VIRTUE v. INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS RETIREMENT AND FAMILY PROTECTION PLAN et al

Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS and INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS RETIREMENT AND FAMILY PROTECTION PLAN
Plaintiff: DANIEL A. VIRTUE
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00516
Filed: April 4, 2012
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 23 Order denying Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/22/2012. (lcjeb2)
September 27, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. The proposed Amended Complaint is deemed FILED and Defendants shall file a responsive pleading after service has been effected.Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/27/12. (lcjeb4)
April 25, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 38 ORDER denying class certification. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/25/2013. (lcjeb3)
November 4, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion re 43 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/4/2013. (lcjeb4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: VIRTUE v. INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS RETIREMENT AND FAMILY PROTECTION PLAN et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS
Represented By: James Charles Bailey
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS RETIREMENT AND FAMILY PROTECTION PLAN
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cohen
Represented By: James Charles Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL A. VIRTUE
Represented By: Joseph Semo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]