HENOK v. CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC et al

Plaintiff: ARAYA HENOK
Defendant: CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC, SHAPIRO & BURSON, LLP, MARCO ACEVEDO and FANNIE MAE
Case Number: 1:2012cv00336
Filed: March 1, 2012
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Fannie Mae's motions to terminate proceedings or, in the alternative, to dismiss [Dkt. No. 75 in Civil Action No. 12-0292; Dkt. 72 in Civil Action No. 12-0336] are GRANTED; Fannie Mae is dismissed as a party to the above-captioned civil actions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 5, 2014. (lcplf2)
January 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion 22 for leave to amend the complaint and denying defendants' motions 12 , 15 as moot. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/16/13. (lcrwr1)
February 26, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's motion 18 for partial summary judgment and entering judgment for Chase concerning the notice of default claim and denying plaintiff's motions 24 , 25 for sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/26/13. (lcrwr1)
May 30, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's motion 35 for partial summary judgment and granting Chase's cross-motion 37 for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/30/13. (lcrwr1)
July 29, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying Henok's motion 57 for reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/29/13. (lcrwr1)
July 31, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Fannie Mae's motions to terminate proceedings or, in the alternative, to dismiss [Dkt. No. 75 in Civil Action No. 12-0292; Dkt. 72 in Civil Action No. 12-0336] are GRANTED; Fannie Mae is dismissed as as party to the above-captioned civil actions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 31, 2014. (MA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENOK v. CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARAYA HENOK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC
Represented By: Todd D. Ross
Represented By: Paul A. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO & BURSON, LLP
Represented By: Gregory Nelson Britto
Represented By: Matthew Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCO ACEVEDO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FANNIE MAE
Represented By: Paul A. Kaplan
Represented By: Todd D. Ross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]