Parallel Iron LLC v. Google Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC alleged that Defendant Google Inc. infringed plaintiff's patents covering the storage of data distributed across numerous devices and machines. Specifically, plaintiff alleged that the Google File System infringed U.S. Patent No. 7,197,662, U.S. Patent No. 7,958,388 and U.S. Patent No. 7,543,177, all entitled "Methods and Systems for a Storage System."

Plaintiff: Parallel Iron LLC
Defendant: Google Inc
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00367
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 68 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,197,662; 7,958,388; 7,543,177. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms)
December 30, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/30/2013. (nms)
December 20, 2013 66 STIPULATION of Dismissal, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 12/23/2013 (nms).
December 18, 2013 65 NOTICE Of Service of Second Set of Interrogatories (13-18), filed by Parallel Iron LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 12/18/2013 (nms).
November 27, 2013 64 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 11-26-13 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2014. (lad)
November 26, 2013 63 NOTICE Of Service of Substitute First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Information to Defendants, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 11/26/2013 (nms).
November 26, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 11/26/2013. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00763-RGA et al.(ksr, )
November 22, 2013 62 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Karen Jacobs regarding revised Joint Claim Construction chart. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Jacobs, Karen)
November 20, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (61 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 56 in 1:12-cv-00877-RGA, 57 in 1:12-cv-00880-RGA, 79 in 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 63 in 1:12-cv-00763-RGA, 83 in 1:12-cv-00764-RGA, 53 in 1:12-cv-00995-RGA, 57 in 1:12-cv-00876-RGA, 62 in 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 55 in 1:12-cv-01035-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shekhar Vyas filed by Parallel Iron LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/20/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00763-RGA et al.(nms)
November 19, 2013 61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shekhar Vyas - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Compliance, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 19, 2013 60 NOTICE of Subpoena on Steven Louis Dodd by Google Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul)
November 15, 2013 59 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Parallel Iron LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Richard Charles Weinblatt. Attorney Richard D. Kirk, Stephen B. Brauerman and Vanessa R. Tiradentes of Bayard, P.A. and Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C.D. Giza, Paul A. Kroeger and Jacob Buzcko of Russ, August & Kabat terminated. (Weinblatt, Richard)
November 12, 2013 58 REDACTED VERSION of 52 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/13/2013 (nms).
November 12, 2013 57 NOTICE of Subpoenas on Steven Louis Dodd and Melvin James Bullen by Google Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Saindon, Paul)
November 7, 2013 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions to Defendant Google Inc. by Google Inc.(Saindon, Paul)
November 5, 2013 55 REDACTED VERSION of 53 Expert Declaration of Ian Jestice, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/6/2013 (nms).
November 2, 2013 54 Joint CLAIM Construction Chart, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit 1-12)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/4/2013 (nms).
November 2, 2013 53 [SEALED] Expert Declaration of Ian Jestice re Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/4/2013 (nms).
November 2, 2013 52 [SEALED] Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/4/2013 (nms).
October 31, 2013 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Unified Patents on November 12, 2013 by Parallel Iron LLC.(Bussiere, Sara)
October 30, 2013 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Facebook Inc., Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., Cloudera Inc., Google Inc, Linkedin Corporation, Netflix Inc., Orbitz LLC, EMC Corporation.(Flynn, Michael)
October 25, 2013 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by Google Inc.(Flynn, Michael)
October 25, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (57 in 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 66 in 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 48 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob R. Buczko filed by Parallel Iron LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/25/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 1:13-cv-00443-RGA(nms)
October 25, 2013 48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob R. Buczko - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Jacob R. Buczko)(Brauerman, Stephen)
October 22, 2013 47 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Louis Dodd on November 14, 2013 by Google Inc.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 22, 2013 46 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Melvin James Bullen on November 12, 2013 by Google Inc.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 18, 2013 45 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sanjay Ghemawat on December 11, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Parallel Iron LLC.(Bussiere, Sara)
October 17, 2013 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Google Inc.(Saindon, Paul)
October 12, 2013 43 NOTICE Of Service of 1) Parallel Iron, Llc's Claim Construction Reply Brief and (2) this Notice of Service, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 10/15/2013 (nms).
