ROLLING THUNDER MOTORCYCLE RALLY, WASHINGTON, D.C., INC. v. DOES et al Featured Case

The Rolling Thunder Motorcycle Rally, an annual motorcycle ride sponsored by veterans to honor their missing and fallen colleagues files a preemptive copyright infringement lawsuit in advance of the group's Memorial Day ride in Washington, D.C. to stop and enjoin alleged copyright infringers from selling unlicensed and counterfeit goods during the event.

Photo credit: Pak Gwei via Flickr

Plaintiff: ROLLING THUNDER MOTORCYCLE RALLY, WASHINGTON, D.C., INC.
Defendant: JOHN DOES, JANE DOES and ABC COMPANIES
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00725
Filed: May 4, 2012
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2012 14 Featured Case ORDER FOR RETURN OF BOND DEPOSIT AND CANCELLATION OF HEARING. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on June 4, 2012. (cdw)
June 1, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER approving 12 Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The hearing scheduled on June 5, 2012 is cancelled. The case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/1/2012. (KD)
May 31, 2012 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Return of Property - Bond Deposit - by ROLLING THUNDER MOTORCYCLE RALLY, WASHINGTON, D.C., INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Return of Bond Deposit and Cancellation of Hearing)(Hudis, Jonathan)
May 31, 2012 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROLLING THUNDER MOTORCYCLE RALLY, WASHINGTON, D.C., INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudis, Jonathan)
May 23, 2012 Summons Issued as to (25) ABC COMPANIES, (50) JANE DOES, (75) JOHN DOES. (rdj)
May 22, 2012 BOND in the amount of $ 2,000 Receipt No. 4616048457 received from OBLON, SPIVAK, MCCLELLAND, MAIER & NEUSTADT, PC posted by ROLLING THUNDER MOTORCYCLE RALLY, WASHINGTON, D.C., INC. (rdj)
May 21, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
May 17, 2012 11 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on May 17, 2012. (cdw)
May 17, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE JOHN DOE SUMMONSES. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on May 17, 2012. (cdw)
May 17, 2012 9 Featured Case IMPOUNDMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on May 17, 2012. (cdw) Modified on 5/21/2012 (zcdw).
May 17, 2012 8 Featured Case SEARCH ORDER signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on May 17, 2012. (cdw)
May 4, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against ABC COMPANIES, JANE DOES, JOHN DOES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616047985) filed by ROLLING THUNDER MOTORCYCLE RALLY, WASHINGTON, D.C., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ROLLING THUNDER MOTORCYCLE RALLY, WASHINGTON, D.C., INC. v. DOES et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLLING THUNDER MOTORCYCLE RALLY, WASHINGTON, D.C., INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Hudis
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Kaufman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]