HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc. v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.
Defendant: YouTube LLC and Google Inc
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00429
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2014 65 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER denying (79 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 76 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 75 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 91 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 60 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 68 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 86 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 52 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 85 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 62 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 57 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR) MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/30/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
June 25, 2014 64 REQUEST for Oral Argument by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc. re (79 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 76 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 75 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 91 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 60 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 68 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 86 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 52 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 85 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 62 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 57 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR) MOTION for Reconsideration re (56 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 89 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 83 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 82 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 74 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 82 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 59 in 1:13-cv-00429. (Brauerman, Stephen)
June 24, 2014 63 DECLARATION re (87 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (88 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (81 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (93 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (64 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (71 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (78 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (62 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (77 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (86 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (54 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (59 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, (86 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR) Memorandum in Opposition, -- Declaration of Jill J. Schmidt -- by CNN Interactive Group Inc., Cartoon Interactive Group Inc., TNT Interactive Group Inc., Time Warner Inc., Blip Networks Inc., Yahoo! Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Viacom International Inc., Bravo Media LLC, NBC Entertainment, Universal Television Networks, Univision Interactive Media Inc., American Broadcasting Companies Inc., Disney Online, ESPN, Inc., Google Inc, YouTube LLC, DirecTV Group Inc, Vevo LLC, Ustream Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox News Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 5)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 24, 2014 62 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Reconsideration re (56 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 89 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 83 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 82 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 74 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 82 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 59 in 1:13-cv-00429 filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2014. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 17, 2014 61 DECLARATION re (76 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 75 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 68 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 52 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 85 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 62 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 79 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 91 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 60 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 86 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 57 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR) MOTION for Reconsideration re (56 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 89 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 83 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 82 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 74 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 82 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 59 in 1:13-cv-00429 /Declaration of Eric J. Carsten, Esq. in Support of HBAC Matchmaker Media Inc.'s Motion for Clarification/Reargument on the Court's Claim Construction Order by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Brauerman, Stephen)
June 17, 2014 60 MOTION for Reconsideration re (56 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 84 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 89 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 83 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 82 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 74 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 82 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 59 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 75 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 66 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 60 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 77 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR) Memorandum and Order /Plaintiff HBAC Matchmaker Media, Inc.'s Motion for Clarification/Reargument on the Court's Claim Construction Order - filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen)
June 3, 2014 59 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/3/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
May 29, 2014 58 REDACTED VERSION of (79 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 72 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 49 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 72 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 50 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 56 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 46 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 67 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 74 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 65 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 64 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 41 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 73 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR) Exhibit to a Document,,, /Redacted Version of Exhibits 35-50 to Declaration of Eric J. Carsten in Support of HBAC's Claim Construction Answering Brief by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35, # 2 Exhibit 36, # 3 Exhibit 37, # 4 Exhibit 38, # 5 Exhibit 39, # 6 Exhibit 40, # 7 Exhibit 41, # 8 Exhibit 42, # 9 Exhibit 43, # 10 Exhibit 44, # 11 Exhibit 45, # 12 Exhibit 46, # 13 Exhibit 47-48 (Redacted in Their Entirety), # 14 Exhibit 49, # 15 Exhibit 50)(Brauerman, Stephen)
May 29, 2014 57 REDACTED VERSION of (71 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 49 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 40 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 72 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 64 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 73 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 63 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 45 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 48 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 66 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 55 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 78 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 71 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR) Exhibit to a Document,,, /Redacted Version of Exhibits 18-34 to Declaration of Eric J. Carsten in Support of HBAC's Claim Construction Answering Brief by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Exhibit 22, # 6 Exhibit 23, # 7 Exhibit 24, # 8 Exhibit 25, # 9 Exhibit 26, # 10 Exhibit 27, # 11 Exhibit 28, # 12 Exhibit 29, # 13 Exhibit 30, # 14 Exhibit 31, # 15 Exhibit 32, # 16 Exhibit 33, # 17 Exhibit 34)(Brauerman, Stephen)
