CONTINENTAL TRANSFERT TECHNIQUE LIMITED v. FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE FEDRATION, MINISTER OF THE INTERIOR

Plaintiff: CONTINENTAL TRANSFERT TECHNIQUE LIMITED
Defendant: FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE FEDRATION, MINISTER OF THE INTERIOR
Case Number: 1:2008cv02026
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 09:0202 Award under Convention on Foreign Arbitral Awards

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 defendants' Motion to Dismiss the amended complaint; denying as moot 10 plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; denying as moot 24 defendants' Motion to Dismiss the original complaint; granting 24 defendants' Motion to Vacate the Clerk's entry of default. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 23, 2010. (MA)
March 23, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION denying Continental's motion for default judgment, granting Nigeria's motion to vacate the Clerk's entry of default, denying Nigeria's motion to dismiss in its entirety, including that portion of the motion which the Court has converted into a motion for summary judgment. An order consistent with this opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 23, 2010. (MA)
August 3, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. An order consistent with this memorandum opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2011. (MA)
March 27, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION granting in part and holding in abeyance in part Continental's motion to correct clerical mistake or mistake arising from oversight or omission. An order consistent with this opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 27, 2012. (MA)
March 26, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION holding that Continental is entitled to an amendment of the Court's Order and Judgment of August 3, 2011 and will be awarded postjudgment interest. An Amended Order and Judgment will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 26, 2013. (MA)
May 21, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 70 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 5/21/14. (SP, )
January 27, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying in part and holding in abeyance in part Nigeria's motion to strike and for a protective order 70 . Continental shall file a supplemental memorandum on or before February 10, 2015 addressing Nigeria's a rgument that it is not the proper subject of a Rule 30(b)(6) notice of deposition, and whether Nigeria waived this argument by failing to raise it in its motion; and Nigeria shall file a supplemental memorandum on or before February 25, 2015 addressing the same issues. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 27, 2015. (MA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONTINENTAL TRANSFERT TECHNIQUE LIMITED v. FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE FEDRATION, MINISTER OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONTINENTAL TRANSFERT TECHNIQUE LIMITED
Represented By: Shaun Michael Gehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE FEDRATION, MINISTER OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]