August 3, 2018 |
Filing 82
MANDATE of USCA as to #80 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. USCA Case Number 18-5062. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(zrdj)
|
March 1, 2018 |
USCA Case Number 18-5062 for #80 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (zrdj)
|
February 23, 2018 |
Filing 81
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #80 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
|
February 22, 2018 |
Filing 80
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #68 Order, #78 Order on Motion for Judgment by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5343968. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Jacob, Gregory)
|
February 21, 2018 |
Filing 79
ERRATA by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING #77 Joint MOTION for Judgment filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Jacob, Gregory)
|
February 16, 2018 |
Filing 78
ORDER AND JUDGMENT granting #77 Joint Motion for Requesting Entry of Judgment Against Plaintiffs and entering JUDGMENT. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 16, 2018. (AG)
|
February 16, 2018 |
Filing 77
Joint MOTION for Judgment by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing 76
NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence DeMille-Wagman on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY (DeMille-Wagman, Lawrence)
|
March 20, 2017 |
Filing 75
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kristin Lee Bateman on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY Substituting for attorney Matthew Berns, Justin Sandberg (Bateman, Kristin)
|
February 9, 2017 |
Filing 74
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 1-17-17; Page Numbers: 1-24. Date of Issuance:2-9-17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa W GRIFFITH, Telephone number 2023543247, Tape Number: Lisa_Griffith@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 3/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2017.(Griffith, Lisa)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 1/17/2017. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
|
January 16, 2017 |
Filing 73
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R.F. Gustafson on behalf of 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., ALL PLAINTIFFS, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING (Gustafson, Adam)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing 72
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF COURT re #71 Order filed by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY. (Sandberg, Justin) Modified link on 1/12/2017 (znmw).
|
January 5, 2017 |
Filing 71
ORDER granting #70 plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Hearing. The hearing will be held on January 17, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. Defendants shall file a brief response stating their position on how to proceed by January 11, 2017. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 5, 2017. (lcesh1)
|
January 4, 2017 |
Filing 70
Unopposed MOTION for Hearing by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
December 23, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Status Conference on January 17, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 23, 2016. (lcesh1)
|
December 23, 2016 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #69 Status Report was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as a proper pleading. (Counsel should review LCvR 5.1 (a) CORRESPONDENCE WITH THE COURT) (jf)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing 69
ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. (Jacob, Gregory) Modified on 12/23/2016 (jf).
|
July 12, 2016 |
Filing 68
ORDER denying in part #53 plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and granting in part #59 defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 12, 2016. (lcesh1)
|
July 12, 2016 |
Filing 67
MEMORANDUM OPINION re #53 #59 parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 12, 2016. (lcesh1)
|
May 9, 2016 |
Filing 66
RESPONSE re #65 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., ALL PLAINTIFFS, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jacob, Gregory) Modified on 5/10/2016 to correct docket text (jf).
|
April 26, 2016 |
Filing 65
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY (Attachments: #1 CFPB v. Gordon, #2 Advanced Disposal Services East, Inc. v. NLRB)(Berns, Matthew)
|
March 28, 2016 |
Filing 64
REPLY to opposition to motion re #59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Dismissal and Combined Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY. (Berns, Matthew)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing 63
REPLY to opposition to motion re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
February 24, 2016 |
Filing 62
RESPONSE re #59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Dismissal filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts)(Jacob, Gregory) Modified on 2/25/2016 to correct docket text (jf).
|
February 17, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #61 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Consent Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of their motion for summary judgment no later than Wednesday, February 24, 2016; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment no later than Monday, March 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 17, 2016. (AG)
|
February 16, 2016 |
Filing 61
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing 60
Memorandum in opposition to re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Berns, Matthew)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing 59
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Dismissal by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) Modified on 1/11/2016 (jf).
