August 14, 2023 |
Filing 268
RESPONSE re #267 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY Petitioner's Response to the Russian Federation's Notice of Supplemental Authorities filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED. (Shepard, Steven)
|
August 9, 2023 |
Filing 267
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
May 16, 2023 |
Filing 266
RESPONSE re #265 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shepard, Steven)
|
May 12, 2023 |
Filing 265
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 -- Annex A, #2 -- Annex B, #3 -- Annex C, #4 -- Annex D)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 27, 2022 |
Filing 264
SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #259 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #3 Exhibit Annex A to Reply)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 21, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: White & Case LLP's reply in support of its #259 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal due by 12/27/2022. (ztg)
|
December 20, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING White & Case LLP's #263 Unopposed Motion of White & Case LLP to Extend the Deadline for the Reply Submissions in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Motion for Leave to File Under Seal and DIRECTING White & Case LLP to file, by December 27, 2022, any reply in support of its #259 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 20, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
December 19, 2022 |
Filing 263
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #259 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 13, 2022 |
Filing 262
Memorandum in opposition to re #259 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, Petitioner's Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Motion to Withdraw filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Steven)
|
December 13, 2022 |
Filing 261
Memorandum in opposition to re #259 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, Petitioner's REDACTED Partial Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- High Court of Justice Business & Property Courts of England & Wales Order, #2 Exhibit 2-SDNY Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Ontario Superior Court of Justice Order, #4 Declaration Declaration of Steven M. Shepard, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Steven)
|
December 13, 2022 |
Filing 260
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petitioners' Partial Opposition to Respondents Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Steven)
|
November 29, 2022 |
Filing 259
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #4 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Withdraw, #5 Exhibit Motion to Withdraw Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit Annex 1 to Motion to Withdraw, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Carolyn Lamm, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Paradise, #9 Exhibit Expert Opinion)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
November 1, 2022 |
Filing 258
RESPONSE re #257 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix -- Annex A)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 18, 2022 |
Filing 257
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Supplemental Authority of the Federal Court of Switzerland:)(Shepard, Steven)
|
September 20, 2022 |
Filing 256
RESPONSE re #252 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by Petitioners concerning Chiejina v. Federal Republic of Nigeria, No. 21-cv-2241-RJL (D.D.C. Aug. 23, 2022) filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
September 15, 2022 |
Filing 255
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) to Declaration of Carolyn B. Lamm by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #254 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 1, #2 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 2, #3 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 3, #4 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 4, #5 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 5, #6 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 6, #7 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 7, #8 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 8, #9 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 9, #10 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 10, #11 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 11, #12 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 12, #13 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 13, #14 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 14, #15 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 15, #16 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 16, #17 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 17, #18 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 18, #19 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 19, #20 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 20, #21 Exhibit - Lamm Ex 21)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
September 15, 2022 |
Filing 254
REPLY to opposition to motion re #244 MOTION for Hearing and Depositions to Cross-Examine Petitioners' Witnesses filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
September 15, 2022 |
Filing 253
REPLY to opposition to motion re #246 MOTION for Leave to File a [Proposed] Supplemental Reply filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
September 14, 2022 |
Filing 252
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED (Shepard, Steven)
|
August 15, 2022 |
Filing 251
Memorandum in opposition to re #244 Motion for Hearing,, filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Shepard, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Shepard, Steven)
|
August 15, 2022 |
Filing 250
MOTION to Strike #248 Notice (Other), the Third Avtonomov Declaration [248-2] by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support and in Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act [dkt 246], #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Steven)
|
August 2, 2022 |
Filing 249
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) -- Foreign Legal Authorities (FRCP 44.1) for Third Declaration of Prof. Alexei S. Avtonomov by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #248 Notice (Other), filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix -- Appendix A to Prof. Avtonomov's Third Declaration, #2 Appendix -- Appendix B to Prof. Avtonomov's Third Declaration, #3 Appendix -- Appendix C to Prof. Avtonomov's Third Declaration, #4 Exhibit - ASA-113, #5 Exhibit - ASA-114, #6 Exhibit - ASA-115, #7 Exhibit - ASA-116, #8 Exhibit - ASA-117, #9 Exhibit - ASA-118, #10 Exhibit - ASA-119, #11 Exhibit - ASA-120, #12 Exhibit - ASA-121, #13 Exhibit - ASA-122, #14 Exhibit - ASA-123, #15 Exhibit - ASA-124, #16 Exhibit - ASA-125, #17 Exhibit - ASA-126, #18 Exhibit - ASA-127, #19 Exhibit - ASA-128, #20 Exhibit - ASA-129, #21 Exhibit - ASA-130, #22 Exhibit - ASA-131, #23 Exhibit - ASA-132, #24 Exhibit - ASA-133, #25 Exhibit - ASA-134, #26 Exhibit - ASA-135, #27 Exhibit - ASA-136, #28 Exhibit - ASA-137, #29 Exhibit - ASA-138)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 1, 2022 |
Filing 248
NOTICE of Serving the Discovery Requests and Third Declaration of Professor Avtonomov by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #244 Motion for Hearing,, #246 Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: #1 Affidavit on Proof of Service of Document Request, #2 Declaration of Professor Alexey Avtonomov)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 19, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to the Russian Federation's #244 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing and #246 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply due by 8/15/2022; reply in support of #244 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing and #246 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply due by 9/15/2022. (ztg)
|
July 18, 2022 |
Filing 247
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #244 MOTION for Hearing and Depositions to Cross-Examine Petitioners' Witnesses, #246 MOTION for Leave to File a [Proposed] Supplemental Reply by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Savage, Zachary)
|
July 18, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' #247 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and ENTERING the following SCHEDULING ORDER to govern further proceedings in this matter: 1) By August 15, 2022, Petitioners shall file any opposition to the Russian Federation's #244 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing and #246 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply; 2) By September 15, 2022, the Russian Federation shall file any reply in support of its #244 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing and #246 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 18, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
July 14, 2022 |
Filing 246
MOTION for Leave to File a [Proposed] Supplemental Reply by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Annex 1: [Proposed Supplemental Reply], #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 14, 2022 |
Filing 245
DECLARATION of Carolyn Lamm re Legal Authorities by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #244 MOTION for Hearing and Depositions to Cross-Examine Petitioners' Witnesses filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 - Lamm Ex 1, #2 - Lamm Ex 2, #3 - Lamm Ex 3, #4 - Lamm Ex 4, #5 - Lamm Ex 5, #6 - Lamm Ex 6, #7 - Lamm Ex 7, #8 - Lamm Ex 8, #9 - Lamm Ex 9, #10 - Lamm Ex 10, #11 - Lamm Ex 11, #12 - Lamm Ex 12, #13 - Lamm Ex 13, #14 - Lamm Ex 14, #15 - Lamm Ex 15, #16 - Lamm Ex 16, #17 - Lamm Ex 17, #18 - Lamm Ex 18, #19 - Lamm Ex 19)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 13, 2022 |
Filing 244
MOTION for Hearing and Depositions to Cross-Examine Petitioners' Witnesses by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Andrey Kondakov, #3 Appendix - Annex 1 - Supplemental Index of Documents, #4 Appendix - Annex 2, #5 Appendix - Annex 3, #6 - Exhibit 1, #7 - Exhibit 2, #8 - Exhibit 3, #9 - Exhibit 4, #10 - Exhibit 5, #11 - Exhibit 6, #12 - Exhibit 7, #13 - Exhibit 8, #14 - Exhibit 9, #15 - Exhibit 10, #16 - Exhibit 11, #17 - Exhibit 12)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 8, 2022 |
Filing 243
DECLARATION of Paul B. Stephan by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED re #239 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED, HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Annex 1, #2 Annex 2, #3 Annex 3, #4 Annex 4, #5 Annex 5, #6 Annex 6)(Shepard, Steven)
|
June 8, 2022 |
Filing 242
DECLARATION of Professor Ekaterina Mishina, Ph.D. by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED re #239 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED, HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Annex 1, #2 Annex 2, #3 Annex 3, #4 Annex 4, #5 Annex 5, #6 Annex 6, #7 Annex 7, #8 Annex 8, #9 Annex 9, #10 Annex 10, #11 Annex 11, #12 Annex 12, #13 Annex 13, #14 Annex 14, #15 Annex 15, #16 Annex 16, #17 Annex 17, #18 Annex 18, #19 Annex 19, #20 Annex 20, #21 Annex 21, #22 Annex 22, #23 Annex 23, #24 Annex 24)(Shepard, Steven)
|
June 8, 2022 |
Filing 241
DECLARATION of Michael Cotlick by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED re #239 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED, HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35)(Shepard, Steven)
|
June 8, 2022 |
Filing 240
DECLARATION of Steven M. Shepard, Esq. by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED re #239 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED, HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Shepard, Steven)
|
June 8, 2022 |
Filing 239
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #63 Memorandum in Opposition,,, Petitioners' Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LIMITED. (Shepard, Steven)
|
May 12, 2022 |
Filing 238
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #232 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #234 Declaration, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ASA-105, #2 Exhibit ASA-106, #3 Exhibit ASA-107, #4 Exhibit ASA-108, #5 Exhibit ASA-109, #6 Exhibit ASA-110, #7 Exhibit ASA-111, #8 Exhibit ASA-112)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
May 12, 2022 |
Filing 237
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #232 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #234 Declaration, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ASA-070, #2 Exhibit ASA-071, #3 Exhibit ASA-072, #4 Exhibit ASA-073, #5 Exhibit ASA-074, #6 Exhibit ASA-075, #7 Exhibit ASA-076, #8 Exhibit ASA-077, #9 Exhibit ASA-078, #10 Exhibit ASA-079, #11 Exhibit ASA-080, #12 Exhibit ASA-081, #13 Exhibit ASA-082, #14 Exhibit ASA-083, #15 Exhibit ASA-084, #16 Exhibit ASA-085, #17 Exhibit ASA-086, #18 Exhibit ASA-087, #19 Exhibit ASA-088, #20 Exhibit ASA-089, #21 Exhibit ASA-090, #22 Exhibit ASA-091, #23 Exhibit ASA-092, #24 Exhibit ASA-093, #25 Exhibit ASA-094, #26 Exhibit ASA-095, #27 Exhibit ASA-096, #28 Exhibit ASA-097, #29 Exhibit ASA-098, #30 Exhibit ASA-099, #31 Exhibit ASA-100, #32 Exhibit ASA-101, #33 Exhibit ASA-102, #34 Exhibit ASA-103, #35 Exhibit ASA-104)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
May 12, 2022 |
Filing 236
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #232 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #234 Declaration, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ASA-035, #2 Exhibit ASA-036, #3 Exhibit ASA-037, #4 Exhibit ASA-038, #5 Exhibit ASA-039, #6 Exhibit ASA-040, #7 Exhibit ASA-041, #8 Exhibit ASA-042, #9 Exhibit ASA-043, #10 Exhibit ASA-044, #11 Exhibit ASA-045, #12 Exhibit ASA-046, #13 Exhibit ASA-047, #14 Exhibit ASA-048, #15 Exhibit ASA-049, #16 Exhibit ASA-050, #17 Exhibit ASA-051, #18 Exhibit ASA-052, #19 Exhibit ASA-053, #20 Exhibit ASA-054, #21 Exhibit ASA-055, #22 Exhibit ASA-056, #23 Exhibit ASA-057, #24 Exhibit ASA-058, #25 Exhibit ASA-059, #26 Exhibit ASA-060, #27 Exhibit ASA-061, #28 Exhibit ASA-062, #29 Exhibit ASA-063, #30 Exhibit ASA-064, #31 Exhibit ASA-065, #32 Exhibit ASA-066, #33 Exhibit ASA-067, #34 Exhibit ASA-068, #35 Exhibit ASA-069)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
May 12, 2022 |
Filing 235
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #232 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #234 Declaration, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ASA-001, #2 Exhibit ASA-002, #3 Exhibit ASA-003, #4 Exhibit ASA-004, #5 Exhibit ASA-005, #6 Exhibit ASA-006, #7 Exhibit ASA-007, #8 Exhibit ASA-008, #9 Exhibit ASA-009, #10 Exhibit ASA-010, #11 Exhibit ASA-011, #12 Exhibit ASA-012, #13 Exhibit ASA-013, #14 Exhibit ASA-014, #15 Exhibit ASA-015, #16 Exhibit ASA-016, #17 Exhibit ASA-017, #18 Exhibit ASA-018, #19 Exhibit ASA-019, #20 Exhibit ASA-020, #21 Exhibit ASA-021, #22 Exhibit ASA-022, #23 Exhibit ASA-023, #24 Exhibit ASA-024, #25 Exhibit ASA-025, #26 Exhibit ASA-026, #27 Exhibit ASA-027, #28 Exhibit ASA-028, #29 Exhibit ASA-029, #30 Exhibit ASA-030, #31 Exhibit ASA-031, #32 Exhibit ASA-032, #33 Exhibit ASA-033, #34 Exhibit ASA-034)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
May 12, 2022 |
Filing 234
DECLARATION of Alexei S. Avtonomov by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #232 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Annex - 1, #2 Annex - 2, #3 Annex - 3, #4 Annex - 4, #5 Annex - 5, #6 Annex - 6)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
May 12, 2022 |
Filing 233
DECLARATION of Carolyn B. Lamm by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #232 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
May 11, 2022 |
Filing 232
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
