BEHRENS v. USA

Plaintiff: NINA K. BEHRENS
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00072
Filed: February 3, 2011
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2011 10 Featured Case PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order. Preliminary Status Conference set for 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM (EDT)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 10, 2011 11 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant shall file a status report by 9/3/2011. Response due by 9/9/2011. Fact Discovery completed by 2/10/2012. Joint Status Report due by 2/24/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 12, 2011 14 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/20/2011 at 2:30 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 26, 2011 15 Featured Case STATUS REPORT ORDER. Defendant shall file a status report on 10/18/2011 and 28 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 27, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay; granting 17 Motion for Referral to ADR. The Clerk shall assign the instant case to a settlement judge. Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2012, with subsequent reports filed every 91 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 17, 2011 5 Featured Case SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 23, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 6/3/2011. No further enlargements of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: BEHRENS v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NINA K. BEHRENS
Represented By: Jonathan Louis Gould
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Katy Marie Bartelma
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]