek Linke filed by Kickflip Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/9/12. (ntl)
November 8, 2012 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Derek Linke - filed by Kickflip Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
November 8, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Keith L. Butler,Derek A. Newman,Brian R. Strange for Kickflip Inc. added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
November 8, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith L. Butler, Attorney Brian R. Strange, and Attorney Derek A. Newman filed by Kickflip Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/12. (ntl)
November 7, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 31, 2012 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Keith L. Butler, Attorney Brian R. Strange, and Attorney Derek A. Newman - filed by Kickflip Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
October 31, 2012 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickflip Inc.. Facebook Inc. served on 10/31/2012, answer due 11/21/2012. (Matterer, Mary)
October 31, 2012 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Facebook Inc. on 10/31/2012. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (els)
October 26, 2012 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Kickflip Inc.. (els)
October 26, 2012 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
October 26, 2012 1 COMPLAINT FOR ANTITRUST VIOLATIONS AND TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE filed with Jury Demand against Facebook Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1163374.) - filed by Kickflip Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kickflip Inc. v. Facebook Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kickflip Inc.
Represented By: Derek A. Newman
Represented By: Mary Matterer
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Keith L. Butler
Represented By: Brian R. Strange
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]