VILLERY v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al

Plaintiff: WILLIE VILLERY
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, DC OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC., UNITY HEALTH CARE, INC., GREATER SOUTHEAST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL and GANGAGEE BALKISSOON
Case Number: 1:2010cv00630
Filed: April 22, 2010
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/27/2011. (DJMAC, )
November 17, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 5 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 11/17/2011. (DJMAC, )
January 4, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/4/2012. (DJMAC, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VILLERY v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE VILLERY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Kymian D. Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Kymian D. Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Kymian D. Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITY HEALTH CARE, INC.
Represented By: Kymian D. Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREATER SOUTHEAST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kymian D. Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GANGAGEE BALKISSOON
Represented By: Kymian D. Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]