DESERET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION v. USA

Plaintiff: DESERET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00273
Filed: April 29, 2009
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 108 Featured Case ORDER closing proof. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 23, 2012 110 Featured Case ORDER directing defendant to respond to 109 Motion to Correct the trial transcript. Response due by 4/27/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 30, 2012 113 Featured Case POST TRIAL ORDER: On or before 5/7/2012, Heritage Reporting Company shall correct all errors in the trial transcript enumerated in Attachments A and B and provide the parties and court with corrected copies. Initial Post-Trial Briefs due 5/30/2012. Replies to initial post-trial birefs due 6/30/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 15, 2012 128 Featured Case ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time for post trial briefing. Post Trial Briefs due 7/13/2012. Post Trial Replies Briefs due 8/14/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 3, 2012 130 Featured Case ORDER granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Briefs due 7/18/2012. Post Trial Replies Briefs due 8/20/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 3, 2012 137 Featured Case ORDER Setting Closing argument: Closing Argument set for 11/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (EST) at National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 25, 2013 140 Featured Case ORDER directing defendant to file an updated spreadsheet that corresponds with the numbers in its post-trial briefing.Notice of Compliance due by 6/28/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 31, 2013 143 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION. Status Report due by 8/30/2013.Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
August 22, 2013 146 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION (redacted)re: 143 Sealed Opinion. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 16, 2013 149 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 2, 2013 152 Featured Case ORDER: The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff for tax years 2000, 2001, and 2002, previously-paid assess interest, and overpayment interest as provided in 26 § U.S.C. 6621(a)(1). The parties are directed to bear their own costs, including any attorneys' fees or expenses of litigation. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 14, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Lead Expert Report/Witness Report served by 8/27/2010; Deposition of Expert Witnesses shall take place between 8/30/2010 and 10/4/2010; Rebuttal Exper t Witnesses/Rebuttal Expert Reports shall be served by 10/29/2010; Parties shall take the depositions of all rebuttal expert witness reports shall be served by 11/19/2010; Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 2, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Lead Expert witness retrained in connection with Counts II and III of the Complaint shall be designated and served by 10/26/2010. Between 10/29/2010 and 12/3/2010, Depositions of lead experts retained in connection with Counts II and III of the complaint, shall be taken; Rebuttal expert witnesses shall be desginated and served by 12/28/2010; Depositions of all rebuttal expert witnesses shall be completed by 1/18/2011; All di scoverable documents related to a particular lead or rebuttal must be produced at least 14-days before the deposition of that expert; All fact and Expert discovery shall be completed by 1/18/2011. Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2011. No fruther enlargement of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 24, 2011 35 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/14/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 1, 2011 37 Featured Case ORDER: The parties shall file a copy of all lead expert and rebuttal expert reports served under Count I, including Ms. Flynns second expert report, with the court. Notice of Compliance due by 2/4/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 9, 2011 42 Featured Case RESCHEDULING 35 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/22/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST)via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 16, 2011 44 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/22/2011 at 2:00 PM(EST) in the United States Court of Federal Claims, National Courts Building, before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
April 11, 2011 45 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 11, 2011 46 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION/ORDER: granting defendant's 26 motion to designate expert report as a suppplemental rebuttal report; Plaintiff shall file an expense log and supporting documentation by 4/29/2011. Plaintiff shall depose its rebuttal report, if necessary. Joint Status Report due by 5/27/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 5, 2011 48 Featured Case ORDER directing defendant to respond to 47 plaintiff's notice - affidavit and itemized expense log in support of an award of expenses. On or before May 25, 2011, defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's expense log. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 7, 2011 52 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/17/2011 at 2:00 PM (EDT)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 20, 2011 54 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER: Meeting of Counsel and exchange exhibits by 10/3/2011. Exhibit List due by 11/2/2011. Witness List due by 11/2/2011. Appendix A Filings due by 11/2/2011. Opposing Exhibit List due by 12/2/2011. Opposing Witness List due by 12/2/2011. Opposing Appendix A Filings due by 12/2/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2012 at 10:00 AM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Trial set for 2/27/2012 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 22, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER. Order requiring defendant to pay plaintiff $10,351.50 for reasonable and necessary attorney's fees. Notice of Compliance due by 8/26/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
August 10, 2011 57 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 2, 2011 60 Featured Case ORDER Striking 59 MOTION in Limine re August 29, 2011 Supplement to Robin Flynn's Rebuttal Expert Report Served on January 10, 2011, as it does not comply with RCFC appendix E, 9(b) electronic filing requirements. On or before September 6, 2011, plaintiff shall refile the motion in limine. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 20, 2011 63 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 61 First MOTION in Limine re August 29, 2011 Supplemental to Robin Flynn's Rebuttal Expert Report Served on January 10, 2011. Response due 10/7/2011. Reply due 10/31/11. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 24, 2011 66 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/27/2011 at 2:00 (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 27, 2011 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 65 Motion to Amend Schedule. Exhibit List due by 11/18/2011. Witness List due by 11/18/2011. Appendix A Filings due by 11/18/2011. Opposing Exhibit List due by 1/6/2012. Opposing Witness List due by 1/6/2012. O pposing Appendix A Filings due by 1/6/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2012 at 10:00 AM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Trial set for 2/23/2012 at 2:00 PM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 19, 2012 81 Featured Case ORDER re: 80 Motion for Authorization. Plaintiff shall file its response by 1/26/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 27, 2012 84 Featured Case ORDER re: 61 First Motion in Limine. On or before February 14, 2012, plaintiff may depose Ms. Flynn regarding this new material, if it so desires. Defendant shall ensure the availability of its witness. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 30, 2012 85 Featured Case ORDER granting 80 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 30, 2012 86 Featured Case TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: On or before January 31, 2012, plaintiff shall file with the court copies of any communications and responses to discovery requests made to defendant regarding Mary Beth Garber. On or before January 3 1, 2012, defendant shall file the deposition of Ms. Garber. On or before February 16, 2012, the parties shall file a joint stipulation of undisputed facts. On or before February 16, 2012, the parties shall supply two pre-marked copies of the hard cop y exhibits they intend to offer in this case, and four CD-ROM sets containing pre-marked copies of electronic exhibits. Trial set for 2/23/2012 at 2:00 PM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 8, 2012 96 Featured Case ORDER: During trial, defendant admitted to errors in certain spreadsheets that were in the record. Defendant shall file its updated spreadsheets on CD-ROM by 3/12/2012. Plaintiff shall file its updated spreadsheets on CD-ROM by 3/19/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DESERET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESERET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: Eric C. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Karen Marie Groen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]