In re: Specialty Products Holding Corp., et al.

Appellee: Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants and Eric D. Green
Appellant: Bondex International Inc. and Specialty Products Holding Corp.
Debtor: Specialty Products Holding Corp.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01244
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/28/13. (cak)
August 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Withdrawing the Bankruptcy Appeals from Mediation re: (16) Recommendation in case 1:13-cv-01244-SLR; (16) Recommendation in case 1:13-cv-01245-SLR. ORDER that briefing on the merits of the appeals is deferred pending resolution of the pendi ng motions. ORDER that Civ. No. 13-1244, Civ. No. 13-1245 and Misc. No. 13-194 are consolidated. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 13-1244-SLR. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/29/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01244-SLR, 1:13-cv-01245-SLR, 1:13-mc-00194-SLR(nmfn)
February 7, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/7/2014. (nmfn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Specialty Products Holding Corp., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants
Represented By: Davis Lee Wright
Represented By: Nathalie Diane Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Eric D. Green
Represented By: John T. Dorsey
Represented By: Erin Edwards
Represented By: Edwin J. Harron
Represented By: James L. Patton, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Matava Zieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bondex International Inc.
Represented By: Zachary I. Shapiro
Represented By: Paul N. Heath
Represented By: Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Specialty Products Holding Corp.
Represented By: Zachary I. Shapiro
Represented By: Tyler Dautel Semmelman
Represented By: Paul N. Heath
Represented By: Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Specialty Products Holding Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.