ALLI, et al v. USA

Plaintiff: BENJAMIN ALLI, SHAKI ALLI and BSA CORPORATION
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2001cv00669
Filed: November 29, 2001
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2008 115 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION. Joint Status Report due by 9/26/2008. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
October 27, 2008 118 Featured Case ORDER: This case will be restored to the active docket, if the next joint status report does not reveal that significant progress has been made toward settlement. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
November 3, 2008 119 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 11/24/2008. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
November 25, 2008 121 Featured Case ORDER: Motion for reconsideration due by 12/22/2008. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 23, 2009 127 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION denying 124 Motion for Reconsideration. Joint status report due on or before 3/13/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
March 16, 2009 129 Featured Case ORDER: The parties shall file either a stipulation for entry of judgment or, a joint status report in this case. Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
April 15, 2009 132 Featured Case ORDER granting 130 Motion to Withdraw as attorney for all plaintiffs. Plaintiffs new counsel shall file a notice of appearance by 5/04/2009. Joint Status due by 5/11/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 6, 2009 134 Featured Case ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk shall mail this order to Plaintiffs at their new address. Notice of Compliance due by 7/6/2009. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2009. No further enlargements of either of these deadlines will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 12, 2009 137 Featured Case ORDER: The Clerk shall mail this order to Plaintiffs at their new address Plaintiffs shall file their response to defendants motion for summary judgment by 8/20/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
July 10, 2009 139 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiffs shall secure new counsel and that counsel shall file a notice of appearance on or before 7/27/2009. If plaintiffs fail to comply with this deadline, the court will entertain a motion from defendant for entry of a default judgment on the government's counterclaims pursuant to RCFC 55. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
December 4, 2009 154 Featured Case ORDER: On October 15, 2009, plaintiffs, acting pro se, attempted to file a motion to alter or amend the courts September 25, 2009 order. For the same reasons outlined in the courts order of September 25, 2009, plaintiffs have no standing to file thi s motion to alter or amend. Accordingly, the Clerk shall return the motion and mail this order to plaintiffs at the following address: P.O. Box 36081, Grosse Pointe, Michigan, 48236. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 3, 2010 155 Featured Case ORDER. The court has carefully reviewed defendants default judgment motion filed on August 25, 2009, and has developed set of questions regarding the expenditures and collections defendant claims. Defendant shall file a response to these questions by 3/19/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 24, 2010 157 Featured Case ORDER directing the Clerk to convert this case to paper filing, effective today. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 22, 2011 205 Featured Case ORDER granting 204 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 10/20/2011. Reply due by 11/7/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 8, 2011 210 Featured Case ORDER granting 209 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 15, 2012 213 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION granting 145 Motion for default judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ALLI, et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN ALLI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAKI ALLI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSA CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Dawn Elyse Goodman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]