PRESTOP HOLDINGS, LLC et al v. USA

Plaintiff: PRESTOP HOLDINGS, LLC, JL INVESTMENT TRUST and JOHN M. LARSON
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2005cv00576
Filed: May 26, 2005
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2008, and every 91 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 10, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 16, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 5, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 5, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 9/2/2009. No further enlargements of this deadline shall be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
December 23, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until January 25, 2010 to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 1/25/2010. Reply due by 2/16/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 22, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response due by 2/4/2010. Defendant's reply due by 3/9/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
April 6, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 49 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1)MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) : Oral Argument set for 5/11/2010 at 10:00 AM (CDT)at United States District Court for the District of Colorado, Courtroom A-501, 901 19th Street, Denver, CO before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 1, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a complete copy of plaintiff's 1997 IRS Form 1040. Notice of Compliance due by 6/8/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
December 7, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION: denying 49 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); Joint Status Report indicating how this case should proceed, with a proposed scheduled, due by 1/5/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 7, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/18/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 19, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Plaintiff shall file a Status Report indicating whether it will file a motion for summary judgment by 1/31/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 2, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures shall be completed by 2/18/2011. Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2011. Expert Witnesses shall be designated and Expert Report shall be served by 12/22/2011. Expert Discovery completed by 2/22/2012. Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
April 13, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 14, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff shall serve defendant with clarifications of its responses to defendants first set of requests for productiondue by 6/20/2011. Plaintiff shall serve defendant with its answers and objections to defendants first set of interrogatories by 6/30/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 21, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to 73 notice by 7/28/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 1, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 77 parties stipulation for the entry of judgment. Pursuant to RCFC Appendix F, Rule 7(a), the Clerk is hereby ordered to enter judgment dismissing this complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PRESTOP HOLDINGS, LLC et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESTOP HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Theodore H. Merriam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL INVESTMENT TRUST
Represented By: Theodore H. Merriam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M. LARSON
Represented By: Theodore H. Merriam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Karen Elisabeth Servidea
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]