PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND SUBSIDIARIES v. USA

Case Number: 1:2007cv00006
Filed: January 4, 2007
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2013 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on 110 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 129 CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 110 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Oral Argument set for 11/12/2013 at 10:00 AM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 14, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file its reply and a response to plaintiff's cross-motion, if any, response due by 1/15/2014. Plaintiff shall file their reply in support of the cross-motion, if any, reply due by 2/17/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 9, 2014 180 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION denying 110 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting, in part, 129 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 4, 2015 204 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION denying 163 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 168 Cross Motion. Chambers will contact the parties to set up a status conference to discuss a trial schedule for the resolution of this matter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND SUBSIDIARIES v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.