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing 58
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Justin Michael Sandberg on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Bradley Cohen, Ethan Davis, Jonathan Cooper, Wendy Doty (Sandberg, Justin)
|
December 2, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and consolidated memorandum in support of defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before January 8, 2016; plaintiffs' consolidated memorandum in opposition to defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before February 22, 2016; defendants' reply in support of defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before March 25, 2016. (zmm)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing 57
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by CONSUMERS' RESEARCH (jf)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing 56
AMICUS BRIEF by CONSUMERS' RESEARCH. (jf)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing 55
Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing 54
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by SEAN P. DUFFY, CONSUMERS' RESEARCH (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Certificate of Corporate Disclosure, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
|
December 1, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #55 Motion to Modify. Having considered defendants' unopposed motion to modify briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that (1) defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and consolidated memorandum in support of defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before January 8, 2016; (2) plaintiffs' consolidated memorandum in opposition to defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before February 22, 2016; and (3) defendants' reply in support of defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before March 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 1, 2015. (lcesh1)
|
December 1, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to File. Having considered the unopposed motion of Rep. Sean P. Duffy and Consumers' Research for leave to file an amicus brief in support of plaintiffs, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the amicus brief submitted along with that motion [ECF No. 54-1] is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 1, 2015. (lcesh1)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing 53
MOTION for Summary Judgment by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
October 6, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Summary Judgment motion due by 11/6/2015. Response and Cross Motion due by 12/21/2015. Cross Motion response and reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/4/2016. Cross Motion reply due 3/7/2016. (zmm)
|
October 5, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' proposed briefing schedule for their cross-motions for summary judgment, it is hereby ORDERED that the proposed schedule is adopted, as follows: plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and memorandum in support (45 pages) will be filed no later than November 6, 2015; defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and consolidated memorandum in support of defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (50 pages) will be filed no later than December 21, 2015; plaintiffs' consolidated memorandum in opposition to defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (45 pages) will be filed no later than February 4, 2016; and defendants' reply in support of defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment (30 pages) will be filed no later than March 7, 2016. In light of the foregoing, the Court will cancel the status conference previously scheduled for October 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 5, 2015. (lcesh1)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing 52
Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY. (Berns, Matthew)
|
September 21, 2015 |
Filing 51
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #45 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, #46 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF GEORGIA. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby affirmed in part, reversed in part, and the case is remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. USCA Case Number 13-5247; Consolidated with 13-5248. (rd)
|
September 17, 2015 |
Filing 50
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Berns on behalf of All Defendants (Berns, Matthew)
|
September 17, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 9/30/2015 Status Conference set for 10/7/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zmm)
|
September 16, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: The mandate from the Court of Appeals having issued, it is hereby ORDERED that a Status Conference to address further proceedings is set for October 7, 2015, at 11:30 a.m.; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report identifying the issues remaining for the Court to decide and a proposed briefing schedule by September 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 16, 2015. (AG)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 49
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 6/12/13; Page Numbers: 1-108. Date of Issuance:5/1/14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Court Reporter Email Address : patfromhawaii@aol.com. <
< < Redaction Request due 5/22/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014.(Kaneshiro-Miller, Patricia)
|
August 12, 2013 |
USCA Case Number 13-5247 for #45 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (jf, ) .
|
August 12, 2013 |
USCA Case Number 13-5248 for #46 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF GEORGIA. (jf, ) .
