ESTES EXPRESS LINES v. USA

Plaintiff: ESTES EXPRESS LINES
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00597
Filed: September 16, 2011
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) : Telephonic Oral Argument set for 9/27/2012 at 2:00 PM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 15, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION granting 9 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). The Clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 9, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 15, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due by 1/6/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ESTES EXPRESS LINES v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTES EXPRESS LINES
Represented By: Robert D. Moseley, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]