COMPTON et al v. SORORITY, INC. et al

Plaintiff: SANDRA COMPTON, LAURIN COMPTON, LESSIE COFIELD and LAUREN COFIELD
Defendant: ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA SORORITY INCORPORATED and HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2013cv00262
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/11/2013. (lcrmc2)
August 12, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/12/2014. (lcrmc1)
February 18, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/18/2015. (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMPTON et al v. SORORITY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA COMPTON
Represented By: Jon Wyndal Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURIN COMPTON
Represented By: Jon Wyndal Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESSIE COFIELD
Represented By: Jon Wyndal Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN COFIELD
Represented By: Jon Wyndal Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA SORORITY INCORPORATED
Represented By: Justin Michael Flint
Represented By: Laura M.K. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Lydia Auzoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.