USA v. Veolia Environment North America Operations Inc.

Petitioner: USA
Respondent: Veolia Environment North America Operations Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013mc00003
Filed: January 4, 2013
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by USA. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/13. (ntl)
October 31, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 1 MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/31/2014. (rpg)
November 17, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1 Motion to Enforce IRS Summons. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/17/2014. (rpg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. Veolia Environment North America Operations Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Nathan Strup
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Veolia Environment North America Operations Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]