WASHINGTON MUTUAL, INC. et al v. USA

Plaintiff: WASHINGTON MUTUAL, INC., WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK and SAVINGS OF AMERICA, INC.
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00321
Filed: April 30, 2008
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Referring Judge: Marian Blank Horn
 
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 125 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 7/30/2013 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
August 1, 2013 127 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 9/13/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
September 3, 2013 129 Featured Case ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery on Counts I and III in this matter. Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2013. The parties shall comply with all requirements of RCFC 26(a)(2) with respect to dis closure of expert testimony. On or before 11/12/2013, the parties shall exchange expert reports; on or before 12/16/2013, the parties shall exchange expert rebuttal reports; and, on or before 2/14/2014, expert discovery and/or depositions shall be completed. Status Report due by 2/24/2014 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
September 17, 2013 132 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER on Count II settlement proceedings. Status Report due by 10/31/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
September 24, 2013 133 Featured Case ORDER granting 131 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b). Plaintiffs shall FILE Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by 9/27/2013 as a separate docket entry in this matter. Defendant shall FILE its Answer or otherwise r espond to plaintiffs' first amended complaint by 10/25/2013. Count's I and III of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint shall continue in discovery and Count II of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint shall continue to be stayed pending settlement discussings. The parties shall COMPLY with the court's scheduling orders of September 3, 2013 (Count's I and III discovery schedule) and September 17, 2013 (Count II Joint Status Report Order). Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 8, 2013 136 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 8, 2013 137 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 23, 2013 140 Featured Case ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 11/25/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 23, 2013 141 Featured Case ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryFact Discovery due by 11/14/2013. The parties shall COMPLY with the courts scheduling order of September 17, 2013 which states that the parties shall FILE a Joint Status Report, on or before October 31, 2013, advising the court of settlement progress and proposing further proceedings on Count II in this matter; The parties shall COMPLETE fact discovery including production of documents, depositions, i nterrogatories and requests for admissions on Counts I and III of plaintiffs first amended complaint, on or before November 14, 2013; and The parties shall comply with all requirements of RCFC 26(a)(2) with respect to disclosure of expert testimony. On or before November 12, 2013, the parties shall exchange expert reports; on or before December 16, 2013, the parties shall exchange expert rebuttal reports; and, on or before February 14, 2014, expert discovery and/or depositions shall be complete d. On February 24, 2014, or two weeks after the completion of discovery, whichever occurs earlier, counsel are directed to FILE a Joint Status Report informing the court of the status of proceedings in this case and the extent to which the parties h ave determined whether any or all of the instant matter may be settled. The status report shall also set forth a proposed schedule for the exchanges required by Appendix A, 13 and the filings required by 14 through 17. In the event that any dispositive motions are to be filed, the status report shall state a proposed date for such motions. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 5, 2013 143 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report on Count II due by 12/16/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 12, 2013 145 Featured Case ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery. The parties shall comply with all requirements of RCFC 26(a)(2) with respect to disclosure of expert testimony. On or 12/12/2013, the parties shal l exchange expert reports; on or before 1/24/2014, the parties shall exchange expert rebuttal reports; and, on or before 3/14/2014, expert discovery and/or depositions shall be completed. Status Report due by 3/28/2014 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
December 2, 2013 147 Featured Case ORDER granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,Answer due by 12/6/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
December 11, 2013 149 Featured Case ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,Answer due by 12/11/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
December 18, 2013 152 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER on Count II. Status Report due by 2/18/2014 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
March 5, 2010 52 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 7/15/2010 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
November 18, 2010 62 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER:Dispositive Motion(s) due by 1/31/2011. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: WASHINGTON MUTUAL, INC. et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON MUTUAL, INC.
Represented By: Maria O'Toole Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK
Represented By: Ellis Larry Reemer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVINGS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Bruce Edward Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jennifer Dover Spriggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]