May 29, 2014 56 REDACTED VERSION of (65 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 47 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 77 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 63 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 62 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 70 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 44 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 72 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 39 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 54 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 70 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 71 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 48 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR) Declaration,,,,, /Redacted Version of Declaration of Eric J. Carsten in Support of HBAC's Claim Construction Answering Brief by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Brauerman, Stephen)
May 2, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Markman Hearing held on 5/2/2014. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
April 28, 2014 55 DECLARATION re (77 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (78 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (72 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (84 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (79 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (77 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (46 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (54 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (61 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (55 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (70 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (51 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (69 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief /Declaration of Eric J. Carsten, Esquire in Support of HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.'s Claim Construction Surreply Brief by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 51)(Brauerman, Stephen)
April 28, 2014 54 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen)
April 21, 2014 53 DECLARATION re 52 Claim Construction Reply Brief -- Declaration of Jill J. Schmidt -- by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 21, 2014 52 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 21, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (58 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 76 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 67 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 81 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 75 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 48 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 43 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 74 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 52 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 74 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 66 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 69 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian D. Ledahl filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(fms)
April 21, 2014 51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian D. Ledahl - filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Brian D. Ledahl)(Brauerman, Stephen)
April 15, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER, Re-Setting Hearings( The Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 5/2/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/15/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
April 11, 2014 49 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re (65 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 47 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 77 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 63 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 62 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 70 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 44 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 72 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 39 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 54 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 70 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 71 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 48 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR) Declaration,,,,, \Exhibits 35-50 to [Sealed] Declaration of Eric J. Carsten In Support of HBACs Claim Construction Answering Brief by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 36, # 2 Exhibit 37, # 3 Exhibit 38, # 4 Exhibit 39, # 5 Exhibit 40, # 6 Exhibit 41, # 7 Exhibit 42, # 8 Exhibit 43, # 9 Exhibit 44, # 10 Exhibit 45, # 11 Exhibit 46, # 12 Exhibit 47, # 13 Exhibit 48, # 14 Exhibit 49, # 15 Exhibit 50, # 16 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
April 11, 2014 48 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re (65 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 47 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 77 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 63 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 62 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 70 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 44 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 72 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 39 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 54 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 70 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 71 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 48 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR) Declaration,,,,, \Exhibits 18-34 to [Sealed] Declaration of Eric J. Carsten In Support of HBACs Claim Construction Answering Brief by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19, # 2 Exhibit 20, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 22, # 5 Exhibit 23, # 6 Exhibit 24, # 7 Exhibit 25, # 8 Exhibit 26, # 9 Exhibit 27, # 10 Exhibit 28, # 11 Exhibit 29, # 12 Exhibit 30, # 13 Exhibit 31, # 14 Exhibit 32, # 15 Exhibit 33, # 16 Exhibit 34, # 17 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
April 11, 2014 47 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (38 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (64 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (53 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (71 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (70 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (76 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (43 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (69 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (61 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (46 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (62 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (69 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (47 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief \Declaration of Eric J. Carsten In Support of HBACs Claim Construction Answering Brief by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
April 11, 2014 46 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
April 8, 2014 45 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING EARLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION: Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 3/21/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 4/11/2014. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 4/21/2014. Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 4/28/2014. A Markman Hearing is set for 5/2/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. All other deadlines are vacated, and the parties will propose a new calendar after the Court issues its early claim construction order. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/8/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
