THOMAS v. NAPOLITANO et al

Plaintiff: BURT C THOMAS
Defendant: JANET A. NAPOLITANO and US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2013cv00359
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/16/2014. (lcgk3, )
November 3, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re: documents submitted for in camera review and privilege rulings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 11/03/14. (DM)
January 26, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited, Specific Discovery after the Discovery Deadline 60 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 01/26/15. (DM)
March 30, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Re: Plaintiff's Second Amended Motion to Compel a 30(b)(6) Deposition 72 . A separate Order follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 03/30/15. (DM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. NAPOLITANO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BURT C THOMAS
Represented By: Phillip Robert Kete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET A. NAPOLITANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.