PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY et al v. USA

Plaintiff: PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY and SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY
Defendant: USA
Consolidated_plaintiff: SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY
Movant: CALIFORNIA POWER EXCHANGE CORPORATION
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00157
Filed: March 12, 2007
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Loren A. Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 257 Featured Case PUBLISHED MEMORNDUM OPINION setting forth the reasoning behind the Court's 242 December 1, 2010 Order GRANTING the California Power Exchange Corporation's 231 Motion to Quash Notice. Signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith. (sk1) Copy to parties.
May 2, 2012 259 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION. Signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1) Copy to parties.
April 2, 2013 288 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER denying 280 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1) Copy to parties.
April 2, 2013 290 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION granting Plaintiffs' Motion.. Signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1) Copy to parties.
December 20, 2013 311 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION vacating prior Published Opinion, Docket Number 259. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cm) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Marie L. Fiala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY
Represented By: Jane I. Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Timothy Paul McIlmail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Mark Fogelman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CALIFORNIA POWER EXCHANGE CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]