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing 48
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #46 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (rdj)
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing 47
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #45 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (rdj)
|
August 2, 2013 |
Filing 46
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #44 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3422373. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Pruitt, Edward)
|
August 2, 2013 |
Filing 45
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #44 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3421955. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Jacob, Gregory)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing 44
ORDER granting #26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for the reasons stated in the accompanying #43 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/1/13. (lcesh1)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing 43
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/1/13. (lcesh1)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing 42
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 41
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Private Plaintiffs' #40 Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. (Jacob, Gregory)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 40
RESPONSE re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief filed by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN. (Cohen, Bradley)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing 39
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN. (Davis, Ethan)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing 38
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Private Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of the Court's Jurisdiction Over Count II of the Second Amended Complaint filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. (Jacob, Gregory)
|
July 17, 2013 |
Filing 37
ORDER. The parties shall file supplemental briefs, as described herein, by close of business on July 19, 2013, and responses by close of business on July 22, 2013. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/17/13. (lcesh1)
|
July 17, 2013 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Briefs due by 7/19/2013. Responses due by 7/22/2013. (zmm, )
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing 36
NOTICE of Filing Third Supplemental Declaration in Support of Private Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING re #27 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Declaration Third Supplemental Declaration of Gregory Jacob in Support of Private Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
June 13, 2013 |
Filing 35
NOTICE of Filing of Second Declaration of Jim R. Purcell by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING re #27 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jim R. Purcell)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
June 12, 2013 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2013 re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Pat Kaneshiro-Miller.) (zmm, )
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing 34
NOTICE of Filing of Second Supplemental Declaration in Support of Private Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING re #27 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Supplemental Declaration in Support of Private Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
June 7, 2013 |
Filing 33
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jonathan Gordon Cooper on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Wendy Doty (Cooper, Jonathan)
|
May 29, 2013 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zmm, )
|
May 28, 2013 |
ORDER Setting Hearing on #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2013 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/28/13. (lcesh1)
|
May 3, 2013 |
Filing 32
SURREPLY to re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Jacob, Gregory)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing 31
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
April 23, 2013 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Leave to File a Surreply, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Surreply Brief shall be no more than ten pages and shall be filed no later than May 3, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/23/13. (lcesh1)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Surreply Brief due by 5/3/2013. (gdf)
|
April 9, 2013 |
Filing 30
REPLY to opposition to motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Davis, Ethan)
|
March 14, 2013 |
Filing 29
NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Declaration in Support of Private Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING re #27 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing 28
Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pruitt, Edward)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing 27
Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
February 23, 2013 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 23, 2013. (AG)
|
February 22, 2013 |
Filing 26
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Bradley)
|
February 22, 2013 |
Filing 25
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., ALL PLAINTIFFS, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing 24
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN filed by STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF KANSAS, ALL PLAINTIFFS, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF OHIO.(jf, )
|
February 19, 2013 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Dismiss the second amended complaint due by 3/5/2013. Response due by 3/19/2013 Reply due by 4/9/2013. (gdf)
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing 23
ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot #17 Professor Victor Williams' Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus; granting #19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; denying as moot #21 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Briefing; directing that plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint shall be docketed as of this date; and setting out new briefing schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/19/13. (lcesh1)
|
February 15, 2013 |
Filing 22
RESPONSE re #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Complaint,,,, filed by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN. (Davis, Ethan)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing 21
MOTION to Stay re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing 20
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Proposed Second Amended Complaint by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA re #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Complaint,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing 19
MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Complaint,,,, by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
January 28, 2013 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint due by 2/13/2013. (gdf)