April 26, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART the Russian Federation's #230 Consent Motion to Extend the Deadlines for the Supplemental Submissions, and AMENDING the schedule specified in the Court's #228 April 13, 2022 Order as follows: the Russian Federation may file, by May 11, 2022, any supplemental submission in further support of the pending motions docketed at ECF Nos. 24 and 108, and by June 8, 2022, the Shareholders may file any supplemental submissions in response or opposition to those same motions. The motion is DENIED AS MOOT to the extent it also seeks that the Court enter a scheduling order for briefing associated with the Russian Federation's #231 Motion to Clarify, which the Court has already denied. See Min. Order (April 25, 2022). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 26, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
April 26, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Russian Federation's supplemental submission due by 5/11/2022; Shareholders' supplemental submission in response due by 6/8/2022. (ztg)
|
April 25, 2022 |
Filing 231
MOTION to Clarify the Scope of Supplemental Briefing under this Court's Memorandum Opinion (ECF 229) and Order (ECF 228), pursuant to the Consent Motion for a Briefing Schedule (ECF 230), by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
April 25, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING the Russian Federation's #231 Motion to Clarify. The Russian Federation seeks an order clarifying that this Court's April 13, 2022 #229 Memorandum Opinion and #228 Order "direct the parties to brief exclusively 'the Russian Federation's sovereign immunity defense' under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act." Mot. at 1 (citing April 13, 2022 Mem. Op. at 2-3, 12, 17). The Russian Federation represents that the Shareholders "now suggest that the April 13 Order compels the Parties immediately to litigate both sovereign immunity and the merits under Article V of the New York Convention." Id. at 2 (emphasis in original). The plain terms of this Court's recent Memorandum Opinion and associated Order, however, make any such clarification unnecessary. At the outset of its April 13, 2022 Memorandum Opinion, this Court recognized that, pursuant to the D.C. Circuit's recent decision in Process & Industrial Developments (P&ID) v. Federal Republic of Nigeria, a district court may not order a foreign sovereign "to brief the merits before resolving a colorable assertion of immunity" under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602-1611, while considering a petition to confirm an arbitral award against that foreign sovereign. See Mem. Op. at 2 n.1 (quoting P&ID, 962 F.3d 576, 579 (D.C. Cir. 2020)). Indeed, as also noted in the Memorandum Opinion, the Shareholders themselves acknowledged this limit to the Court's authority in their briefing opposing the Russian Federation's #201 Motion to Stay. See #204 Pet'rs' Opp'n to Resp't's Mot. to Stay at 13 ("After the D.C. Circuit's recent holding in P&ID, the Russian Federation now has the right to delay this Court's consideration of its other, non-jurisdictional defenses until this Court first resolves the question of sovereign immunity."). Moreover, no aspect of the Memorandum Opinion or Order requires the parties to submit additional briefing --- which the Court described as "neither required nor necessary" to resolving the Russian Federation's "fully briefed and ripe for resolution" motion to dismiss on sovereign immunity grounds docketed at ECF No. 24. Mem. Op. at 17. To the contrary, the Court simply specified a schedule for any updated briefing "[s]hould the parties wish to supplement their prior submissions." Mem. Op. at 20; id. at 17 (again noting that the "parties [may] wish to supplement their briefing afresh"); Order at 1 (providing deadlines for supplemental filings "should the parties wish to supplement their prior submissions in support or opposition of the pending motions"). After offering the parties an opportunity to update their briefing, the Court will proceed to resolving the Russian Federation's fully briefed motion to dismiss on sovereign immunity grounds regardless of whether any supplemental briefs are filed by either party. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 25, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
April 24, 2022 |
Filing 230
Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule on the Supplemental Submissions and the Motion for Clarification, as Consented to by Petitioners, by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
April 14, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondent's supplemental submission, if any, due by 4/27/2022; petitioners' supplemental submission, if any, due by 5/11/2022 (ztg)
|
April 13, 2022 |
Filing 229
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Russian Federation's #201 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 13, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
April 13, 2022 |
Filing 228
ORDER DENYING the Russian Federation's #201 Motion to Stay and DENYING AS MOOT the Shareholders' #205 Motion for Security. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 13, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
March 25, 2022 |
Filing 227
RESPONSE re #223 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
March 25, 2022 |
Filing 226
REPLY re #224 Status Report Reply to Petitioners' Response Concerning the Status Report on Sanctions Issues filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
March 21, 2022 |
Filing 225
RESPONSE re #224 Status Report Petitioners' Response to Status Report filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Shepard, Steven)
|
March 18, 2022 |
Filing 224
STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Annex A)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
March 16, 2022 |
Filing 223
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" P&ID Slip Opinion)(Shepard, Steven)
|
March 16, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' submissions in support and opposition to the Russian Federation's #201 Motion to Stay docketed at ECF Nos. #202 , #203 , #204 , #208 , #209 , #210 , #211 , #212 , #221 , and #222 , that the Russian Federation submit, by March 18, 2022, a Status Report advising the Court of material developments affecting arguments it previously presented regarding the propriety of a stay or prejudgment security in this case following the Russian Federation's invasion of Ukraine beginning on February 24, 2022, by which date the parties had already completed the instant round of extensive briefing. See Russia's Reply in Supp. Mot. to Stay at 5-6, ECF No. 208 (Dec. 29, 2021) (dismissing as "baseless" the Shareholders' concern that conflict between the Russian Federation and Ukraine may lead to the unavailability of Russian Federation assets in the United States); id. at 23 (arguing that, "regarding the situation in Ukraine[,]... [n]o material developments have occurred that would change this Court's 2020 assessment that prejudgment security was neither appropriate nor necessary"); cf. Shareholders' Opp'n to Russia's Mot. to Stay at 16, ECF No. 204 (Dec. 17, 2021) (noting that Russian Federation assets in the United States "may soon vanish" as the result of economic sanctions should the Russian Federation invade Ukraine). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 16, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
March 16, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Russian Federation's Status Report due by 3/18/2022. (ztg)
|
February 24, 2022 |
Filing 222
SURREPLY to re #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
February 24, 2022 |
Filing 221
SURREPLY to re #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation Petitioner's Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend the Stay filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Shepard, Steven)
|
February 24, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, over the Russian Federation's opposition, petitioners' #213 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation, and DIRECTING petitioners to file on the docket the brief attached to their motion for leave. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 24, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
February 24, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, over petitioners' opposition, the Russian Federation's #216 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Surreply in Support of the Motion to Extend the Stay, and DIRECTING the Russian Federation to file on the docket the brief attached to its motion for leave. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 24, 2022. (lcbah2)
|
February 1, 2022 |
Filing 220
REPLY to opposition to motion re #216 MOTION for Leave to File , in the Alternative, a Sur-Surreply in Support of the Motion to Extend the Stay [ECF 201] filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Exhibit 1 - Emails between Steven M Shepard and Carolyn B Lamm of Jan. 7, 2022)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing 219
Memorandum in opposition to re #216 MOTION for Leave to File , in the Alternative, a Sur-Surreply in Support of the Motion to Extend the Stay [ECF 201] filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD..(See Docket Entry #217 to view document). (zeg)
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing 217
REPLY to opposition to motion re #213 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply, #216 MOTION for Leave to File , in the Alternative, a Sur-Surreply in Support of the Motion to Extend the Stay [ECF 201] Reply in Support of Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply & Opposition to Respondent's Alternative Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Surreply filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Shepard, Steven) Modified docket event/text on 1/28/2022 (zeg).
|
January 26, 2022 |
Filing 218
Memorandum in opposition to re #213 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (See Docket Entry #216 to view document). (zeg)
|
January 26, 2022 |
Filing 216
MOTION for Leave to File , in the Alternative, a Sur-Surreply in Support of the Motion to Extend the Stay [ECF 201] by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Proposed Sur-Surreply, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
January 26, 2022 |
Filing 215
DECLARATION No. 9 of Prof. Albert Jan van den Berg in support of the Opposition [ECF 214] by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #213 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Ex 1 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration, #2 Exhibit -- Ex 2 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration, #3 Exhibit -- Exhibit 3 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration, #4 Exhibit -- Exhibit 4 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration, #5 Exhibit -- Ex 5 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration, #6 Exhibit -- Ex 6 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration, #7 Exhibit -- Ex 7 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration, #8 Exhibit -- Ex 8 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration, #9 Exhibit -- Ex 9 to 9th Van den Berg Declaration)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
January 25, 2022 |
Filing 214
Memorandum in opposition to re #213 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
January 11, 2022 |
Filing 213
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Petitioners' [Proposed] Sur-Reply in Opposition to the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend the Stay, #2 Second Declaration of Steven M. Shepard, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8)(Shepard, Steven)
|
December 30, 2021 |
Filing 212
DECLARATION of Professor Albert Jan van den Berg by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #208 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 30, 2021 |
Filing 211
DECLARATION of Rob Meijer by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #208 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 30, 2021 |
Filing 210
DECLARATION of Sir Nicholas Forwood QC by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #208 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 30, 2021 |
Filing 209
DECLARATION of Carolyn B. Lamm by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #208 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2021 |
Filing 208
REPLY to opposition to motion re #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 21, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondent reply due by 12/29/2021. (ztg)
|
December 20, 2021 |
Filing 207
Memorandum in opposition to re #206 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation Opposition to the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend Deadline for its Reply Brief filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Shepard, Steven)
|
December 20, 2021 |
Filing 206
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 20, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING respondent's opposed #206 Motion for Additional Time to File its Reply in Support of its Motion to Extend the Stay, and DIRECTING respondent to file, by December 29, 2021, any reply in support of its motion to stay. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 20, 2021. (lcbah2)
|
December 17, 2021 |
Filing 205
MOTION for Security re #204 Memorandum in Opposition,, by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Petitioners' Motion for Security)(Shepard, Steven)
|
December 17, 2021 |
Filing 204
Memorandum in opposition to re #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying the Russian Federations Motion to Extend This Courts Stay of Litigation, #2 Declaration Declaration of Tobias Cohen Jehoram, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Declaration Declaration of Steven M. Shepard, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6)(Shepard, Steven)
|
December 10, 2021 |
Filing 203
DECLARATION of Professor Albert Jan van den Berg by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 10, 2021 |
Filing 202
DECLARATION of Carolyn B. Lamm by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #201 MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 10, 2021 |
Filing 201
MOTION to Stay / Respondent the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend this Court's Stay of Litigation by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 2, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' #198 and #199 status reports and the D.C. Circuit's mandate, issued on December 1, 2021, and the fact that the stay imposed on November 20, 2020, see #193 Order, is now lifted with "resolution of proceedings in the Dutch Supreme Court," id. at 1, but the parties continue to dispute whether the stay in this case should be extended pending resolution of proceedings on remand from the Dutch Supreme Court, Resp't's #199 Status Report at 3, that, (1) by December 10, 2021, respondent shall file any motion to extend the stay; (2) by December 17, 2021, petitioners shall file any opposition; and (3) by December 21, 2021, respondent shall file any reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 2, 2021. (lcbah2)
|
December 2, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to extend the stay due by 12/10/2021; opposition due by 12/17/2021; reply due by 12/21/2021. (ztg)
|
December 1, 2021 |
Filing 200
MANDATE of USCA as to #195 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. ; USCA Case Number 20-7113. (Attachment: #1 Order)(zeg)
|
November 22, 2021 |
Filing 199
STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
November 22, 2021 |
Filing 198
STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Shepard, Steven)
|
May 20, 2021 |
Filing 197
Joint STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Suspension Decision & Translation, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Final judgment Hulley v Russian Federation CL 2015 000396, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Opinion AG & Translation, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Notice & Translation)(Shepard, Steven)
|
December 9, 2020 |
USCA Case Number 20-7113 for #195 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (zrdj)
|
December 7, 2020 |
Filing 196
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #195 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zrdj)
|
December 4, 2020 |
Filing 195
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT re #193 ORDER & #194 MEMORANDUM OPINION by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-7917045. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Shepard, Steven) Modified to add linkage on 12/7/2020 (zrdj).
