FELD v. FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: KENNETH FELD
Defendant: FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2012cv01789
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: John D. Bates
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 07/03/2013. (lcjdb1)
December 23, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/23/2013. (lcjdb1)
April 16, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/16/2014. (lcjdb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FELD v. FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH FELD
Represented By: Kimberly Hope Caine
Represented By: Matthew H. Kirtland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Thomas S. Schaufelberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]