VENTURA et al v. BEBO FOODS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: JESUS VENTURA, ROSA RIVAS and MOHAMMED DOUH
Defendant: BEBO FOODS, INC., GALILEO RESTAURANT, RD TRATTORIA, INC., BEBO TRATTORIA RESTAURANT and ROBERTO DONNA
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00621
Filed: April 10, 2008
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2009 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/2/09. (lcrcl2, )
July 27, 2010 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Order 49 granting plaintiffs' motion 42 for summary judgment with respect to Donna's personal liability and deferring ruling on plaintiffs' motion 48 for damages. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/27/2010. (lcrcl2, )
December 3, 2010 53 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on December 3, 2010. (lcrcl4) Modified on 12/3/2010 (rje, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: VENTURA et al v. BEBO FOODS, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS VENTURA
Represented By: Denise Marie Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA RIVAS
Represented By: Denise Marie Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED DOUH
Represented By: Denise Marie Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEBO FOODS, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALILEO RESTAURANT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD TRATTORIA, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEBO TRATTORIA RESTAURANT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTO DONNA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]