|
November 23, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2021, and every six months thereafter. (ztg)
|
November 20, 2020 |
Filing 194
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding respondent's #179 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 20, 2020. (lcbah2)
|
November 20, 2020 |
Filing 193
ORDER GRANTING respondent's #179 Motion to Stay. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 20, 2020. (lcbah2)
|
October 5, 2020 |
Filing 192
REPLY re #191 Response to Document #190 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
September 30, 2020 |
Filing 191
RESPONSE re #190 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shepard, Steven)
|
September 28, 2020 |
Filing 190
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
September 8, 2020 |
Filing 188
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to RUSSIAN FEDERATION. Attorney Francis A Vasquez, Jr terminated. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
September 2, 2020 |
Filing 189
SURREPLY re #179 MOTION to Stay filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8, #2 Declaration of Carolyn B. Lamm)(zjf)
|
September 2, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the respondent's #187 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Surreply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 1, 2020. (lcbah2)
|
August 29, 2020 |
Filing 187
MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Surreply in Support of the Motion to Extend the Court's Stay of Litigation (ECF 179) by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order -- Proposed Order, #2 -- Proposed Sur-Surreply in Support of the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend the Court's Stay of Litigation, #3 Declaration of Carolyn B. Lamm, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 26, 2020 |
Filing 186
SURREPLY to re #179 MOTION to Stay filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of STEVEN SHEPARD, #2 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Shepard, #3 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Shepard, #4 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Shepard, #5 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Shepard, #6 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Shepard, #7 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Shepard, #8 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Shepard)(zrdj)
|
August 26, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the petitioners' #185 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 25, 2020. (lcbah2)
|
August 21, 2020 |
Filing 185
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Petitioners' Proposed Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend the Stay, #2 Declaration Second Shepard Declaration in Opposition to the Russian Federation's Motion to Extend the Stay, #3 Exhibit 18 to Second Shepard Declaration, #4 Exhibit 19 to Second Shepard Declaration, #5 Exhibit 20 to Second Shepard Declaration, #6 Exhibit 21 to Second Shepard Declaration, #7 Exhibit 22 to Second Shepard Declaration, #8 Exhibit 23 to Second Shepard Declaration, #9 Exhibit 24 to Second Shepard Declaration)(Shepard, Steven)
|
August 14, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the petitioners' #183 Motion for Admission of Zachary B. Savage Pro Hac Vice and #184 Motion for Admission of Stephanie Spies Pro Hac Vice. Zachary B. Savage and Stephanie Spies may enter appearances pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the petitioners in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 14, 2020. (lcbah2)
|
August 13, 2020 |
Filing 184
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephanie Spies, Firm- Susman Godfrey L.L.P., :Address- 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 32nd Floor, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 336-8330. Fax No. - (212) 336-8340 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7461343. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Spies)(Hess, Richard)
|
August 13, 2020 |
Filing 183
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Zachary B. Savage, Firm- Susman Godfrey L.L.P., :Address- 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 32nd Floor, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 336-8330. Fax No. - (212) 336-8340 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7461298. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary B. Savage)(Hess, Richard)
|
August 5, 2020 |
Filing 182
REPLY to opposition to motion re #179 MOTION to Stay filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sixth Declaration of Albert Jan Van den Berg, #2 Exhibit Van den Berg Annex F, #3 Exhibit Van den Berg Annex G, #4 Exhibit Van den Berg Annex H, #5 Exhibit Van den Berg Annex I, #6 Exhibit Van den Berg Annex J, #7 Exhibit Van den Berg Annex K, #8 Exhibit Van den Berg Annex L, #9 Exhibit Van den Berg Annex M, #10 Declaration Second Declaration of Rob Meijer, #11 Declaration Second Declaration of Sir Nicholas Forwood, #12 Exhibit Forwood Annex C, #13 Exhibit Forwood Annex D, #14 Exhibit Forwood Annex E, #15 Exhibit Forwood Annex F, #16 Exhibit Forwood Annex G, #17 Declaration Declaration of Andrea Pinna, #18 Declaration Declaration of Alexei S. Avtonomov, #19 Exhibit Avtonomov Annex A, #20 Exhibit Avtonomov Annex B)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 8, 2020 |
Filing 181
Memorandum in opposition to re #179 MOTION to Stay filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of M. Cotlick, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 1T, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 2T, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 3T, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 4T, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 5T, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 6T, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 7T, #17 Exhibit 8, #18 Exhibit 8T, #19 Exhibit 9, #20 Exhibit 9T, #21 Exhibit 10, #22 Exhibit 10T, #23 Exhibit 11, #24 Exhibit 12, #25 Declaration of S. Shepard, #26 Exhibit 1, #27 Exhibit 2, #28 Exhibit 3, #29 Exhibit 4, #30 Exhibit 5, #31 Exhibit 6, #32 Exhibit 7, #33 Exhibit 8, #34 Exhibit 9, #35 Exhibit 10, #36 Exhibit 11, #37 Exhibit 12, #38 Exhibit 13, #39 Exhibit 14, #40 Exhibit 15, #41 Exhibit 16, #42 Exhibit 17, #43 Declaration of T.C. Jehoram, #44 Exhibit A, #45 Exhibit B, #46 Exhibit C, #47 Exhibit D, #48 Exhibit E, #49 Exhibit F, #50 Exhibit G, #51 Exhibit H, #52 I)(Shepard, Steven)
|
June 16, 2020 |
Filing 180
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) -- Fifth Declaration of Professor Albert Jan van den Berg by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #179 MOTION to Stay filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Annex A to Van den Berg Declaration, #2 Exhibit - Annex B to Van den Berg Declaration, #3 Exhibit - Annex C to Van den Berg Declaration, #4 Exhibit - Annex D to Van den Berg Declaration, #5 Exhibit - Annex E to Van den Berg Declaration, #6 Declaration of Mr. Rob Meijer, #7 Exhibit - Annex A to Meijer Declaration, #8 Exhibit - Annex B to Meijer Declaration, #9 Declaration of Sir Nicholas Forwood QC, #10 Exhibit - Annex A to Forwood Declaration, #11 Exhibit - Annex B to Forwood Declaration)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing 179
MOTION to Stay by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing 178
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Chung on behalf of RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Chung, Eric)
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing 177
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolle E. Kownacki on behalf of RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Kownacki, Nicolle)
|
May 21, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties' #176 Joint Status Report, issuing the following SCHEDULING ORDER to govern proceedings in this case: (1) by June 15, 2020, respondent shall file its brief on the stay of litigation in this case; (2) by July 8, 2020, petitioners shall file any responsive brief on the stay of litigation in this case; (3) by August 5, 2020, respondent shall file any reply brief on the stay of litigation in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 21, 2020. (lcbah2)
|
May 21, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondent's shall file its brief on the stay of litigation in this case due by 6/15/2020; petitioners' response due by 7/8/2020; respondent's reply due by 8/5/2020. (tg)
|
May 20, 2020 |
Filing 176
Joint STATUS REPORT by Petitioners and by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit -- Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order -- Proposed Scheduling Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 11, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2020. (tg)
|
October 11, 2019 |
Case Stayed until 5/20/2020. (tg)
|
October 10, 2019 |
Filing 175
Joint STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 10, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties' #175 Joint Status Report requesting an extension of the stay, ORDERING that all proceedings are STAYED until May 20, 2020, on which date the parties shall jointly submit a status report proposing a scheduling order to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 10, 2019. (lcbah2)
|
September 25, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2019. (tg)
|
September 24, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, in light of their #174 Joint Request to Submit Status Report on October 10, 2019, to submit, by October 10, 2019, a joint status report. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 24, 2019. (lcbah2)
|
September 23, 2019 |
Filing 174
Joint STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
March 29, 2019 |
Filing 173
STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
March 29, 2019 |
Filing 172
STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Shepard, Steven)
|
December 28, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2019, and every six months thereafter. (hmc)
|
December 27, 2018 |
Filing 171
Joint MOTION for Order Extending the Stay until January 21, 2020 by the PETITIONERS and by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Lamm, Carolyn) Modified on 1/9/2019 (zrdj).
|
December 27, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' #171 Joint Motion to Extend the Stay; ORDERING that all proceedings are STAYED until January 21, 2020, on which date the parties shall jointly submit a proposed scheduling order to govern further proceedings in this case; and DIRECTING the parties, in the event that the Court of Appeal of The Hague renders a final decision resolving Petitioners' appeal in Case No. 200.197.079/01 prior to January 21, 2020, to notify the Court and jointly submit a proposed scheduling order to govern further proceedings in this case; and further DIRECTING parties to continue filing a joint status report every six months, with the next report to be filed no later than March 29, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 27, 2018. (lcbah1)
|
December 13, 2018 |
Filing 170
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. Attorney Christopher Michael Ryan terminated. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
December 13, 2018 |
Filing 169
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. Attorney Richard Franklin Schwed terminated. (Schwed, Richard)
|
December 13, 2018 |
Filing 168
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. Attorney Henry Sabath Weisburg terminated. (Weisburg, Henry)
|
October 1, 2018 |
Filing 167
STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 1, 2018 |
Filing 166
STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Shepard, Steven)
|
September 13, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the petitioners' #165 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of Jacob W. Buchdahl. Jacob W. Buchdahl may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the petitioners in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 13, 2018. (lcbah2)
|
September 12, 2018 |
Filing 165
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jacob W. Buchdahl, :Firm- Susman Godfrey L.L.P., :Address- 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 32nd Floor, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 336-8330. Fax No. - (212) 336-8340 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5685816. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jacob W. Buchdahl)(Hess, Richard)
|
September 10, 2018 |
Filing 164
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven M. Shepard, :Firm- Susman Godfrey L.L.P., :Address- 1301 Avenue of the Americas. Phone No. - 212-336-8330. Fax No. - 212-336-8340 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5680627. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Shepard)(Hess, Richard)
|
September 10, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the petitioners' #164 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of Steven M. Shepard. Steven M. Shepard may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the petitioners in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 10, 2018. (lcbah2)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing 163
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wolf Hess on behalf of HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Hess, Richard)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing 162
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wolf Hess on behalf of HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Hess, Richard)
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing 161
Third STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing 160
Third STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing 159
Second STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Lamm, Carolyn) Modified event title on 10/2/2017 (znmw).
