UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED and SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00322
Filed: February 25, 2008
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2008 19 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Appear as Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 24, 2008. (lcesh2)
September 24, 2008 18 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/24/08. (gdf)
September 24, 2008 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2008. Granting in part 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION; Granting 13 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Court Reporter Lisa Grifffith) (gdf)
September 23, 2008 17 Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Intervene for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mucchetti, Peter)
September 22, 2008 16 Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Lerner, Arthur)
September 18, 2008 15 MOTION to Intervene by AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix A - Attachment A, # 3 Appendix A - Attachment B, # 4 Appendix A - Attachment C, # 5 Appendix B, # 6 Appendix C, # 7 Certificate of Service)(nmw, )
September 3, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
August 27, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER setting a hearing regarding 13 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment on September 24, 2008, 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 14. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 27, 2008. (lcesh2)
August 25, 2008 14 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Las Vegas Review-Journal Notice, # 2 Washington Post Notice)(Mucchetti, Peter)
August 25, 2008 13 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Mucchetti, Peter)
August 22, 2008 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 12 defendants' Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Barbara Helen Ryland and Valerie Hinko O'Such are admitted to practice before this Court for purposes of representing defendants in the captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/22/2008. (VT)
August 21, 2008 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barbara H. Ryland; Valerie H. O'Such, :Firm- Crowell & Moring LLP, :Address- 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Washington, DC 20004. Phone No. - 202-624-2500. Fax No. - 202-628-5116 by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ryland Declaration, # 2 Exhibit O'Such Declaration)(Lerner, Arthur)
July 7, 2008 11 RESPONSE TO PUBLIC COMMENTS in Antitrust Case by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Comment, # 2 AMA Attachment A, # 3 AMA Attachment B, # 4 AMA Attachment C, # 5 Velazquez Comment, # 6 Velazquez Attachment A, # 7 SEIU Comment, # 8 Giunchigliani Comment)(Mucchetti, Peter)
April 10, 2008 10 NOTICE of Extension of Divestiture Deadline by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Mucchetti, Peter)
March 14, 2008 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott P. Perlman on behalf of UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (Perlman, Scott)
March 13, 2008 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Bloch on behalf of UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (Bloch, Robert)
March 5, 2008 7 NOTICE Corrected Report and Certification of Compliance with Tunney Act Requirements by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED (Lerner, Arthur)
March 5, 2008 6 NOTICE Report and Certification of Compliance with Tunney Act Requirements by UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED (Lerner, Arthur)
March 5, 2008 5 NOTICE Report and Certification of Compliance with Tunney Act Requirements by SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (Lerner, Arthur)
March 5, 2008 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Norman Lerner on behalf of UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (Lerner, Arthur)
February 25, 2008 3 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/25/08. (gdf)
February 25, 2008 SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (jf, )
February 25, 2008 2 COMPETITIVE IMPACT STATEMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jf, )
February 25, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED, SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Peter Joseph Mucchetti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIERRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]