PARKWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. USA

Plaintiff: PARKWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2007cv00742
Filed: October 24, 2007
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court hereby relieves the parties from filing a joint status report every fifty-six days as previously required. (si)
November 6, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/14/2008 02:00 PM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
November 14, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 7, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 16 CROSS MOTION: Oral Argument set for 3/19/2009 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 11, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion. Oral Argument set for 3/17/2009 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 10, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: At oral argument scheduled for March 17, 2009, the parties should be prepared to discuss whether each failure to honor a prepayment request represents a breach of the contract at issue. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 16, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Oral argument in this case is scheduled for March 17, 2009. The parties shall be prepared to discuss: Aktiebolaget Bofors v. United States, 139 Ct. Cl. 642 1957) and San Carlos Irrigation and Drainage District v. United States, 23 Cl. Ct. 276 (1991). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 7, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Pursuant to the parties request, this case hereby remains stayed until further order. Joint Status Report due by 3/4/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 4, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2010 with subsequent reports filed every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
August 10, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. The court restores this case to the active docket. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
November 22, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 53 Second MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Additional Authority. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
April 8, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION/ORDER Of DISMISSAL: granting 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 16 Cross Motion. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 3, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Clayton Gill terminated. The Clerk is hereby directed to mail a copy of this order directly to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARKWOOD ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Charles Clayton Gill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Shalom Brilliant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]