In Re: Google Inc. Cookie Placement Consumer Privacy Litigation Featured Case

 
Case Number: 1:2012md02358
Filed: June 12, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 Remark : Receipt of original records from the Eastern District of Texas (1:12-cv-105 USDC/EDTX), (1:12-cv-799-SLR USDC/DE). (rwc) (rwc)
June 26, 2012 Receipt of original records fromSouthern District of Florida (1:12cv20888)(USDC/DE 12cv791) (els)
June 26, 2012 Receipt of original records from District of New Jersey (2:12cv2113)(USDC/DE 12cv797) (els)
June 26, 2012 Receipt of original records from Northern District of Illinois (1:12cv2920)(USDC/DE 12cv793) (els)
June 25, 2012 Receipt of original records from Northern District of Illinois (1:12cv1821)(USDC/DE 12cv792) (els)
June 25, 2012 Receipt of original records from Eastern District of Wisconsin (2:12cv267)(USDC/DE 12cv800) (els)
June 25, 2012 Remark : Receipt of original records from the District of Maryland (8:12-cv-698 USDC/MD), (1:12-cv-795-SLR USDC/DE) (rwc)
June 25, 2012 Remark : Receipt of original records from the Eastern District of Missouri (4:12-cv-433 USDC/EDMO), (1:12-cv-796-SLR USDC/DE). (rwc)
June 25, 2012 Remark : Receipt of original records from Western District Kentucky (5:12-cv-00048 USDC/WDKY), (USDC/DE 1:12-cv-794-SLR). (rwc)
June 22, 2012 11 Letter to Clerks of other districts, from DE Clerk dated 6/22/12, regarding transfer of cases to Delaware - re 10 Order. (copies sent to other districts via e-mail). (rwc) Modified on 6/22/2012 (rwc).
June 22, 2012 10 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (CT0-1) - Transferring the following tag-along actions to the USDC/DE, 1:12-md-02358-SLR - (SEE ORDER FOR LIST OF ACTIONS) - signed by Clerk of MDL Panel on 6/22/12. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02358-SLR et al.(rwc)
June 15, 2012 Receipt of original records from Northern District of California(5:12cv915)(USDC/DE 12cv739) (els)
June 15, 2012 Receipt of original records from District of New Jersey (2:12-cv-983) (USDC/DE 1:12-cv-745) (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 Receipt of original record from Northern District of Illinois (1:12-cv-1470) (USDC/DE 1:12-cv-741) (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 Receipt of original records from Northern District of Mississippi(3:12cv23)(USDC/DE 12cv743) (els)
June 14, 2012 Remark: Receipt of original records from Western District of Missouri (2:12cv222)(USDC/DE 12cv744) (els)
June 14, 2012 Receipt of original records from District of Kansas (2:12-cv-2100) (USDC/DE 1:12-cv-742) (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 Receipt of original records from Southern District of Florida (1:12-cv-20842)(USDC/DE 1:12-cv-740) (dzs, )
June 13, 2012 9 Letter to Clerk, USDC/NJ from Clerk, USDC/DE regarding transfer of case to Delaware - re 1 Order. (dzs, )
June 13, 2012 8 Letter to Clerk, USDC/ND/IL from Clerk, USDC/DE regarding transfer of case to Delaware - re 1 Order,. (dzs, )
June 13, 2012 7 Letter to Clerk, USDC/WD/MO from Clerk, USDC/DE regarding transfer of case to Delaware - re 1 Order. (dzs, )
June 13, 2012 6 Letter to Clerk, USDC/ND/MS from Clerk, USDC/DE regarding transfer of case to Delaware - re 1 Order,. (dzs, )
June 13, 2012 5 Letter to Clerk, USDC/KS from Clerk, USDC/DE regarding transfer of case to Delaware - re 1 Order. (dzs, )
June 13, 2012 4 Letter to Clerk, USDC/SD/FL from Clerk, USDC/DE regarding transfer of case to Delaware - re 1 Order. (dzs, ) Modified on 6/13/2012 (dzs, ).
June 13, 2012 3 Letter to Clerk, USDC/ND/CA from Clerk, USDC/DE regarding transfer of case to Delaware - re 1 Order. (dzs, )
June 13, 2012 The following case in the District of Delaware is included in this MDL: 1:12-00200-SLR (dzs, )
June 13, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02358-SLR, 1:12-cv-00200-SLR(dzs, )
June 12, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: PDF of Transfer Order D.I. 1 replaced with correct order. (dzs, )
June 12, 2012 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02358-SLR, 1:12-cv-00200-SLR(dzs, )
June 12, 2012 1 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the following cases to the District of Delaware ND/CA 5:12-00915; SD/FL 1:12-20842; ND/IL 1:12-01470; D/KS 2:12-02100; ND/MS 3:12-00023; WD/MO 2:12-00222; D/NJ 2:12-00983. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02358-SLR, 1:12-cv-00200-SLR(dzs, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/13/2012) (dzs, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In Re: Google Inc. Cookie Placement Consumer Privacy Litigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]