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing 158
Second STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing 157
AFFIDAVIT re #156 Status Report /Fourth Declaration of Francis A. Vasquez, Jr. by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing 156
STATUS REPORT by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing 155
STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/30/2017, and every six months thereafter. (tg)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Case Stayed until January 21, 2019. (tg)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing 154
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Petitioners' #105 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 30, 2016. (lcbah2)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing 153
ORDER GRANTING the Petitioners' #105 Motion to Stay, the Petitioners' #125 Motion to Suspend Briefing on Respondents Supplemental Motion to Dismiss, the Respondent's #136 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Opposing Petitioners' Motion to Strike, the Respondent's #139 Motion for Leave to Amend the Supplemental Motion to Dismiss, the Respondent's #142 Motion for Leave to Amend the Supplemental Motion to Dismiss, and the Respondent's #147 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Stay; DENYING the Petitioners' #123 Motion to Strike Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss; and STAYING the Respondent's #23 Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention, the Respondent's #24 Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and the Respondent's #108 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 30, 2016. (lcbah2)
|
September 16, 2016 |
Filing 152
REPLY to opposition to motion re #147 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Stay, ECF No 105 filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mr Desai, #2 Declaration of Prof Van den Berg, #3 Declaration of Dr. Burianski, #4 Declaration of Dr. Kondakov)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
September 6, 2016 |
Filing 151
Memorandum in opposition to re #147 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Stay, ECF No 105 filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
September 1, 2016 |
Filing 150
REPLY to opposition to motion re #142 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dr. Markus Burianski, #2 Exhibit)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioners' opposition to #108 Motion due by 10/7/2016; Reply due by 12/13/2016. (tg)
|
August 24, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' #145 Stipulation and Proposed Order, the following briefing schedule with respect to the parties' outstanding motions: The petitioners shall file, by October 7, 2016, any opposition to the respondent's #108 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention. Any reply shall be filed by December 13, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 24, 2016. (lcbah2)
|
August 22, 2016 |
Filing 149
Memorandum in opposition to re #142 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Annotated Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
August 17, 2016 |
Filing 148
NOTICE of Proposed Order by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #147 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Stay, ECF No 105 (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 17, 2016 |
Filing 147
MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Stay, ECF No 105 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit B - Tim Osborne's Letter to the ''American Lawyer'', #3 Exhibit C - Column in the ''American Lawyer'', #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Mr Dmitry Gololobov, #5 Exhibit E - German Court's Notice, #6 Exhibit F - Indian Court's Notice, #7 Exhibit G - SEC's Staff Accounting Bulletin 5T, #8 Exhibit H - Petitioners' Letter to the Court of Appeal of The Hague, #9 Exhibit I - Moody's Investors Service - Sovereign Bond Ratings, September 2013, #10 Exhibit J - Tim Osborne's Letters Regarding Petitioners' Arbitration Awards)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 15, 2016 |
Filing 146
REPLY to opposition to motion re #136 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Strike filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 10, 2016 |
Filing 145
STIPULATION and Proposed Order as to the Parties' Agreed Briefing Schedule by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing 144
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing 143
Memorandum in opposition to re #136 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Strike /Petitioners' Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
August 4, 2016 |
Filing 142
Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention / in re: #139 MOTION to Amend/Correct and #140 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of Documents Cited in Declaration of Dmitry Gololobov by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dmitry Gololobov, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Supplemental Motion to Dismiss [Clean], #3 Exhibit C - Amended Supplemental Motion to Dismiss [Redline], #4 Exhibit D - Profile of Tempo Finance Ltd on ''Panama Papers'' Website, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 4, 2016 |
Filing 141
NOTICE of Proposed Order by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #139 MOTION to Amend/Correct #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convent (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 3, 2016 |
Filing 140
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of Documents Cited in Declaration of Dmitry Gololobov by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #139 MOTION to Amend/Correct #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convent filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 R-0638, #2 R-0731, #3 R-0732, #4 R-0733, #5 R-0734, #6 R-0735, #7 R-0736, #8 R-0737, #9 R-0787, #10 R-0788, #11 R-0789, #12 R-0790, #13 R-0791, #14 R-0792, #15 R-0793, #16 R-0794, #17 R-0795)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 3, 2016 |
Filing 139
MOTION to Amend/Correct #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dmitry Gololobov, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Supplemental Motion to Dismiss [Clean], #3 Exhibit C - Amended Supplemental Motion to Dismiss [Redline], #4 Exhibit D - Profile of Tempo Finance Ltd on ''Panama Papers'' Website)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 1, 2016 |
Filing 138
REPLY to opposition to motion re #105 MOTION to Stay filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher M. Ryan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
July 20, 2016 |
Filing 137
NOTICE of Proposed Order by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #136 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Strike (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing 136
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Strike by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Supplemented Annex B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Feldman 26a1 Disclosures re GML's 2011 Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Feldman Testimony re GML's 2011 Agreement)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing 135
REPLY to opposition to motion re #125 MOTION Petitioners' Motion to Suspend Briefing on Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss re #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Ar bitration Awards filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
July 11, 2016 |
Filing 134
REPLY in support of re #123 MOTION to Strike #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Annex B)(Ryan, Christopher) Modified on 7/12/2016 to correct docket event/text (jf).
|
July 9, 2016 |
Filing 133
NOTICE of Proposed Order by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #132 Memorandum in Opposition, (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 8, 2016 |
Filing 132
Memorandum in opposition to re #125 MOTION Petitioners' Motion to Suspend Briefing on Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss re #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Ar filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing 131
NOTICE of Proposed Order by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #127 Memorandum in Opposition, (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing 130
NOTICE of Proposed Order by RUSSIAN FEDERATION re #126 Memorandum in Opposition, (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing 129
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Index to the Opposition- R-775 through R-786 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #127 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 R-775, #2 R-776, #3 R-777, #4 R-778, #5 R-779, #6 R-780, #7 R-781, #8 R-782, #9 R-783, #10 R-784, #11 R-785, #12 R-786)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing 128
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Index to the Opposition- Exhibits R-762 through R-774 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #127 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 R-762, #2 R-763, #3 R-764, #4 R-765, #5 R-766, #6 R-767, #7 R-768, #8 R-769, #9 R-770, #10 R-771, #11 R-773, #12 R-774)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing 127
Memorandum in opposition to re #105 MOTION to Stay filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Third Declaration of Professor Albert Jan Van Den Berg, #2 Declaration and Expert Opinion of Dr. Andrey Kondakov, #3 Index to the Opposition, #4 RLA-152, #5 RLA-153, #6 RLA-154)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 30, 2016 |
Filing 126
Memorandum in opposition to re #123 MOTION to Strike #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing 125
MOTION Petitioners' Motion to Suspend Briefing on Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss re #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
June 16, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' #124 Stipulation and Proposed Order, the following briefing schedule for the parties' outstanding motions: The respondent shall file, by July 1, 2016, any opposition to the petitioner's #105 Motion to Stay. Any reply shall be filed by August 1, 2016. The petitioners shall file, by September 1, 2016, any opposition to the respondent's #108 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention. Any reply shall be filed by October 7, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 16, 2016. (lcbah2)
|
June 16, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondent's Opposition to Petitioners' #105 Motion to Stay due by 7/1/2016; Reply due by 8/1/2016. Petitioners' Opposition to Respondent's #108 Supplemental Motion due by 9/1/2016; Reply due by 10/7/2016. (tg)
|
June 15, 2016 |
Filing 124
STIPULATION and Proposed Order as to the Parties' Agreed Briefing Schedule by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 123
MOTION to Strike #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
June 10, 2016 |
Filing 122
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 121
RESPONSE re #107 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 120
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibit R-751 through R-761 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-751, #2 Exhibit R-752, #3 Exhibit R-753, #4 Exhibit R-754, #5 Exhibit R-755, #6 Exhibit R-756, #7 Exhibit R-757, #8 Exhibit R-758, #9 Exhibit R-759, #10 Exhibit R-760, #11 Exhibit R-761)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 119
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibit R-740 through R-750 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-740, #2 Exhibit R-741, #3 Exhibit R-742, #4 Exhibit R-743, #5 Exhibit R-744, #6 Exhibit R-745, #7 Exhibit R-746, #8 Exhibit R-747, #9 Exhibit R-748, #10 Exhibit R-749, #11 Exhibit R-750)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 118
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibit R-723 through R-739 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-723, #2 Exhibit R-724, #3 Exhibit R-725, #4 Exhibit R-726, #5 Exhibit R-727, #6 Exhibit R-728, #7 Exhibit R-729, #8 Exhibit R-730, #9 Exhibit R-738, #10 Exhibit R-739)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 117
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibits R-713 through R-722 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-713, #2 Exhibit R-714, #3 Exhibit R-715, #4 Exhibit R-716, #5 Exhibit R-717, #6 Exhibit R-718, #7 Exhibit R-719, #8 Exhibit R-720, #9 Exhibit R-721, #10 Exhibit R-722)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 116
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibits R-699 through R-712 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-699, #2 Exhibit R-700, #3 Exhibit R-701, #4 Exhibit R-702, #5 Exhibit R-703, #6 Exhibit R-704, #7 Exhibit R-705, #8 Exhibit R-710, #9 Exhibit R-711, #10 Exhibit R-712)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 115
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibits R-689 through R-698 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-689, #2 Exhibit R-690, #3 Exhibit R-691, #4 Exhibit R-692, #5 Exhibit R-693, #6 Exhibit R-694, #7 Exhibit R-695, #8 Exhibit R-696, #9 Exhibit R-697, #10 Exhibit R-698)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 114
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibits R-679 through R-688 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-679, #2 Exhibit R-680, #3 Exhibit R-681, #4 Exhibit R-682, #5 Exhibit R-683, #6 Exhibit R-684, #7 Exhibit R-685, #8 Exhibit R-686, #9 Exhibit R-687, #10 Exhibit R-688)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 113
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibit R-669 through R-678 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-669, #2 Exhibit R-670, #3 Exhibit R-671, #4 Exhibit R-672, #5 Exhibit R-673, #6 Exhibit R-674, #7 Exhibit R-675, #8 Exhibit R-676, #9 Exhibit R-677, #10 Exhibit R-678)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 112
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- R-659 through R-668 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-659, #2 Exhibit R-660, #3 Exhibit R-661, #4 Exhibit R-662, #5 Exhibit R-663, #6 Exhibit R-664, #7 Exhibit R-665, #8 Exhibit R-666, #9 Exhibit R-667, #10 Exhibit R-668)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 111
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibit R-649 through R-658 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-649, #2 Exhibit R-650, #3 Exhibit R-651, #4 Exhibit R-652, #5 Exhibit R-653, #6 Exhibit R-654, #7 Exhibit R-655, #8 Exhibit R-656, #9 Exhibit R-657, #10 Exhibit R-658)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 110
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits- Exhibit R-639 through R-648 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-639, #2 Exhibit R-640, #3 Exhibit R-641, #4 Exhibit R-642, #5 Exhibit R-643, #6 Exhibit R-644, #7 Exhibit R-645, #8 Exhibit R-646, #9 Exhibit R-647, #10 Exhibit R-648)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing 109
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-617 through R-637 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #108 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-617, #2 Exhibit R-618, #3 Exhibit R-619, #4 Exhibit R-620, #5 Exhibit R-621, #6 Exhibit R-622, #7 Exhibit R-623, #8 Exhibit R-624, #9 Exhibit R-626, #10 Exhibit R-627, #11 Exhibit R-628, #12 Exhibit R-629, #13 Exhibit R-630, #14 Exhibit R-631, #15 Exhibit R-632, #16 Exhibit R-633, #17 Exhibit R-634, #18 Exhibit R-635, #19 Exhibit R-636, #20 Exhibit R-637)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 5, 2016 |
Filing 108
Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards Under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the New York Convention by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Professor Albert Jan Van Den Berg dated May 31, 2016, #3 Supplemental Expert Opinion of Professor Rudolf Dolzer dated June 5, 2016, #4 Third Declaration of Francis A. Vasquez, Jr. dated June 1, 2016, #5 Annex A to Vasquez Declaration, #6 Annex B to Vasquez Declaration, #7 Annex C to Vasquez Declaration, #8 Annex D to Vasquez Declaration, #9 RLA- 149, #10 RLA- 150, #11 RLA- 151)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
June 2, 2016 |
Filing 107
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to #105 Motion to Stay due by 6/17/2016 Replies due by 7/14/2016. (tg)
|
May 27, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' #106 Stipulation and Proposed Order, the following briefing schedule for the petitioner's #105 Motion to Stay: The respondent shall, by June 17, 2016, any opposition to the petitioner's motion. Any reply shall be filed by July 14, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 27, 2016. (lcbah1)
|
May 26, 2016 |
Filing 106
STIPULATION and Proposed Order as to the Parties' Agreed Briefing Schedule by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
May 16, 2016 |
Filing 105
MOTION to Stay by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Petitioners' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Stay, #2 Declaration Declaration of Marnix Leijten, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Marnix Leijten, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
April 27, 2016 |
Filing 104
RESPONSE re #102 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
April 24, 2016 |
Filing 103
NOTICE of Intent to Respond by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. re #102 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Ryan, Christopher)
|
April 22, 2016 |
Filing 102
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment of the District Court of The Hague (Dutch Original), #2 Exhibit Judgment of the District Court of The Hague (English Translation))(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing 101
NOTICE re Voluntary Production of Share Registry for OAO Yukos Oil Company by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel/Party re YUKOS Share Registry)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing 100
REPLY re #99 Response to Document - Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing 99
RESPONSE re #97 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing 98
NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher M. Ryan (Ryan, Christopher)
|
February 1, 2016 |
Filing 97
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RLA-146, #2 Exhibit RLA-147, #3 Exhibit RLA-148)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
January 12, 2016 |
Filing 96
REPLY re #70 First Appendix filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn) Modified on 1/13/2016 (zrdj).
