IN RE: RAIL FREIGHT FUEL SURCHARGE ANTITRUST LITIGATION - MDL 1869

Plaintiff: DAKOTA GRANITE COMPANY, MCINTYRE GROUP, LTD., GVL PIPE & DEMOLITION, INC., FERRARO FOODS OF NORTH CAROLINA, LLC, SUBLETTE COOPERATIVE, INC., STRATES SHOWS, INC., WEST ALABAMA SAND & GRAVEL, INC., CEDAR FARMS CO., INC., DAD'S PRODUCTS CO., INC., ZINIFEX TAYLOR CHEMICALS, INC., DUST PRO, INC., QUALITY REFRACTORIES INSTALLATION, INC. and NIZHNEKAMSKNEFTEKHIM USA, INC.
Defendant: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN RAILROADS, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY and UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2007mc00489
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2009 291 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 7/2/09. (lcjmf1)
October 23, 2009 313 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 10/23/2009. (lcjmf1)
June 7, 2010 370 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 340 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 06/07/2010. (lcjmf1)
June 7, 2010 371 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 340 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 06/07/2010. (lcjmf1)
September 28, 2010 436 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re: In Camera Review of Union Pacific Railway Company Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 09/28/2010. (lcjmf1)
November 17, 2011 534 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 533 ORDER re 506 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/17/11. (lcjmf1)
November 30, 2011 535 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 511 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/30/11. (lcjmf1)
June 21, 2012 540 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 337 direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification; granting 537 direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for order directing parties to meet and confer concerning scheduling. By July 10, 2012, the parties shall meet and confer and shall file a joint report showing cause why the Opinion issued under seal this same day should not be published in full without redactions on the public docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 6/21/2012. (zmm, )
July 13, 2012 549 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' request for redactions, as set forth under seal in Attachment A [544-2] to the parties' joint report; and ordering that the Clerk of this Court shall publish on the public docket the redacted version of this Court's June 21, 2012 Opinion granting the direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 13, 2012. (lcplf1)
July 13, 2012 550 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLIC OPINION of June 21, 2012 granting the direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 21, 2012. (lcplf1)
September 20, 2012 617 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION denying defedants' motion to stay proceedings under Rule 23(f) as it pertains to expert discovery and briefing of the Daubert and summary judgment issues and granting the motion as it pertains to class notice. An order consistent with this opinion will be issued this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 20, 2012. (MA)
September 3, 2013 668 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION denying Oxbow's motion to disqualify Latham & Watkins LLP. An appropriate order accompanies this opinion. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 3, 2013. (MA)
November 12, 2014 750 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re issues the parties should be prepared to discuss at the November 13, 2014 hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 12, 2014. (MA)
November 26, 2014 756 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 742 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a supplemental expert report. Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental expert report on or before April 1, 2015; defendants shall notify the Court on or before April 15, 2015 whe ther they intend to file an additional expert report in response and propose a date by which they will do so; the parties shall jointly propose on or before April 22, 2015 a schedule for defendants' deposition of plaintiffs' supplemental expert, the deposition of defendants' expert, if necessary, and further briefing, if necessary. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 26, 2014. (MA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: RAIL FREIGHT FUEL SURCHARGE ANTITRUST LITIGATION - MDL 1869
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAKOTA GRANITE COMPANY
Represented By: Benjamin D. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCINTYRE GROUP, LTD.
Represented By: James Shedden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GVL PIPE & DEMOLITION, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin D. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERRARO FOODS OF NORTH CAROLINA, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin D. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUBLETTE COOPERATIVE, INC.
Represented By: Krishna B. Narine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRATES SHOWS, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin D. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST ALABAMA SAND & GRAVEL, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDAR FARMS CO., INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAD'S PRODUCTS CO., INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZINIFEX TAYLOR CHEMICALS, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUST PRO, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUALITY REFRACTORIES INSTALLATION, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIZHNEKAMSKNEFTEKHIM USA, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN RAILROADS
Represented By: David Irving Gelfand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Gary A. Winters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KANSAS CITY SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]