October 9, 2013 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Information to Defendant Google, Inc.; (2) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's Frist Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Google, Inc. (Nos. 1-12); and (3) this Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
October 8, 2013 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Party Subpoena for Documents and Things to Oblon, Spivak, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, L.L.P by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Oblon, Spivak, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, L.L.P.)(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
October 8, 2013 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Party Subpoena for Documents and Things to Bradley Lytle by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Bradley Lytle)(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
October 8, 2013 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Party Subpoena for Documents and Things to Michael Kiklis by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Michael Kiklis)(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
October 4, 2013 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Google, Inc.; and (2) this Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
October 4, 2013 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Parallel Iron, LLC's Notice of Third Party Subpoena For Documents And Things To Unified Patents, Inc. by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena To Unified Patents Inc.)(Brauerman, Stephen)
October 4, 2013 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's Notice of Third Party Subpoena To Unified Patents, Inc. To Testify At A Deposition by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena To Unified Patents, Inc.)(Brauerman, Stephen)
October 1, 2013 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant Google's First Set of Interrogatories and (2) this Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen)
September 27, 2013 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief and the Expert Declaration of Ian Jestice by Orbitz LLC.(Tennyson, Eleanor)
September 3, 2013 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 26, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (46 in 1:12-cv-00766-RGA, 38 in 1:12-cv-01035-RGA, 50 in 1:12-cv-00878-RGA, 39 in 1:12-cv-00763-RGA, 41 in 1:12-cv-00769-RGA, 48 in 1:12-cv-00995-RGA, 39 in 1:12-cv-00876-RGA, 76 in 1:12-cv-00874-RGA, 39 in 1:12-cv-00877-RGA, 51 in 1:12-cv-00879-RGA, 39 in 1:12-cv-00880-RGA, 57 in 1:12-cv-00764-RGA, 32 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Page Limits, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (see Stipulation for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/26/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00763-RGA et al.(nms)
August 26, 2013 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Page Limits by Parallel Iron LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
August 23, 2013 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Parallel Iron, LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief and (2) this Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen)
August 16, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (49 in 1:12-cv-00879-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-00763-RGA, 46 in 1:12-cv-00995-RGA, 44 in 1:12-cv-00766-RGA, 54 in 1:12-cv-00764-RGA, 36 in 1:12-cv-01035-RGA, 73 in 1:12-cv-00874-RGA, 30 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 39 in 1:12-cv-00769-RGA, 48 in 1:12-cv-00878-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-00876-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-00880-RGA, 37 in 1:12-cv-00877-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Joint Claim Construction Brief to November 1, 2013, filed by Parallel Iron LLC (Reset Deadlines: Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 11/1/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/16/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00763-RGA et al.(nms)
August 16, 2013 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME October 25, 2013 to November 1, 2013 - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
August 13, 2013 29 NOTICE Of Service of (1) Parallel Iron, Llc's Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Section 4(c) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and (2) this Notice of Service, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 8/14/2013 (nms).
August 7, 2013 28 NOTICE of Subpoenas (directed to Hitachi Data Systems Corporation and Hewlett-Packard Company) by Google Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Saindon, Paul)
August 5, 2013 27 NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, Llc's Responses to Defendant Google Inc.'S First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; (2) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, Llc's Responses to Defendant Google Inc.'S First Set of Interrogatories; and (3) this Notice of Service, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 8/6/2013 (nms).
August 5, 2013 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions and Production of Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4.D by Bluearc Corporation, Hitachi Data Systems Corporation, Netflix Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, EMC Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., Facebook Inc., Morgan Stanley, Google Inc, Linkedin Corporation, Netapp Inc., Orbitz LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 26, 2013 25 Joint CLAIM Construction Chart, by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit 1-12)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 7/29/2013 (nms).
July 22, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (33 in 1:12-cv-00880-RGA, 24 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 33 in 1:12-cv-00877-RGA, 41 in 1:12-cv-00878-RGA, 50 in 1:12-cv-00764-RGA, 33 in 1:12-cv-00763-RGA, 32 in 1:12-cv-01035-RGA, 39 in 1:12-cv-00995-RGA, 33 in 1:12-cv-00876-RGA, 41 in 1:12-cv-00879-RGA, 34 in 1:12-cv-00762-RGA, 35 in 1:12-cv-00769-RGA, 38 in 1:12-cv-00766-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of claim construction dates to various new dates filed by Adknowledge Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Morgan Stanley, Google Inc, Orbitz LLC, Facebook Inc., Parallel Iron LLC, Bank of America N.A., Amazon Web Services LLC, Bluearc Corporation, Amazon.com Inc., Netapp Inc., Netflix Inc., EMC Corporation, Hitachi Data Systems Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/22/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00762-RGA et al.(ksr, )
July 19, 2013 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of claim construction dates to various new dates - filed by Bluearc Corporation, Hitachi Data Systems Corporation, Netflix Inc., Parallel Iron LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC, EMC Corporation, Bank of America N.A., Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., Facebook Inc., Adknowledge Inc., Morgan Stanley, Google Inc, Linkedin Corporation, Orbitz LLC, Netapp Inc.. (Tennyson, Eleanor)
July 19, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Saqib J. Siddiqui,Stephen E. Baskin,Ann Marie Duffy for Google Inc added for electronic noticing. (els)
July 16, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Word filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/16/2013. (nms)
July 16, 2013 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Word - filed by Google Inc. (Saindon, Paul)
July 9, 2013 22 NOTICE Of Service of (1) Parallel Iron, Llc's Identification of Proposed Constructions and (2) this Notice of Service, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 7/12/2013 (nms).