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 95
RESPONSE re #70 Joint Appendix, / Petitioners' Response to the Russian Federation's First Appendix filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 94
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-576 through Exhibit ARB-592 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-576, #2 ARB-577, #3 ARB-578, #4 ARB-579, #5 ARB-580, #6 ARB-581, #7 ARB-582, #8 ARB-583, #9 ARB-584, #10 ARB-585, #11 ARB-586, #12 ARB-587, #13 ARB-588, #14 ARB-589, #15 ARB-590, #16 ARB-591, #17 ARB-592)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 93
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-551 through Exhibit ARB-575 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-551, #2 ARB-552, #3 ARB-553, #4 ARB-554, #5 ARB-555, #6 ARB-556, #7 ARB-557, #8 ARB-558, #9 ARB-559, #10 ARB-560, #11 ARB-561, #12 ARB-562, #13 ARB-563, #14 ARB-564, #15 ARB-565, #16 ARB-566, #17 ARB-567, #18 ARB-568, #19 ARB-569, #20 ARB-570, #21 ARB-571, #22 ARB-572, #23 ARB-573, #24 ARB-574, #25 ARB-575)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 92
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-526 through Exhibit ARB-550 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-526, #2 ARB-527, #3 ARB-528, #4 ARB-529, #5 ARB-530, #6 ARB-531, #7 ARB-532, #8 ARB-533, #9 ARB-534, #10 ARB-535, #11 ARB-536, #12 ARB-537, #13 ARB-538, #14 ARB-539, #15 ARB-540, #16 ARB-541, #17 ARB-542, #18 ARB-543, #19 ARB-544, #20 ARB-545, #21 ARB-546, #22 ARB-547, #23 ARB-548, #24 ARB-549, #25 ARB-550)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 91
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-501 through Exhibit ARB-525 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-501, #2 ARB-502, #3 ARB-503, #4 ARB-504, #5 ARB-505, #6 ARB-506, #7 ARB-507, #8 ARB-508, #9 ARB-509, #10 ARB-510, #11 ARB-511, #12 ARB-512, #13 ARB-513, #14 ARB-514, #15 ARB-515, #16 ARB-516, #17 ARB-517, #18 ARB-518, #19 ARB-519, #20 ARB-520, #21 ARB-521, #22 ARB-522, #23 ARB-523, #24 ARB-524, #25 ARB-525)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 90
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-476 through Exhibit ARB-500 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-476, #2 ARB-477, #3 ARB-478, #4 ARB-479, #5 ARB-480, #6 ARB-481, #7 ARB-482, #8 ARB-483, #9 ARB-484, #10 ARB-485, #11 ARB-486, #12 ARB-487, #13 ARB-488, #14 ARB-489, #15 ARB-490, #16 ARB-491, #17 ARB-492, #18 ARB-493, #19 ARB-494, #20 ARB-495, #21 ARB-496, #22 ARB-497, #23 ARB-498, #24 ARB-499, #25 ARB-500)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 89
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-451 through Exhibit ARB-475 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-451, #2 ARB-452, #3 ARB-453, #4 ARB-454, #5 ARB-455, #6 ARB-456, #7 ARB-457, #8 ARB-458, #9 ARB-459, #10 ARB-460, #11 ARB-461, #12 ARB-462, #13 ARB-463, #14 ARB-464, #15 ARB-465, #16 ARB-466, #17 ARB-467, #18 ARB-468, #19 ARB-469, #20 ARB-470, #21 ARB-471, #22 ARB-472, #23 ARB-473, #24 ARB-474, #25 ARB-475)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 88
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-426 through Exhibit ARB-450 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-426, #2 ARB-427, #3 ARB-428, #4 ARB-429, #5 ARB-430, #6 ARB-431, #7 ARB-432, #8 ARB-433, #9 ARB-434, #10 ARB-435, #11 ARB-436, #12 ARB-437, #13 ARB-438, #14 ARB-439, #15 ARB-440, #16 ARB-441, #17 ARB-442, #18 ARB-443, #19 ARB-444, #20 ARB-445, #21 ARB-446, #22 ARB-447, #23 ARB-448, #24 ARB-449, #25 ARB-450)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 87
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-401 through Exhibit ARB-425 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-401, #2 ARB-402, #3 ARB-403, #4 ARB-404, #5 ARB-405, #6 ARB-406, #7 ARB-407, #8 ARB-408, #9 ARB-409, #10 ARB-410, #11 ARB-411, #12 ARB-412, #13 ARB-413, #14 ARB-414, #15 ARB-415, #16 ARB-416, #17 ARB-417, #18 ARB-418, #19 ARB-419, #20 ARB-420, #21 ARB-421, #22 ARB-422, #23 ARB-423, #24 ARB-424, #25 ARB-425)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 86
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-376 through Exhibit ARB-400 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-376, #2 ARB-377, #3 ARB-378, #4 ARB-379, #5 ARB-380, #6 ARB-381, #7 ARB-382, #8 ARB-383, #9 ARB-384, #10 ARB-385, #11 ARB-386, #12 ARB-387, #13 ARB-388, #14 ARB-389, #15 ARB-390, #16 ARB-391, #17 ARB-392, #18 ARB-393, #19 ARB-394, #20 ARB-395, #21 ARB-396, #22 ARB-397, #23 ARB-398, #24 ARB-399, #25 ARB-400)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 85
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-351 through Exhibit ARB-375 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-351, #2 ARB-352, #3 ARB-353, #4 ARB-354, #5 ARB-355, #6 ARB-356, #7 ARB-357, #8 ARB-358, #9 ARB-359, #10 ARB-360, #11 ARB-361, #12 ARB-362, #13 ARB-363, #14 ARB-364, #15 ARB-365, #16 ARB-366, #17 ARB-367, #18 ARB-368, #19 ARB-369, #20 ARB-370, #21 ARB-371, #22 ARB-372, #23 ARB-373, #24 ARB-374, #25 ARB-375)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 84
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-326 through Exhibit ARB-350 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-326, #2 ARB-327, #3 ARB-328, #4 ARB-329, #5 ARB-330, #6 ARB-331, #7 ARB-332, #8 ARB-333, #9 ARB-334, #10 ARB-335, #11 ARB-336, #12 ARB-337, #13 ARB-338, #14 ARB-339, #15 ARB-340, #16 ARB-341, #17 ARB-342, #18 ARB-343, #19 ARB-344, #20 ARB-345, #21 ARB-346, #22 ARB-347, #23 ARB-348, #24 ARB-349, #25 ARB-350)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 83
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-301 through Exhibit ARB-325 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-301, #2 ARB-302, #3 ARB-303, #4 ARB-304, #5 ARB-305, #6 ARB-306, #7 ARB-307, #8 ARB-308, #9 ARB-309, #10 ARB-310, #11 ARB-311, #12 ARB-312, #13 ARB-313, #14 ARB-314, #15 ARB-315, #16 ARB-316, #17 ARB-317, #18 ARB-318, #19 ARB-319, #20 ARB-320, #21 ARB-321, #22 ARB-322, #23 ARB-323, #24 ARB-324, #25 ARB-325)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 82
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-276 through Exhibit ARB-300 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-276, #2 ARB-277, #3 ARB-278, #4 ARB-279, #5 ARB-280, #6 ARB-281, #7 ARB-282, #8 ARB-283, #9 ARB-284, #10 ARB-285, #11 ARB-286, #12 ARB-287, #13 ARB-288, #14 ARB-289, #15 ARB-290, #16 ARB-291, #17 ARB-292, #18 ARB-293, #19 ARB-294, #20 ARB-295, #21 ARB-296, #22 ARB-297, #23 ARB-298, #24 ARB-299, #25 ARB-300)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 81
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-251 through Exhibit ARB-275 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-251, #2 ARB-252, #3 ARB-253, #4 ARB-254, #5 ARB-255, #6 ARB-256, #7 ARB-257, #8 ARB-258, #9 ARB-259, #10 ARB-260, #11 ARB-261, #12 ARB-262, #13 ARB-263, #14 ARB-264, #15 ARB-265, #16 ARB-266, #17 ARB-267, #18 ARB-268, #19 ARB-269, #20 ARB-270, #21 ARB-271, #22 ARB-272, #23 ARB-273, #24 ARB-274, #25 ARB-275)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 80
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-226 through Exhibit ARB-250 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-226, #2 ARB-227, #3 ARB-228, #4 ARB-229, #5 ARB-230, #6 ARB-231, #7 ARB-232, #8 ARB-233, #9 ARB-234, #10 ARB-235, #11 ARB-236, #12 ARB-237, #13 ARB-238, #14 ARB-239, #15 ARB-240, #16 ARB-241, #17 ARB-242, #18 ARB-243, #19 ARB-244, #20 ARB-245, #21 ARB-246, #22 ARB-247, #23 ARB-248, #24 ARB-249, #25 ARB-250)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 79
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-201 through Exhibit ARB-225 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-201, #2 ARB-202, #3 ARB-203, #4 ARB-204, #5 ARB-205, #6 ARB-206, #7 ARB-207, #8 ARB-208, #9 ARB-209, #10 ARB-210, #11 ARB-211, #12 ARB-212, #13 ARB-213, #14 ARB-214, #15 ARB-215, #16 ARB-216, #17 ARB-217, #18 ARB-218, #19 ARB-219, #20 ARB-220, #21 ARB-221, #22 ARB-222, #23 ARB-223, #24 ARB-224, #25 ARB-225)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 78
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-176 through Exhibit ARB-200 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-176, #2 ARB-177, #3 ARB-178, #4 ARB-179, #5 ARB-180, #6 ARB-181, #7 ARB-182, #8 ARB-183, #9 ARB-184, #10 ARB-185, #11 ARB-186, #12 ARB-187, #13 ARB-188, #14 ARB-189, #15 ARB-190, #16 ARB-191, #17 ARB-192, #18 ARB-193, #19 ARB-194, #20 ARB-195, #21 ARB-196, #22 ARB-197, #23 ARB-198, #24 ARB-199, #25 ARB-200)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 77
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-151 through Exhibit ARB-175 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-151, #2 ARB-152, #3 ARB-153, #4 ARB-154, #5 ARB-155, #6 ARB-156, #7 ARB-157, #8 ARB-158, #9 ARB-159, #10 ARB-160, #11 ARB-161, #12 ARB-162, #13 ARB-163, #14 ARB-164, #15 ARB-165, #16 ARB-166, #17 ARB-167, #18 ARB-168, #19 ARB-169, #20 ARB-170, #21 ARB-171, #22 ARB-172, #23 ARB-173, #24 ARB-174, #25 ARB-175)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 76
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-126 through Exhibit ARB-150 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-126, #2 ARB-127, #3 ARB-128, #4 ARB-129, #5 ARB-130, #6 ARB-131, #7 ARB-132, #8 ARB-133, #9 ARB-134, #10 ARB-135, #11 ARB-136, #12 ARB-137, #13 ARB-138, #14 ARB-139, #15 ARB-140, #16 ARB-141, #17 ARB-142, #18 ARB-143, #19 ARB-144, #20 ARB-145, #21 ARB-146, #22 ARB-147, #23 ARB-148, #24 ARB-149, #25 ARB-150)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 75
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-101 through Exhibit ARB-125 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-101, #2 ARB-102, #3 ARB-103, #4 ARB-104, #5 ARB-105, #6 ARB-106, #7 ARB-107, #8 ARB-108, #9 ARB-109, #10 ARB-110, #11 ARB-111, #12 ARB-112, #13 ARB-113, #14 ARB-114, #15 ARB-115, #16 ARB-116, #17 ARB-117, #18 ARB-118, #19 ARB-119, #20 ARB-120, #21 ARB-121, #22 ARB-122, #23 ARB-123, #24 ARB-124, #25 ARB-125)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 74
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-76 through Exhibit ARB-100 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-76, #2 ARB-77, #3 ARB-78, #4 ARB-79, #5 ARB-80, #6 ARB-81, #7 ARB-82, #8 ARB-83, #9 ARB-84, #10 ARB-85, #11 ARB-86, #12 ARB-87, #13 ARB-88, #14 ARB-89, #15 ARB-90, #16 ARB-91, #17 ARB-92, #18 ARB-93, #19 ARB-94, #20 ARB-95, #21 ARB-96, #22 ARB-97, #23 ARB-98, #24 ARB-99, #25 ARB-100)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 73
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-51 through Exhibit ARB-75 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-51, #2 ARB-52, #3 ARB-53, #4 ARB-54, #5 ARB-55, #6 ARB-56, #7 ARB-57, #8 ARB-58, #9 ARB-59, #10 ARB-60, #11 ARB-61, #12 ARB-62, #13 ARB-63, #14 ARB-64, #15 ARB-65, #16 ARB-66, #17 ARB-67, #18 ARB-68, #19 ARB-69, #20 ARB-70, #21 ARB-71, #22 ARB-72, #23 ARB-73, #24 ARB-74, #25 ARB-75)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing 72
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-26 through Exhibit ARB-50 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-26, #2 ARB-27, #3 ARB-28, #4 ARB-29, #5 ARB-30, #6 ARB-31, #7 ARB-32, #8 ARB-33, #9 ARB-34, #10 ARB-35, #11 ARB-36, #12 ARB-37, #13 ARB-38, #14 ARB-39, #15 ARB-40, #16 ARB-41, #17 ARB-42, #18 ARB-43, #19 ARB-44, #20 ARB-45, #21 ARB-46, #22 ARB-47, #23 ARB-48, #24 ARB-49, #25 ARB-50)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 28, 2015 |
Filing 71
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Index of the Contents of the First Appendix - Exhibit ARB-1 through Exhibit ARB-25 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #70 Joint Appendix, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 ARB-1, #2 ARB-2, #3 ARB-3, #4 ARB-4, #5 ARB-5, #6 ARB-6, #7 ARB-7, #8 ARB-8, #9 ARB-9, #10 ARB-10, #11 ARB-11, #12 ARB-12, #13 ARB-13, #14 ARB-14, #15 ARB-15, #16 ARB-16, #17 ARB-17, #18 ARB-18, #19 ARB-19, #20 ARB-20, #21 ARB-21, #22 ARB-22, #23 ARB-23, #24 ARB-24, #25 ARB-25)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 28, 2015 |
Filing 70
JOINT APPENDIX / First Appendix Submitted Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(n)(1) by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of the Contents of the First Joint Appendix, December 28, 2015, #2 Exhibit 2 Corrected List of the Contents of the Arbitration Record)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 12, 2015 |
Filing 69