April 4, 2014 The 4/15/2014 in-person scheduling conference is cancelled per request of counsel. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
March 26, 2014 44 Order Setting Patent Scheduling Conference: An In-Person Scheduling Conference is set for 4/15/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/26/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
March 24, 2014 43 Letter to Counsel from Judge Robinson regarding changes to the way the Court processes patent cases. (nmfn)
March 21, 2014 42 DECLARATION re (33 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (58 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (65 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (64 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (70 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (63 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (38 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (63 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (41 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (56 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (57 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (41 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (47 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief [Declaration of Jill J. Schmidt in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief] by CNN Interactive Group Inc., Cartoon Interactive Group Inc., TNT Interactive Group Inc., Blip Networks Inc., Yahoo! Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Viacom International Inc., Bravo Media LLC, NBC Entertainment, Universal Television Networks, Univision Interactive Media Inc., American Broadcasting Companies Inc., Disney Online, ESPN, Inc., Google Inc, YouTube LLC, DirecTV Group Inc, Vevo LLC, Ustream Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox News Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-32 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibits 1-32 (Part 2), # 3 Exhibits 1-32 (Part 3), # 4 Exhibits 1-32 (Part 4), # 5 Exhibits 1-32 (Part 5), # 6 Exhibits 1-32 (Part 6), # 7 Exhibits 1-32 (Part 7), # 8 Exhibits 1-32 (Part 8))(Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 21, 2014 41 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 17, 2014 40 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order Regarding Early Claim Construction by TNT Interactive Group Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Network Television Inc., Blip Networks Inc., Yahoo! Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Viacom International Inc., Bravo Media LLC, NBC Entertainment, NBCUniversal Media LLC, USA Network Inc., Universal Television Networks, Univision Communications Inc., Univision Interactive Media Inc., ABC Inc., American Broadcasting Companies Inc., Disney Online, ESPN, Inc., Walt Disney Company, Google Inc, YouTube LLC, DirecTV Group Inc, Vevo LLC, Ustream Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox News Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 14, 2014 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.'S IDENTIFICATION OF CLAIM TERMS FOR CONSTRUCTION and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 3/7/2014. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
March 7, 2014 38 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Early Claim Construction. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 7, 2014 37 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding claim term identification in advance of teleconference. (Moore, David)
March 5, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 3/5/2014. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
February 24, 2014 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-19); (2) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-55); and (3) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc..(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
February 18, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (55 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 52 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 53 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 54 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 32 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 27 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 35 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 39 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 56 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 32 in 1:13-cv-00963-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 33 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 54 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR) Agreed Protective Order filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/18/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(fms)
February 14, 2014 35 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Protective Order by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen)
January 24, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER, in an effort to focus expert discovery and the summary judgment motion practice in these cases; IT IS ORDERED that, on or before February 28, 2014, the parties shall confer and attempt to identify no more than three (3) critical claim limitations, the early construction of which may serve the above purposes. ORDER Setting Teleconference: defendants' counsel to initiate the call.( A Telephone Conference is set for 3/7/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
January 7, 2014 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff HBAC Matchmaker Media, Inc. and Google Inc.'s First Individual Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff HBAC Matchmaker Media, Inc. filed by Google Inc.(Palapura, Bindu)
December 30, 2013 Remark - The 1/6/2014 and the 2/24/2014 discovery conferences have been removed from the court's calendar per the court's order of 12/30/2013 setting new conference dates. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
December 30, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (49 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 49 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 25 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 50 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 34 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 32 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 29 in 1:13-cv-00963-SLR, 49 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 53 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 54 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 28 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 30 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR) Stipulation regarding proposed scheduling order filed by Google Inc, Viacom International Inc., News Distribution Network Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., American Broadcasting Companies Inc., Fox News Network LLC, Cartoon Interactive Group Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Ustream Inc., TNT Interactive Group Inc., NBC Entertainment, DirecTV Group Inc, YouTube LLC, Vevo LLC, Universal Television Networks, Yahoo! Inc., ESPN, Inc., Bravo Media LLC, Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Disney Online, CNN Interactive Group Inc., Blip Networks Inc., Univision Interactive Media Inc., HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(fms)
December 27, 2013 32 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order by CNN Interactive Group Inc., Cartoon Interactive Group Inc., HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc., TNT Interactive Group Inc., Blip Networks Inc., Yahoo! Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Viacom International Inc., Bravo Media LLC, NBC Entertainment, Universal Television Networks, Univision Interactive Media Inc., American Broadcasting Companies Inc., Disney Online, ESPN, Inc., Google Inc, YouTube LLC, DirecTV Group Inc, Vevo LLC, Ustream Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox News Network LLC, News Distribution Network Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 18, 2013 31 REDACTED VERSION of (30 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 51 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 32 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 50 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 30 in 1:13-cv-00427-SLR, 46 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 47 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 47 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 46 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 46 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 48 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 28 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR) Letter, by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Brauerman, Stephen)
