PRESIDIO ADVISORS, LLC, NORVEST LTD. v. USA

Plaintiff: PRESIDIO ADVISORS, LLC, NORVEST LTD.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2005cv00411
Filed: March 29, 2005
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION: granting 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2011). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 25, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 106 Joint Status Report,in which petitioner reported that, in light of the courts October 6, 2011, decision granting defendants motion for partial summary judgment, petitioner is considering conceding the remainder of this case. Notice of Compliance due by 11/10/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 10, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 108 Joint Status Report. Notice of Compliance due by 12/12/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 13, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 110 joint status report. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or other document representing plaintiff's concession of the remainder of this case due by 1/31/2012. No further enlargements will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 2, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/8/2012 at 11:00 AM (EST) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 8, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/10/2012 at 2:00 PM (EST) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 10, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or other document representing plaintiff's concession of the remainder of this case due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 13, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 117 joint stipulation for entry of judgment. The Clerk is hereby directed to enter judgment set forth pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 21, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
April 13, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On April 13, 2009, the parties filed a joint status report requesting that the stay be reinstated. At this juncture, the court does not perceive a reason to reinstate the stay. Plaintiff shall file appropriate notification of its new counsel by 6/12/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 5, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 5, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 9/2/2009. No further enlargements of this deadline shall be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 26, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery due by 10/4/2010. Expert Witness Reports Discovery due by 1/3/2011. Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 8, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff shall serve its answers to defendant's first set of interrogatories, and shall respond to and produce documents responsive to defendant's first set of document requests by 6/15/2010. Plaintiff shall file with the court a notice of compliance with this deadline by 6/15/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
July 27, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion to Take Deposition. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
August 10, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/16/2010 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 17, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery completed by 1/4/2011. Expert witness reports shall be served by 3/2/2011. Expert Discovery completed by 4/5/2011. Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2011. No further enlargements of these deadlines will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
November 16, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Response due by 12/1/2010. Reply due by 12/15/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
December 13, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery completed by 6/3/2011. Expert Discovery completed by 8/5/2011. Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 2, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER OF 02/02/2011 ORDER: Pursuant to RCFC 45(c)(2)(B)(i), defendant shall notify third party Holland & Hart, LLP, re: 86 motion to compel, and file notice with the court that it has complied with this courts order. Notice of Compliance due by 2/11/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER OF 02/02/2011
February 7, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 16, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing each party to file their replies to the 91 Response, Holland & Hart LLP. Replies due by 2/24/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 16, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties shall file any revisions to the letter, including any attachments, as necessary, and a response to paragraph 16, which requires the [s]pecification of privilege or duty to refuse to give evidence under the law of the State of origin. Notice of Compliance due by 2/22/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 14, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 4/19/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRESIDIO ADVISORS, LLC, NORVEST LTD. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESIDIO ADVISORS, LLC, NORVEST LTD.
Represented By: Theodore H. Merriam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Karen Elisabeth Servidea
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]