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex C - Index of Authorities Filed with Respondent's Reply - Exhibit RLA-125 through Exhibit RLA-145 and RLA-037 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #65 Affidavit, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #64 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RLA-125, #2 Exhibit RLA-126, #3 Exhibit RLA-127, #4 Exhibit RLA-128, #5 Exhibit RLA-129, #6 Exhibit RLA-130, #7 Exhibit RLA-131, #8 Exhibit RLA-132, #9 Exhibit RLA-133 - Part 1, #10 Exhibit RLA-133 - Part 2, #11 Exhibit RLA-134, #12 Exhibit RLA-135, #13 Exhibit RLA-136, #14 Exhibit RLA-137, #15 Exhibit RLA-138, #16 Exhibit RLA-139, #17 Exhibit RLA-140, #18 Exhibit RLA-141, #19 Exhibit RLA-142, #20 Exhibit RLA-143, #21 Exhibit RLA-144, #22 Exhibit RLA-145, #23 Exhibit RLA-037)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 12, 2015 |
Filing 68
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex C - Index of Authorities Filed with Respondent's Reply - Exhibit RLA-91 through Exhibit RLA-124 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #65 Affidavit, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #64 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RLA-91, #2 Exhibit RLA-92, #3 Exhibit RLA-93, #4 Exhibit RLA-94, #5 Exhibit RLA-95, #6 Exhibit RLA-96, #7 Exhibit RLA-97, #8 Exhibit RLA-98, #9 Exhibit RLA-99, #10 Exhibit RLA-100, #11 Exhibit RLA-101, #12 Exhibit RLA-102, #13 Exhibit RLA-103, #14 Exhibit RLA-104, #15 Exhibit RLA-105, #16 Exhibit RLA-106, #17 Exhibit RLA-107, #18 Exhibit RLA-108, #19 Exhibit RLA-109, #20 Exhibit RLA-110, #21 Exhibit RLA-111, #22 Exhibit RLA-112, #23 Exhibit RLA-113, #24 Exhibit RLA-114, #25 Exhibit RLA-115, #26 Exhibit RLA-116, #27 Exhibit RLA-117, #28 Exhibit RLA-118, #29 Exhibit RLA-119, #30 Exhibit RLA-120, #31 Exhibit RLA-121, #32 Exhibit RLA-122, #33 Exhibit RLA-123, #34 Exhibit RLA-124)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 12, 2015 |
Filing 67
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex B - Index of Fact Exhibits Filed with Respondent's Reply - Exhibit R-582 through Exhibit R-616 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #65 Affidavit, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #64 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-582, #2 Exhibit R-583, #3 Exhibit R-584, #4 Exhibit R-585, #5 Exhibit R-586, #6 Exhibit R-587, #7 Exhibit R-588, #8 Exhibit R-589, #9 Exhibit R-590, #10 Exhibit R-591, #11 Exhibit R-592, #12 Exhibit R-593, #13 Exhibit R-594, #14 Exhibit R-595, #15 Exhibit R-596, #16 Exhibit R-597, #17 Exhibit R-598, #18 Exhibit R-599, #19 Exhibit R-600, #20 Exhibit R-601, #21 Exhibit R-602, #22 Exhibit R-603, #23 Exhibit R-604, #24 Exhibit R-605, #25 Exhibit R-606, #26 Exhibit R-607, #27 Exhibit R-608, #28 Exhibit R-609, #29 Exhibit R-610, #30 Exhibit R-611, #31 Exhibit R-612, #32 Exhibit R-613, #33 Exhibit R-614, #34 Exhibit R-615, #35 Exhibit R-616)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing 66
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Annex B - Index of Fact Exhibits Filed with Respondent's Reply - Exhibit R-548 through Exhibit R-581 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #65 Affidavit, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #64 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-548, #2 Exhibit R-549, #3 Exhibit R-550, #4 Exhibit R-551, #5 Exhibit R-552, #6 Exhibit R-553, #7 Exhibit R-554, #8 Exhibit R-555, #9 Exhibit R-556, #10 Exhibit R-557, #11 Exhibit R-558, #12 Exhibit R-559, #13 Exhibit R-560, #14 Exhibit R-561, #15 Exhibit R-562, #16 Exhibit R-563, #17 Exhibit R-564, #18 Exhibit R-565, #19 Exhibit R-566, #20 Exhibit R-567, #21 Exhibit R-568, #22 Exhibit R-569, #23 Exhibit R-570, #24 Exhibit R-571, #25 Exhibit R-572, #26 Exhibit R-573, #27 Exhibit R-574, #28 Exhibit R-575, #29 Exhibit R-576, #30 Exhibit R-577, #31 Exhibit R-578, #32 Exhibit R-579, #33 Exhibit R-580, #34 Exhibit R-581)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing 65
AFFIDAVIT re #64 Reply to opposition to Motion, /Declaration of Francis A. Vasquez, Jr. by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Expert Opinion of Professor George A. Bermann, #2 Supplemental Expert Opinion of Professor Rudolf Dolzer, #3 Expert Opinion of Andreas Michaelides, #4 Opinion of Nuno Manuel Camilo Santos-Costa, #5 Opinion of Christian John Hay, #6 Expert Opinion of Professor Sean D. Murphy)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing 64
REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction /The Russian Federation's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
November 23, 2015 |
Filing 63
Memorandum in opposition to re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
November 20, 2015 |
Filing 62
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 20, 2015. (lcbah2)
|
November 19, 2015 |
Filing 61
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. Judge Amy Berman Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
|
November 19, 2015 |
Filing 60
MOTION for Recusal /PETITIONERS' MOTION TO RECUSE OR DISQUALIFY THE DISTRICT JUDGE by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
November 19, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER granting petioners' #60 Motion for Recusal. The motion is granted based on the matters set forth on the record during the telephone conference held on October 29, 2015. Given the fact that the Court disclosed this information on the record, the length and tone of petitioners' memorandum were not called for, and the bulk of their exhibits were unnecessary: the Court obviously knows what it said on the record during the conference; Exhibit 3 is hardly relevant; Exhibit 4 is blank, so it does not support petitioners' incorrect assumption that the Court listed counsel as a personal reference on the D.C. Judicial Nominating Commission form; and Exhibits 5 and 6 purport to identify the school to which the Court referred during the telephone conference, but in fact, it was not the school that counsel and the Court had in common. Petitioners therefore put private information about the Court's family on the docket for no reason whatsoever. Further, the information in footnote 3 of petitioners' memorandum in support of their motion has no bearing on the subject matter of petitioners' motion at all. The Clerk of Court is directed to refer this case to the Calendar Committee for reassignment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/19/2015. (lcabj3)
|
November 2, 2015 |
Filing 59
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on October 29, 2015; Page Numbers: 1-6. Date of Issuance: October 29, 2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
|
October 29, 2015 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/29/2015. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 58
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex B - Updated Index of Legal Authorities - Exhibit RLA-66 through Exhibit RLA-90 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #50 Errata,, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RLA-66, #2 Exhibit RLA-67, #3 Exhibit RLA-68, #4 Exhibit RLA-69, #5 Exhibit RLA-70, #6 Exhibit RLA-71, #7 Exhibit RLA-72, #8 Exhibit RLA-73, #9 Exhibit RLA-74, #10 Exhibit RLA-75, #11 Exhibit RLA-76, #12 Exhibit RLA-77, #13 Exhibit RLA-78, #14 Exhibit RLA-79, #15 Exhibit RLA-80, #16 Exhibit RLA-81, #17 Exhibit RLA-82, #18 Exhibit RLA-83, #19 Exhibit RLA-84, #20 Exhibit RLA-85, #21 Exhibit RLA-86, #22 Exhibit RLA-87, #23 Exhibit RLA-88, #24 Exhibit RLA-89, #25 Exhibit RLA-90)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 57
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex B - Updated Index of Legal Authorities - Exhibit RLA-41 through Exhibit RLA-65 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #50 Errata,, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RLA-41, #2 Exhibit RLA-42, #3 Exhibit RLA-43, #4 Exhibit RLA-44, #5 Exhibit RLA-45, #6 Exhibit RLA-46, #7 Exhibit RLA-47, #8 Exhibit RLA-48, #9 Exhibit RLA-49, #10 Exhibit RLA-50, #11 Exhibit RLA-51, #12 Exhibit RLA-52, #13 Exhibit RLA-53, #14 Exhibit RLA-54, #15 Exhibit RLA-55, #16 Exhibit RLA-56, #17 Exhibit RLA-57, #18 Exhibit RLA-58, #19 Exhibit RLA-59, #20 Exhibit RLA-60, #21 Exhibit RLA-61, #22 Exhibit RLA-62, #23 Exhibit RLA-63, #24 Exhibit RLA-64, #25 Exhibit RLA-65)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 56
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex B - Updated Index of Legal Authorities - Exhibit RLA-21 through Exhibit RLA-40 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #50 Errata,, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RLA-21, #2 Exhibit RLA-22, #3 Exhibit RLA-23, #4 Exhibit RLA-24, #5 Exhibit RLA-25, #6 Exhibit RLA-26, #7 Exhibit RLA-27, #8 Exhibit RLA-28, #9 Exhibit RLA-29, #10 Exhibit RLA-30, #11 Exhibit RLA-31, #12 Exhibit RLA-32, #13 Exhibit RLA-33, #14 Exhibit RLA-34, #15 Exhibit RLA-35, #16 Exhibit RLA-36, #17 Exhibit RLA-37, #18 Exhibit RLA-38, #19 Exhibit RLA-39, #20 Exhibit RLA-40)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 55
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex B - Updated Index of Legal Authorities - Exhibit RLA-1 through Exhibit RLA-20 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #50 Errata,, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RLA-1, #2 Exhibit RLA-2, #3 Exhibit RLA-3, #4 Exhibit RLA-4, #5 Exhibit RLA-5, #6 Exhibit RLA-6, #7 Exhibit RLA-7, #8 Exhibit RLA-8, #9 Exhibit RLA-9, #10 Exhibit RLA-10, #11 Exhibit RLA-11, #12 Exhibit RLA-12, #13 Exhibit RLA-13, #14 Exhibit RLA-14, #15 Exhibit RLA-15, #16 Exhibit RLA-16, #17 Exhibit RLA-17, #18 Exhibit RLA-18, #19 Exhibit RLA-19, #20 Exhibit RLA-20)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 54
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex A - Updated Index of Respondent's Exhibits - Exhibit R-526 through Exhibit R-547 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #50 Errata,, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-526, #2 Exhibit R-527, #3 Exhibit R-528, #4 Exhibit R-529, #5 Exhibit R-530, #6 Exhibit R-531, #7 Exhibit R-532, #8 Exhibit R-533, #9 Exhibit R-534, #10 Exhibit R-535, #11 Exhibit R-536, #12 Exhibit R-537, #13 Exhibit R-538, #14 Exhibit R-539, #15 Exhibit R-540, #16 Exhibit R-541, #17 Exhibit R-542, #18 Exhibit R-543, #19 Exhibit R-544, #20 Exhibit R-545, #21 Exhibit R-546, #22 Exhibit R-547)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 53
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex A - Updated Index of Respondent's Exhibits - Exhibit R-506 through Exhibit R-525 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #50 Errata,, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-506, #2 Exhibit R-507, #3 Exhibit R-508, #4 Exhibit R-509, #5 Exhibit R-510, #6 Exhibit R-511, #7 Exhibit R-512, #8 Exhibit R-513, #9 Exhibit R-514, #10 Exhibit R-515, #11 Exhibit R-516, #12 Exhibit R-517, #13 Exhibit R-518, #14 Exhibit R-519, #15 Exhibit R-520, #16 Exhibit R-521, #17 Exhibit R-522, #18 Exhibit R-523, #19 Exhibit R-524, #20 Exhibit R-525)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 52
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex A - Updated Index of Respondent's Exhibits - Exhibit R-470 through Exhibit R-472; Exhibit R-474 through Exhibit R-476; Exhibit R-478 through Exhibit R-480; Exhibit R-482; Exhibit R-484; Exhibit R-489; Exhibit R-491; Exhibit R-494; Exhibit R-495; Exhibit R-501 through Exhibit R-505 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #50 Errata,, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-470, #2 Exhibit R-471, #3 Exhibit R-472, #4 Exhibit R-474, #5 Exhibit R-475, #6 Exhibit R-476, #7 Exhibit R-478, #8 Exhibit R-479, #9 Exhibit R-480, #10 Exhibit R-482, #11 Exhibit R-484, #12 Exhibit R-489, #13 Exhibit R-491, #14 Exhibit R-494, #15 Exhibit R-495, #16 Exhibit R-501, #17 Exhibit R-502, #18 Exhibit R-503, #19 Exhibit R-504, #20 Exhibit R-505)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 51
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Annex A - Updated Index of Respondent's Exhibits - Exhibit R-272; Exhibit R-294; Exhibit R-449 through Exhibit R-460; Exhibit R-464 through Exhibit R-469 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #50 Errata,, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-272, #2 Exhibit R-294, #3 Exhibit R-449, #4 Exhibit R-450, #5 Exhibit R-451, #6 Exhibit R-452, #7 Exhibit R-453, #8 Exhibit R-454, #9 Exhibit R-455, #10 Exhibit R-456, #11 Exhibit R-457, #12 Exhibit R-458, #13 Exhibit R-459, #14 Exhibit R-460, #15 Exhibit R-464, #16 Exhibit R-465, #17 Exhibit R-466, #18 Exhibit R-467, #19 Exhibit R-468, #20 Exhibit R-469)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 50