|
January 24, 2013 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted, and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their responses to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by February 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 24, 2013. (AG)
|
January 23, 2013 |
Filing 18
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
December 3, 2012 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint due by 1/30/2013 (gdf)
|
November 30, 2012 |
Filing 17
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by VICTOR WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(rdj)
|
November 30, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their responses to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) by January 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 30, 2012. (AG)
|
November 29, 2012 |
Filing 16
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
November 20, 2012 |
Filing 15
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Doty, Wendy)
|
November 16, 2012 |
Filing 14
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Bradley)
|
November 16, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limitation, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted, and it is further ORDERED that Defendants may file a brief in support of their motion to dismiss in excess of the Courts forty-five page limitation, not to exceed fifty (50) pages. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 16, 2012. (AG)
|
October 22, 2012 |
Filing 13
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Wyrick on behalf of STATE OF OKLAHOMA (Wyrick, Patrick)
|
October 20, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Upon consideration of Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted, and it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint no later than November 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 20, 2012. (AG)
|
October 19, 2012 |
Filing 12
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Complaint,,,, by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, THOMAS M. HOENIG, DEBBIE MATZ, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, MARY SCHAPIRO, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, JANET L. YELLEN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Bradley)
|
October 12, 2012 |
Filing 11
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM served on 10/9/2012; ELIZABETH DUKE served on 10/9/2012; FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION served on 10/9/2012; THOMAS M. HOENIG served on 10/9/2012; JEREMIAH NORTON served on 10/9/2012; JEROME POWELL served on 10/9/2012; SARAH BLOOM RASKIN served on 10/9/2012; JEREMY B. STEIN served on 10/9/2012; DANIEL K. TARULLO served on 10/9/2012; JANET L. YELLEN served on 10/9/2012 (Jacob, Gregory)
|
October 4, 2012 |
Filing 10
NOTICE of Appearance by James Emory Smith, Jr on behalf of STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Smith, James)
|
October 3, 2012 |
Filing 9
Electronic Summons (10) Issued as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, ELIZABETH DUKE, FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, THOMAS M. HOENIG, JEREMIAH NORTON, JEROME POWELL, SARAH BLOOM RASKIN, JEREMY B. STEIN, DANIEL K. TARULLO, JANET L. YELLEN. (Attachments: #1 Consent Notice)(rdj)
|
October 2, 2012 |
Filing 8
NOTICE of Filing of Summonses Addressed to Defendants Joined as Parties in the First Amended Complaint by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING re #6 Complaint,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summonses Addressed to Defendants Joined as Parties in the First Amended Complaint)(Jacob, Gregory)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing 7
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BENJAMIN BERNANKE served on 6/28/2012; CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 6/28/2012; RICHARD CORDRAY served on 6/28/2012; THOMAS CURRY served on 6/29/2012; FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL served on 6/29/2012; TIMOTHY GEITHNER served on 6/29/2012; GARY GENSLER served on 6/29/2012; MARTIN GRUENBERG served on 6/29/2012; DEBBIE MATZ served on 6/26/2012; MARY SCHAPIRO served on 6/29/2012; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 6/29/2012; S. ROY WOODALL served on 6/28/2012, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/26/2012., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/26/2012. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/25/2012.) (Jacob, Gregory)
|
September 20, 2012 |
Filing 6
First Amended Complaint against BENJAMIN BERNANKE, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, DEBBIE MATZ, MARY SCHAPIRO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, Janet Yellen, Daniel Tarullo, Elizabeth Duke, Jeremiah Norton, Jerome Powell, Thomas Hoenig, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Jeremy Stein, Sarah Bloom Raskin ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-3075267) filed by STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE, Janet Yellen, Daniel Tarullo, Elizabeth Duke, Jeremiah Norton, State of South Carolina ex rel. Alan Wilson, Jerome Powell, Thomas Hoenig, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Bill Schuette, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Jeremy Stein, State of Oklahoma ex rel. Scott Pruitt, Sarah Bloom Raskin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Jacob, Gregory) Modified on 9/21/2012 (rdj).
|
August 15, 2012 |
Filing 5
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BENJAMIN BERNANKE, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, DEBBIE MATZ, MARY SCHAPIRO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doty, Wendy)
|
August 15, 2012 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy M. Doty on behalf of All Defendants (Doty, Wendy)
|
August 15, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respondto Plaintiffs' Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted, and it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint no later than October 26, 2012. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 15, 2012. (AG)
|
June 27, 2012 |
Filing 3
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory F. Jacob (jf, )
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing 2
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING identifying Corporate Parent SNB FINANCIAL, INC. for STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING. (dr)
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against BENJAMIN BERNANKE, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, DEBBIE MATZ, MARY SCHAPIRO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616049445) filed by 60 PLUS ASSOCIATION, INC., STATE NATIONAL BANK OF BIG SPRING, COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr)
|
June 21, 2012 |
SUMMONS (14) Issued as to BENJAMIN BERNANKE, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, RICHARD CORDRAY, THOMAS CURRY, FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL, TIMOTHY GEITHNER, GARY GENSLER, MARTIN GRUENBERG, DEBBIE MATZ, MARY SCHAPIRO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, S. ROY WOODALL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
|