KISLEV PARTNERS, L.P

Plaintiff: KISLEV PARTNERS, L.P
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00625
Filed: August 22, 2007
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Mary Ellen Coster Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2008 25 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION denying 14 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); Status conference scheduled for 10/16/2008 at 11:00 a.m. ET.Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Amended by Opinion filed 08/13/08(lld).
August 13, 2008 27 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION amending Opinion filed on 08/05/08. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (sd1)
October 9, 2008 35 Featured Case ORDER denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: KISLEV PARTNERS, L.P
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KISLEV PARTNERS, L.P
Represented By: N. Jerold Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Robert J. Higgins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]