ERRATA by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Annex A - Updated Index of Respondent's Exhibits, #2 Annex B - Updated Index of Legal Authorities)(Vasquez, Francis)
|
October 23, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. An on the record Telephone Conference call in this case is scheduled for Thursday, October 29, 2015, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Counsel for the parties will be separately notified by the Court's Deputy Clerk, of the telephone number and dial in procedures to participate in the call. SO ORDERED. Before Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/23/2015. (jth)
|
October 22, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: The schedule previously set in this matter is hereby revised as follows: By 11/23/2015, Petitioners shall respond in part to the Motion to Dismiss, focusing their Opposition solely on the legal issues raised in pages 25 - 44 of Respondent's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #24), and in particular, the issues raised on pages 38 - 44; Respondent may file a Reply by 12/11/2015; Once the Court has ruled on the question of its subject matter jurisdiction, it will, if necessary, provide petitioners with an opportunity to Respond to the factual allegations raised in the first 23 pages of the Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Dismiss and set a schedule for further briefing on the Motion to Deny Confirmation of the Arbitration Award (Dkt. #23). (jth)
|
October 22, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court is respondent's #24 motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. To determine whether a district court has subject matter jurisdiction in an action seeking to enforce a foreign arbitral award against a foreign sovereign, "there must be a basis upon which a court in the United States may enforce a foreign arbitral award, and... [the foreign state] must not enjoy sovereign immunity from such an enforcement action." Creighton Ltd. v. Govt of State of Qatar, 181 F.3d 118, 121 (D.C. Cir. 1999). Therefore, the schedule previously set in this matter is hereby revised as follows: petitioners shall, by November 23, 2015, respond in part to the motion to dismiss, focusing their opposition solely on the legal issues raised in pages 25 - 44 of respondent's #24 memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss, and in particular, the issues raised on pages 38 - 44. Respondent may file a reply by December 11, 2015. Once the Court has ruled on the question of its subject matter jurisdiction, it will, if necessary, provide petitioners with an opportunity to respond to the factual allegations raised in the first 23 pages of the memorandum in support of the motion to dismiss and set a schedule for further briefing on the #23 motion to deny confirmation of the arbitration award. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/2015. (lcabj3)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 49
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-441 through Exhibit R-500 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-441, #2 Exhibit R-442, #3 Exhibit R-443, #4 Exhibit R-444, #5 Exhibit R-445, #6 Exhibit R-446, #7 Exhibit R-448, #8 Exhibit R-461, #9 Exhibit R-462, #10 Exhibit R-463, #11 Exhibit R-471, #12 Exhibit R-473, #13 Exhibit R-477, #14 Exhibit R-481, #15 Exhibit R-483, #16 Exhibit R-485, #17 Exhibit R-486, #18 Exhibit R-487, #19 Exhibit R-488, #20 Exhibit R-490, #21 Exhibit R-492, #22 Exhibit R-493, #23 Exhibit R-496, #24 Exhibit R-497, #25 Exhibit R-498, #26 Exhibit R-499, #27 Exhibit R-500)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 48
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-421 through Exhibit R-440 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-421, #2 Exhibit R-422, #3 Exhibit R-423, #4 Exhibit R-424, #5 Exhibit R-425, #6 Exhibit R-426, #7 Exhibit R-427, #8 Exhibit R-428, #9 Exhibit R-429, #10 Exhibit R-430, #11 Exhibit R-431, #12 Exhibit R-432, #13 Exhibit R-433, #14 Exhibit R-434, #15 Exhibit R-435, #16 Exhibit R-436, #17 Exhibit R-437, #18 Exhibit R-438, #19 Exhibit R-439, #20 Exhibit R-440)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 47
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-401 through Exhibit R-420 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-401, #2 Exhibit R-402, #3 Exhibit R-403, #4 Exhibit R-404, #5 Exhibit R-405, #6 Exhibit R-406, #7 Exhibit R-407, #8 Exhibit R-408, #9 Exhibit R-409, #10 Exhibit R-410, #11 Exhibit R-411, #12 Exhibit R-412, #13 Exhibit R-413, #14 Exhibit R-414, #15 Exhibit R-415, #16 Exhibit R-416, #17 Exhibit R-417, #18 Exhibit R-418, #19 Exhibit R-419, #20 Exhibit R-420)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 46
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-381 through Exhibit R-400 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-381, #2 Exhibit R-382, #3 Exhibit R-383, #4 Exhibit R-384, #5 Exhibit R-385, #6 Exhibit R-386, #7 Exhibit R-387, #8 Exhibit R-388, #9 Exhibit R-389, #10 Exhibit R-390, #11 Exhibit R-391, #12 Exhibit R-392, #13 Exhibit R-393, #14 Exhibit R-394, #15 Exhibit R-395, #16 Exhibit R-396, #17 Exhibit R-397, #18 Exhibit R-398, #19 Exhibit R-399, #20 Exhibit R-400)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 45
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-361 through Exhibit R-380 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-361, #2 Exhibit R-362, #3 Exhibit R-363, #4 Exhibit R-364, #5 Exhibit R-365, #6 Exhibit R-366, #7 Exhibit R-367, #8 Exhibit R-368, #9 Exhibit R-369, #10 Exhibit R-370, #11 Exhibit R-371, #12 Exhibit R-372, #13 Exhibit R-373, #14 Exhibit R-374, #15 Exhibit R-375, #16 Exhibit R-376, #17 Exhibit R-377, #18 Exhibit R-378, #19 Exhibit R-379, #20 Exhibit R-380)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 44
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-341 through Exhibit R-360 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-341, #2 Exhibit R-342, #3 Exhibit R-343, #4 Exhibit R-344, #5 Exhibit R-345, #6 Exhibit R-346, #7 Exhibit R-347, #8 Exhibit R-348, #9 Exhibit R-349, #10 Exhibit R-350, #11 Exhibit R-351, #12 Exhibit R-352, #13 Exhibit R-353, #14 Exhibit R-354, #15 Exhibit R-355, #16 Exhibit R-356, #17 Exhibit R-357, #18 Exhibit R-358, #19 Exhibit R-359, #20 Exhibit R-360)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 43
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-321 through Exhibit R-340 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-321, #2 Exhibit R-322, #3 Exhibit R-323, #4 Exhibit R-324, #5 Exhibit R-325, #6 Exhibit R-326, #7 Exhibit R-327, #8 Exhibit R-328, #9 Exhibit R-329, #10 Exhibit R-330, #11 Exhibit R-331, #12 Exhibit R-332, #13 Exhibit R-333, #14 Exhibit R-334, #15 Exhibit R-335, #16 Exhibit R-336, #17 Exhibit R-337, #18 Exhibit R-338, #19 Exhibit R-339, #20 Exhibit R-340)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 42
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-301 through Exhibit R-320 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-301, #2 Exhibit R-302, #3 Exhibit R-303, #4 Exhibit R-304, #5 Exhibit R-305, #6 Exhibit R-306, #7 Exhibit R-307, #8 Exhibit R-308, #9 Exhibit R-309, #10 Exhibit R-310, #11 Exhibit R-311, #12 Exhibit R-312, #13 Exhibit R-313, #14 Exhibit R-314, #15 Exhibit R-315, #16 Exhibit R-316, #17 Exhibit R-317, #18 Exhibit R-318, #19 Exhibit R-319, #20 Exhibit R-320)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 41
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-281 through Exhibit R-300 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-281, #2 Exhibit R-282, #3 Exhibit R-283, #4 Exhibit R-284, #5 Exhibit R-285, #6 Exhibit R-286, #7 Exhibit R-287, #8 Exhibit R-288, #9 Exhibit R-289, #10 Exhibit R-290, #11 Exhibit R-291, #12 Exhibit R-292, #13 Exhibit R-293, #14 Exhibit R-295, #15 Exhibit R-296, #16 Exhibit R-297, #17 Exhibit R-298, #18 Exhibit R-299, #19 Exhibit R-300)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 40
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-261 through Exhibit R-280 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-261, #2 Exhibit R-262, #3 Exhibit R-263, #4 Exhibit R-264, #5 Exhibit R-265, #6 Exhibit R-266, #7 Exhibit R-267, #8 Exhibit R-268, #9 Exhibit R-269, #10 Exhibit R-270, #11 Exhibit R-271, #12 Exhibit R-272, #13 Exhibit R-273, #14 Exhibit R-274, #15 Exhibit R-275, #16 Exhibit R-276, #17 Exhibit R-277, #18 Exhibit R-278, #19 Exhibit R-279, #20 Exhibit R-280)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 39
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-241 through Exhibit R-260 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-241, #2 Exhibit R-242, #3 Exhibit R-243, #4 Exhibit R-244, #5 Exhibit R-245, #6 Exhibit R-246, #7 Exhibit R-247, #8 Exhibit R-248, #9 Exhibit R-249, #10 Exhibit R-250, #11 Exhibit R-251, #12 Exhibit R-252, #13 Exhibit R-253, #14 Exhibit R-254, #15 Exhibit R-255, #16 Exhibit R-256, #17 Exhibit R-257, #18 Exhibit R-258, #19 Exhibit R-259, #20 Exhibit R-260)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 38
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-221 through Exhibit R-240 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-221, #2 Exhibit R-222, #3 Exhibit R-223, #4 Exhibit R-224, #5 Exhibit R-225, #6 Exhibit R-226, #7 Exhibit R-227, #8 Exhibit R-228, #9 Exhibit R-229, #10 Exhibit R-230, #11 Exhibit R-231, #12 Exhibit R-232, #13 Exhibit R-233, #14 Exhibit R-234, #15 Exhibit R-235, #16 Exhibit R-236, #17 Exhibit R-237, #18 Exhibit R-238, #19 Exhibit R-239, #20 Exhibit R-240)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 37
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-201 through Exhibit R-220 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-201, #2 Exhibit R-202, #3 Exhibit R-203, #4 Exhibit R-204, #5 Exhibit R-205, #6 Exhibit R-206, #7 Exhibit R-207, #8 Exhibit R-208, #9 Exhibit R-209, #10 Exhibit R-210, #11 Exhibit R-211, #12 Exhibit R-212, #13 Exhibit R-213, #14 Exhibit R-214, #15 Exhibit R-215, #16 Exhibit R-216, #17 Exhibit R-217, #18 Exhibit R-218, #19 Exhibit R-219, #20 Exhibit R-220)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 36
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-181 through Exhibit R-200 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-181, #2 Exhibit R-182, #3 Exhibit R-183, #4 Exhibit R-184, #5 Exhibit R-185, #6 Exhibit R-186, #7 Exhibit R-187, #8 Exhibit R-188, #9 Exhibit R-189, #10 Exhibit R-190, #11 Exhibit R-191, #12 Exhibit R-192, #13 Exhibit R-193, #14 Exhibit R-194, #15 Exhibit R-195, #16 Exhibit R-196, #17 Exhibit R-197, #18 Exhibit R-198, #19 Exhibit R-199, #20 Exhibit R-200)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 35
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-161 through Exhiit R-180 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-161, #2 Exhibit R-162, #3 Exhibit R-163, #4 Exhibit R-164, #5 Exhibit R-165, #6 Exhibit R-166, #7 Exhibit R-167, #8 Errata R-168, #9 Exhibit R-169 part 1, #10 Exhibit R-169 part 2, #11 Exhibit R-169 part 3, #12 Exhibit R-169 part 4, #13 Exhibit R-169 part 5, #14 Exhibit R-169 part 6, #15 Exhibit R-169 part 7, #16 Exhibit R-169 part 8, #17 Exhibit R-169 part 9, #18 Exhibit R-169 part 10, #19 Exhibit R-170, #20 Exhibit R-171, #21 Exhibit R-172, #22 Exhibit R-173, #23 Exhibit R-174, #24 Exhibit R-175, #25 Exhibit R-176, #26 Exhibit R-177, #27 Exhibit R-178, #28 Exhibit R-179, #29 Exhibit R-180)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 34
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-141 through Exhibit R-160 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-141, #2 Exhibit R-142, #3 Exhibit R-143, #4 Exhibit R-144, #5 Exhibit R-145, #6 Exhibit R-146, #7 Exhibit R-147, #8 Exhibit R-148, #9 Exhibit R-149 part 1, #10 Exhibit R-149 part 2, #11 Exhibit R-149 part 3, #12 Exhibit R-149 part 4, #13 Exhibit R-149 part 5, #14 Exhibit R-150, #15 Exhibit R-151, #16 Exhibit R-152, #17 Exhibit R-153, #18 Exhibit R-154, #19 Exhibit R-155, #20 Exhibit R-156, #21 Exhibit R-157 part 1, #22 Exhibit R-157 part 2, #23 Exhibit R-157 part 3, #24 Exhibit R-158, #25 Exhibit R-159, #26 Exhibit R-160)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 33
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) /Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-121 through R-140 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-121, #2 Exhibit R-122, #3 Exhibit R-123, #4 Exhibit R-124, #5 Exhibit R-125, #6 Exhibit R-126, #7 Exhibit R-127, #8 Exhibit R-128, #9 Exhibit R-129, #10 Exhibit R-130, #11 Exhibit R-131, #12 Exhibit R-132, #13 Exhibit R-133, #14 Exhibit R-134, #15 Exhibit R-135, #16 Exhibit R-136, #17 Exhibit R-137, #18 Exhibit R-138, #19 Exhibit R-139, #20 Exhibit R-140)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 32