December 12, 2013 Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set for 3/5/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A 2nd Discovery Conference is set for 4/28/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A 3rd Discovery Conference is set for 6/24/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Status Conference re: Expert Reports is set for 3/24/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Hearings set in court on 12/12/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
December 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 12/12/2013. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00428-SLR et al.(nmfn)
December 11, 2013 30 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Paragraph 4(a) and Efficient Discovery Procedure. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
November 21, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (28 in 1:13-cv-00427-SLR, 27 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 41 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 43 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 41 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 45 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 26 in 1:13-cv-00963-SLR, 31 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 24 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 27 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 28 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 46 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 42 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 41 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 42 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR) Stipulation filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/21/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(fms)
November 20, 2013 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of YouTube, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff HBAC Matchmaker Media Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things; YouTube, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff HBAC Matchmaker Media, Inc.'s First Set Of Interrogatories; Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff HBAC Matchmaker Media Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things; and Google Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff HBAC Matchmaker Media, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories by Google Inc, YouTube LLC.(Moore, David)
November 15, 2013 28 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines for Parties to Submit Proposal Regarding Section 4(a) Disclosures by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Tiradentes, Vanessa)
November 8, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER, 1. On or before November 15, 2013, plaintiff shall submit to defendants its proposal to fairly and effectively narrow the focus of its Section 4(a) disclosures to representative products, keeping in mind the scope identified in the complaints of claimed methods directed at targeting advertisements to consumers who visit websites owned or controlled by defendants. 2. On or before December 2, 2013, defendants shall submit their responses and, to the extent defendants disagree with plaintiffs approach, they must themselves submit counter proposals directed at identifying representative products. 3. The court expects the parties respective proposals to reflect their best efforts to move forward with discovery, and not simply reiterate the arguments shared at the conference. ORDER, Setting Hearings( A Discovery Conference is set for 12/12/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/7/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(nmfn)
October 28, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that on or November 12, 2013, each party or each party group shall email to Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in the Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/28/13. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(cak)
October 21, 2013 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO GOOGLE INC.; (2) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO GOOGLE INC.; (3) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO YOUTUBE, LLC; (4) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO YOUTUBE, LLC; and (5) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc..(Bussiere, Sara)
October 15, 2013 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc..(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
October 15, 2013 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Youtube, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Initial Disclosures of Google Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Google Inc, YouTube LLC.(Horwitz, Richard)
October 12, 2013 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.'S DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO SECTION 3 OF THE DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD; (2) HBAC MATCHMAKER MEDIA, INC.'S DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO SECTION 4(A) OF THE DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD; and (3) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc..(Tiradentes, Vanessa)
October 11, 2013 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") and Defendant Youtube, LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Google Inc, YouTube LLC.(Palapura, Bindu)
October 10, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jean Rhee for HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(els)
October 9, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (17 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR, 31 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 36 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 20 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 18 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 35 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 24 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 32 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 20 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 31 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 33 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 32 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 17 in 1:13-cv-00964-SLR, 31 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 18 in 1:13-cv-00963-SLR, 22 in 1:13-cv-00427-SLR) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jean Y. Rhee filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/9/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(nmfn)
October 7, 2013 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jean Y. Rhee - filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Jean Y. Rhee)(Brauerman, Stephen)
September 24, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/24/2013 at 01:00 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/24/13. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(cak)
September 24, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(cak)
