UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AT&T, INC. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: AT&T, INC. and DOBSON COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2007cv01952
Filed: October 30, 2007
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25 Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 1/14/2009. Granting, oral motion for Wilson Mudge to appear Pro Hac Vice for this hearing only. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
January 14, 2009 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 1/14/09. (See Order for detail) (gdf)
January 14, 2009 15 NOTICE Stipulation for Entry of Order and Settlement Agreement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 14 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendant AT&T Inc. should not be found in Civil Contempt (Burchuk, Hillary)
January 14, 2009 14 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendant AT&T Inc. should not be found in Civil Contempt by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Final Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Preservation of Assets Stipulation and Order)(Burchuk, Hillary)
March 20, 2008 13 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 11 the government's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 20, 2008. (lcesh1)
March 20, 2008 12 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 3/20/08. (gdf)
March 17, 2008 11 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Final Judgment)(Burchuk, Hillary)
March 17, 2008 10 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Publication)(Burchuk, Hillary)
March 4, 2008 9 RESPONSE to Public Comments filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Comments of Mid-Tex Cellular, Ltd.)(Burchuk, Hillary)
November 9, 2007 8 NOTICE Certification of Defendants Pursuant to 15 USC s 16(g) by AT&T, INC., DOBSON COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (Rosen, Richard)
November 6, 2007 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER vacating 7 the Final Judgment entered on November 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/6/2007. (KF)
November 5, 2007 7 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plainitff, United States of America against Defendants, AT&T Inc. and Dobson Communication Corporation. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/2/07. (gdf)
November 5, 2007 6 Featured Case PRESERVATION OF ASSETS STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/2/07. (gdf)
November 2, 2007 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Lawrence Rosen on behalf of AT&T, INC. (Rosen, Richard)
November 1, 2007 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Judge Rosemary M. Collyer no longer assigned to the case. (tg, )
October 31, 2007 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Roberti on behalf of DOBSON COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (Roberti, John)
October 30, 2007 SUMMONS Not Issued as to AT&T, INC., DOBSON COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (tg, )
October 30, 2007 2 COMPETITIVE IMPACT STATEMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (tg, )
October 30, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T, INC., DOBSON COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AT&T, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Hillary B. Burchuk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOBSON COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION
Represented By: John Roberti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]