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-101 through Exhibit R-120 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-101, #2 Exhibit R-102, #3 Exhibit R-103, #4 Exhibit R-104, #5 Exhibit R-105, #6 Exhibit R-106, #7 Exhibit R-107, #8 Exhibit R-108, #9 Exhibit R-109, #10 Exhibit R-110, #11 Exhibit R-111, #12 Exhibit R-112, #13 Exhibit R-113, #14 Exhibit R-114, #15 Exhibit R-115, #16 Exhibit R-116, #17 Exhibit R-117, #18 Exhibit R-118, #19 Exhibit R-119, #20 Exhibit R-120)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 31
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-81 through Exhibit R-100 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-81, #2 Exhibit R-82, #3 Exhibit R-83, #4 Exhibit R-84, #5 Exhibit R-85, #6 Exhibit R-86, #7 Exhibit R-87, #8 Exhibit R-88, #9 Exhibit R-89, #10 Exhibit R-90, #11 Errata R-91, #12 Exhibit R-92, #13 Exhibit R-93, #14 Exhibit R-94, #15 Exhibit R-95, #16 Exhibit R-96, #17 Exhibit R-97, #18 Exhibit R-98, #19 Exhibit R-99, #20 Exhibit R-100)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 30
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-56 through Exhibit R-80 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-56, #2 Exhibit R-57, #3 Exhibit R-58, #4 Exhibit R-59, #5 Exhibit R-60, #6 Exhibit R-61, #7 Exhibit R-62, #8 Exhibit R-63, #9 Exhibit R-64, #10 Exhibit R-65, #11 Exhibit R-66, #12 Exhibit R-67, #13 Exhibit R-68, #14 Exhibit R-69, #15 Exhibit R-70, #16 Exhibit R-71, #17 Exhibit R-72, #18 Exhibit R-73, #19 Exhibit R-74, #20 Exhibit R-75, #21 Exhibit R-76, #22 Exhibit R-77, #23 Exhibit R-78, #24 Exhibit R-79, #25 Exhibit R-80)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 29
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-55, Part 15 through Exhibit R-55, Part 31 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-55, Part 15, #2 Exhibit R-55, Part 16, #3 Exhibit R-55, Part 17, #4 Exhibit R-55, Part 18, #5 Exhibit R-55, Part 19, #6 Exhibit R-55, Part 20, #7 Exhibit R-55, Part 21, #8 Exhibit R-55, Part 22, #9 Exhibit R-55, Part 23, #10 Exhibit R-55, Part 24, #11 Exhibit R-55, Part 25, #12 Exhibit R-55, Part 26, #13 Exhibit R-55, Part 27, #14 Exhibit R-55, Part 28, #15 Exhibit R-55, Part 29, #16 Exhibit R-55, Part 30, #17 Exhibit R-55, Part 31)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 28
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-55, Part 1 through Exhibit R-55, Part 14 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-55, Part 1, #2 Exhibit R-55, Part 2, #3 Exhibit R-55, Part 3, #4 Exhibit R-55, Part 4, #5 Exhibit R-55, Part 5, #6 Exhibit R-55, Part 6, #7 Exhibit R-55, Part 7, #8 Exhibit R-55, Part 8, #9 Exhibit R-55, Part 9, #10 Exhibit R-55, Part 10, #11 Exhibit R-55, Part 11, #12 Exhibit R-55, Part 12, #13 Exhibit R-55, Part 13, #14 Exhibit R-55, Part 14)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 27
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-41 through Exhibit R-54 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-41, #2 Exhibit R-42, #3 Exhibit R-43, #4 Exhibit R-44, #5 Exhibit R-45, #6 Exhibit R-46, #7 Exhibit R-47, #8 Exhibit R-48, #9 Exhibit R-49, #10 Exhibit R-50, #11 Exhibit R-51, #12 Exhibit R-52, #13 Exhibit R-53, #14 Exhibit R-54)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 26
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-21 through Exhibit R-40 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-21, #2 Exhibit R-22, #3 Exhibit R-23, #4 Exhibit R-24, #5 Exhibit R-25, #6 Exhibit R-26, #7 Exhibit R-27, #8 Exhibit R-28, #9 Exhibit R-29, #10 Exhibit R-30, #11 Exhibit R-31, #12 Exhibit R-32, #13 Exhibit R-33, #14 Exhibit R-34, #15 Exhibit R-35, #16 Exhibit R-36, #17 Exhibit R-37, #18 Exhibit R-38, #19 Exhibit R-39, #20 Exhibit R-40)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 25
LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) / Master Index of Exhibits - Exhibit R-1 through Exhibit R-20 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION #23 MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-1, #2 Exhibit R-2, #3 Exhibit R-3, #4 Exhibit R-4, #5 Exhibit R-5, #6 Exhibit R-6, #7 Exhibit R-7, #8 Exhibit R-8, #9 Exhibit R-9, #10 Exhibit R-10, #11 Exhibit R-11, #12 Exhibit R-12, #13 Exhibit R-13, #14 Exhibit R-14, #15 Exhibit R-15, #16 Exhibit R-16, #17 Exhibit R-17, #18 Exhibit R-18, #19 Exhibit R-19, #20 Exhibit R-20)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing 24
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Awards for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gitas Povilo Anilionis, #2 Declaration of Arkady Vitalyevich Zakharov, #3 Declaration of Colonel of Justice Sergey A. Mikhailov, #4 Expert Report of S.P. Kothari, #5 Expert Report of James Dow, #6 Opinion of Russian Law of Professor Anton V. Asoskov, #7 Expert Opinion of Professor George A Berman, #8 Expert Opinion of Professor Rudolf Dolzer, #9 Deckaration of Albert Jan van den Berg, #10 Declaration of Pavel Yurievich Boulatov, #11 Declaration of Francis A Vasquez, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing 23
MOTION / Respondent's Motion to Deny Confirmation of Arbitration Awards Pursuant to New York Convention by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
October 19, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court is respondent's #22 unopposed motion for leave to file the arbitration record in this case on a USB device. The parties are directed to review Local Civil Rule 7(n)(1), which is "intended to assist the Court in cases involving a voluminous record." Cmt. to LCvR 7(n)(1). The parties are further directed to review Local Civil Rule 5.1(h), which requires that any materials sought to filed under seal be accompanied by a motion for leave to do so. It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a modified proposed schedule that utilizes the procedures set forth in those local rules. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/19/2015. (lcabj3)
|
October 18, 2015 |
Filing 22
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Arbitration Record on USB Device by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 4, 2015 |
Filing 21
Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation)(Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 4, 2015 |
Filing 20
NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Beth Lamm on behalf of RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Lamm, Carolyn)
|
August 4, 2015 |
Filing 19
NOTICE of Appearance by Francis A. Vasquez, Jr on behalf of RUSSIAN FEDERATION (Vasquez, Francis)
|
August 4, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondent shall file any Response to the Petition by 10/20/2015; Petitioners shall file any Opposition by 12/22/2015; Respondent shall file any Reply by 1/29/2016. (jth)
|
August 4, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Briefing Schedule. It is ORDERED that respondent shall respond to the petition on or before October 20, 2015. It is FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners shall file any opposition by December 22, 2015. And it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall file any reply on or before January 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/4/2015. (lcabj3)
|
July 24, 2015 |
Filing 18
SUPPLEMENT re #17 Summons Returned Executed as to foreign state or agency filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Originals returned to counsel for plaintiff) (jf)
|
July 17, 2015 |
Filing 17
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to RUSSIAN FEDERATION served on 6/22/2015, answer due 8/21/2015. (jf) (Originals returned to counsel for plaintiff)
|
July 7, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Status Report shall be filed on 8/6/2015, if proof of service has not yet been filed. (jth)
|
July 7, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the #16 status report filed by petitioners, it is ORDERED that a further status report shall be filed on August 6, 2015, if proof of service has not yet been filed. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/7/2015. (lcabj3)
|
July 1, 2015 |
Filing 16
STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
May 19, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the #15 status report filed by petitioners, it is ORDERED that a further status report shall be filed on July 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/19/2015. (lcabj3)
|
May 19, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadline: A further Status Report shall be filed by 7/1/2015. (jth)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing 15
STATUS REPORT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.(Ryan, Christopher) Modified on 5/18/2015 (jf, ).
|
May 11, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that petitioners shall file a status report in this case on or before May 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/11/2015. (lcabj3)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/18/2015. (zsm)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing 14
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on Russian Federation, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the U. S. Department of State, Edward Betancourt, Director, Office of Policy Review and Interagency Liaison Overseas Citizens Services, 2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, 4th Floor, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PS Form 3800 certified mail receipts) (jf, )
|
January 7, 2015 |
Filing 13
AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING /Request for Service of Process, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 1608(a)(4) by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
December 15, 2014 |
Filing 12
SUMMONS Reissued Electronically as to THE RUSSIAN FEDERATION (jf, )
|
December 15, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave of Richard Franklin Schwed to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. The Court notes that the applicant's declaration in support of the motion failed to note that he was admitted pro hac vice to this Court in a case in 2013. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/15/14. (DMK)
|
December 15, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave of Henry S. Weisburg to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/15/14. (DMK)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing 11
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard Franklin Schwed, :Firm- Shearman & Sterling LLP, :Address- 599 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 848-4000. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3934994. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing 10
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Henry S. Weisburg, :Firm- Shearman & Sterling LLP, :Address- 599 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 848-4000. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3934992. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing 9
NOTICE OF SUIT by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing 8
NOTICE OF CORRECTED SUMMONS by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
December 10, 2014 |
Filing 7
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to THE RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Notice of Consent)(rd)
|
December 2, 2014 |
Filing 6
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Christopher R. Cooper no longer assigned to the case. (gt, )
|
December 1, 2014 |
Filing 5
NOTICE OF DISQUALIFICATION (tcr)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 4
NOTICE OF CORRECTED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARDS by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 3
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Ryan, Christopher)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 2
AFFIDAVIT re #1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, / Declaration of Emmanuel Gaillard by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 1
PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against THE RUSSIAN FEDERATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3917027) filed by HULLEY ENTERPRISES LTD., VETERAN PETROLEUM LTD., YUKOS UNIVERSAL LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ryan, Christopher)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md, )
|