HENOK v. CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC et al

Plaintiff: ARAYA HENOK
Defendant: CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC, SHAPIRO & BURSON, LLP and FANNIE MAE
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00292
Filed: February 22, 2012
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Fannie Mae's motions to terminate proceedings or, in the alternative, to dismiss [Dkt. No. 75 in Civil Action No. 12-0292; Dkt. 72 in Civil Action No. 12-0336] are GRANTED; Fannie Mae is dismissed as as party to the above-captioned civil actions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 31, 2014. (MA)
August 5, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Fannie Mae's motions to terminate proceedings or, in the alternative, to dismiss [Dkt. No. 75 in Civil Action No. 12-0292; Dkt. 72 in Civil Action No. 12-0336] are GRANTED; Fannie Mae is dismissed as a party to the above-captioned civil actions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 5, 2014. (lcplf2)
January 15, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion 30 for leave to amend the complaint and denying defendants' motions 20 , 23 as moot. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/15/13. (lcrwr1)
February 25, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the plaintiff's motions 11 , 26 for partial summary judgment and entering judgment for Chase concerning the notice of default claim, and denying the plaintiff's motion 17 to strike Shapiro's opposition and denying the plaintiff's motions 32 , 33 for sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/25/13. (lcrwr1)
February 26, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/26/13. (lcrwr1)
June 17, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the plaintiff's motion 50 for partial summary judgment and granting Chase's cross-motion 56 for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/17/13. (lcrwr1)
July 29, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying Henok's motion 61 for reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/29/13. (lcrwr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HENOK v. CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARAYA HENOK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC
Represented By: Paul A. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO & BURSON, LLP
Represented By: Gregory Nelson Britto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FANNIE MAE
Represented By: Paul A. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]