July 9, 2013 21 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Google Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 9, 2013 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Constructions of Claim Terms and Phrases by Orbitz LLC.(Flynn, Michael)
July 8, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney A. John P. Mancini, Stephen E. Baskin, Ann Marie Duffy and Saqib Siddiqui filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/8/2013. (nms)
July 3, 2013 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney A. John P. Mancini, Stephen E. Baskin, Ann Marie Duffy and Saqib Siddiqui - filed by Google Inc. (Saindon, Paul)
July 2, 2013 18 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Google Inc (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 20, 2013 17 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 16 Proposed Protective Order, filed by Parallel Iron LLC, Google Inc. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/20/2013. (nms)
June 20, 2013 16 PROPOSED Protective Order, by Google Inc, Parallel Iron LLC. (Saindon, Paul) Modified on 6/20/2013 (nms).
June 14, 2013 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Terms and Phrases for Construction by Orbitz LLC.(Tennyson, Eleanor)
June 14, 2013 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Parallel Iron, LLC's Identification of Proposed Claim Terms for Construction and (2) Notice of Service by Parallel Iron LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen)
June 12, 2013 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-16) to Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC and (2) Defendant Google Inc.'s First Set of Requests (Nos. 1-61) for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Parallel Iron, LLC by Google Inc.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 28, 2013 12 NOTICE Of Service of (1) Parallel Iron's Disclosures Pursuant to Section 4(c) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and (2) this Notice of Service, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 5/29/2013 (nms).
May 13, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 9 Proposed Stipulated Scheduling Order, filed by Parallel Iron LLC, Google Inc (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/13/2013. (nms)
May 10, 2013 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc.(Saindon, Paul)
May 10, 2013 10 NOTICE Of Service of (1) Plaintiff Parallel Iron, Llc's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); (2) Parallel Iron's Disclosures Pursuant to Section 4(a) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and (3) this Notice of Service, by Parallel Iron LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 5/13/2013 (nms).
May 7, 2013 9 STIPULATION re Scheduling Order, by Google Inc, Parallel Iron LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 5/8/2013 (nms).
April 23, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul A. Kroeger for Parallel Iron LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 1:13-cv-00443-RGA(els)
April 18, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marc A. Fenster,Alexander C. D. Giza for Parallel Iron LLC,added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 1:13-cv-00367-RGA(els)
April 12, 2013 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for Corporate Parent or other affiliates for Google Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 12, 2013 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Google Inc.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 21, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 4 in 1:13-cv-00443-RGA, 6 in 1:13-cv-00367-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C.D. Giza and Paul A. Kroeger filed by Parallel Iron LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00307-RGA, 1:13-cv-00367-RGA, 1:13-cv-00443-RGA(nms)
March 20, 2013 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Alexander C.D. Giza and Paul A. Kroeger - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Alexander C.D. Giza, # 3 Certification of Paul A. Kroeger)(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 15, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint to May 1, 2013, filed by Parallel Iron LLC, Google Inc (Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc answer due 5/1/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2013. (nms)
March 15, 2013 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint to May 1, 2013 - filed by Google Inc, Parallel Iron LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 14, 2013 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Iron LLC. Google Inc served on 3/8/2013, answer due 4/1/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 13, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 7, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Google Inc on 3/7/2013. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mdb)
March 6, 2013 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,197,662; 7,958,388; 7,543,177;. (mdb)
March 6, 2013 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (mdb)
March 6, 2013 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1243966.) - filed by Parallel Iron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Parallel Iron LLC v. Google Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parallel Iron LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]