September 23, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (27 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 14 in 1:13-cv-00962-SLR, 18 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 27 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 20 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 28 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 31 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 14 in 1:13-cv-00963-SLR, 29 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 32 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 20 in 1:13-cv-00427-SLR, 13 in 1:13-cv-00964-SLR, 29 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 18 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 27 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 13 in 1:13-cv-00965-SLR) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. ( Joinder of Parties due by 2/10/2014., Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2014., Discovery due by 2/6/2015., A Discovery Conference is set for 1/6/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A 2nd Discovery Conference is set for 2/24/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., Dispositive Motions due by 6/12/2015., An Oral Argument is set for 9/25/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 2/27/2015., Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 3/27/2015., Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 4/10/2015., Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 4/24/2015., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/16/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 12/7/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) See order for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/23/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(nmfn)
September 17, 2013 18 PROPOSED ORDER -- Coordinated Scheduling Order by CNN Interactive Group Inc., Cartoon Interactive Group Inc., HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc., TNT Interactive Group Inc., Blip Networks Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Viacom International Inc., Bravo Media LLC, NBC Entertainment, NBCUniversal Media LLC, Universal Television Networks, Univision Interactive Media Inc., American Broadcasting Companies Inc., Disney Online, ESPN, Inc., NextPoint Inc., TMFT Enterprises LLC, Vevo LLC, Google Inc, YouTube LLC, DirecTV Group Inc, Ustream Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox News Network LLC, News Distribution Network Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson enclosing Scheduling Order)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 11, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2013. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the court. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(nmfn)
September 10, 2013 17 PROPOSED ORDER /[Proposed] Coordinated Scheduling Order by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen)
July 26, 2013 Reset Hearings: The In-Person Scheduling Conference is reset per request of counsel for 9/11/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(nmfn)
July 11, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert R. Laurenzi for Google Inc added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 2, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Malecek for Google Inc added for electronic noticing. (els)
June 28, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy Chao for Google Inc added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
June 27, 2013 16 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: An In-Person Scheduling Conference is set for 8/8/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Sue L. Robinson. The conference will be held by telephone with plaintiff's counsel initiating if the parties are able to submit an agreed upon plan with no areas of dispute. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/27/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(nmfn)
June 12, 2013 15 Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Coordination of Cases for Discovery and Markman - re (11 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 11 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 9 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 9 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 9 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 9 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00427-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00427-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 10 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 10 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 12 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 12 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 11 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 11 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR) Order, Set Deadlines,,. (Brauerman, Stephen)
June 10, 2013 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by YouTube LLC identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc. for YouTube LLC.. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 10, 2013 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc identifying Corporate Parent none for Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 10, 2013 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Google Inc, YouTube LLC.(Horwitz, Richard)
June 6, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Malecek, Timothy Chao, Robert S. Magee and Robert R. Laurenzi of Kaye Scholer LLP filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/6/2013. (fms)
June 3, 2013 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Malecek, Timothy Chao, Robert S. Magee and Robert R. Laurenzi of Kaye Scholer LLP - filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Palapura, Bindu)
May 31, 2013 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Tiradentes, Vanessa)
May 30, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted.( ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/12/2013.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/29/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(nmfn)
May 9, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 10, 2013 filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc answer due 6/10/2013; YouTube LLC answer due 6/10/2013.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/9/2013. (fms)
May 8, 2013 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 10, 2013 - filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Moore, David)
April 19, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marc A. Fenster for HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00438-SLR et al.(dmp, )
April 19, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric J. Carsten for HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00438-SLR et al.(dmp, )
April 16, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:13-cv-00428-SLR, 7 in 1:13-cv-00429-SLR, 6 in 1:13-cv-00438-SLR, 9 in 1:13-cv-00434-SLR, 6 in 1:13-cv-00432-SLR, 6 in 1:13-cv-00427-SLR, 6 in 1:13-cv-00435-SLR, 6 in 1:13-cv-00437-SLR, 6 in 1:13-cv-00436-SLR, 9 in 1:13-cv-00431-SLR, 8 in 1:13-cv-00433-SLR, 7 in 1:13-cv-00430-SLR) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Carsten and Marc A. Fenster filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/16/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR et al.(fms)
April 10, 2013 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Carsten and Marc A. Fenster - filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Eric J. Carsten, # 2 Certification of Marc A. Fenster)(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. Google Inc served on 3/19/2013, answer due 5/9/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2013 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. YouTube LLC served on 3/19/2013, answer due 5/9/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 25, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 9, 2013 filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc answer due 5/9/2013; YouTube LLC answer due 5/9/2013.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/25/2013. (fms)
March 22, 2013 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 9, 2013 - filed by Google Inc, YouTube LLC. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 20, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00427-SLR through 1:13-cv-00438-SLR (rjb)
March 18, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Google Inc on 3/18/2013; YouTube LLC on 3/18/2013. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (cla, )
March 15, 2013 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,774,170; 6,002,393;. (cla, )
March 15, 2013 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (cla, )
March 15, 2013 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc, YouTube LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1250807.) - filed by HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc. v. Google Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HBAC MatchMaker Media Inc.
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]