JONES et al v. USA

Plaintiff: ROLAND SIMMONS, HAZELLA THORNHILL, ANNETTE E. JONES and NORMAN SAMPSON
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2011cv00681
Filed: October 14, 2011
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Civilian Pay, Back Pay
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due by 2/10/2012. No further enlargements of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 11, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 4/27/2012 at 2:00 PM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 30, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion(s) due by 5/14/2012. Discovery in this case is hereby STAYED until further order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 2, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to each file a memorandum (not to exceed 20 pages). Memorandum due by 1/30/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 2, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION re: 16 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 22, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Response due by 1/3/2014. Reply due by 1/20/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 6, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 30 Scheduling Order DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS: Response due by 2/3/2014. Reply due by 3/6/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 20, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION ( Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2014) granting, in part, and denying, in part 29 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 3, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 3, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying 2 motion to certify class action, subject to further order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLAND SIMMONS
Represented By: Ira M. Lechner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAZELLA THORNHILL
Represented By: Ira M. Lechner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE E. JONES
Represented By: Ira M. Lechner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN SAMPSON
Represented By: Ira M. Lechner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Daniel Gene Kim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]