MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00299
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2013 15 ANSWER to 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim / Plaintiff MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC's Answer to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
May 23, 2013 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 12 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC by Apple Inc..(Matterer, Mary)
May 6, 2013 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim / Plaintiff MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC's Response to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Allegations of Willful Infringement and Indirect Infringement filed by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa)
May 6, 2013 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT /First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc.- filed by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
April 22, 2013 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
April 22, 2013 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Apple Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/9/2013. (Matterer, Mary)
April 22, 2013 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
April 11, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Day, Attorney Clayton Thompson, and Attorney Yakov Zolotorev filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/11/13. (ntl)
April 10, 2013 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Day, Attorney Clayton Thompson, and Attorney Yakov Zolotorev - filed by Apple Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
April 9, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marc A. Fenster,Alexander C. D. Giza,C. Jay Chung for MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00299-LPS et al.(dmp, )
April 3, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (10 in 1:13-cv-00304-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00301-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00303-LPS, 8 in 1:13-cv-00306-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00299-LPS, 7 in 1:13-cv-00300-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00305-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C. D. Giza and Jay Chung of Russ August & Kabat filed by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/3/13. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00299-LPS et al.(ntl)
April 2, 2013 7 EXHIBIT re (10 in 1:13-cv-00304-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00301-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00303-LPS, 8 in 1:13-cv-00306-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00299-LPS, 7 in 1:13-cv-00300-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00305-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C. D. Giza and Jay Chung of Russ August & Kabat / Certification of Marc A. Fenster by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Alexander C.D. Giza, # 2 Certification of Jay Chung)(Brauerman, Stephen)
April 2, 2013 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C. D. Giza and Jay Chung of Russ August & Kabat - filed by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement to April 22, 2013 filed by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC, Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/25/13. (ntl)
March 21, 2013 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement to April 22, 2013 - filed by Apple Inc., MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC. (Matterer, Mary)
March 13, 2013 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Apple, Inc. on 3/1/2013, filed by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 6, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00299-LPS through 1:13-cv-00301-LPS and 1:13-cv-00303-LPS through 1:13-cv-00306-LPS (rjb)
February 25, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apple Inc. on 2/25/2013. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (cla, )
February 22, 2013 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,096,358;. (cla, )
February 22, 2013 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (cla, )
February 22, 2013 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1235213.) - filed by MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(cla, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAZ Encryption Technologies LLC
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]