MODERN IMAGING SOLUTIONS, INC. v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: MODERN IMAGING SOLUTIONS, INC.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00711
Filed: October 26, 2011
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6): Telephonic Oral Argument set for 7/24/2012 at 2:00 PM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 20, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER:Hearing on Motion 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6): Oral Argument set for 8/15/2012 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 16, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2012. Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 14, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Answer due 9/24/2012. Joint Preliminary Status Report due 10/15/2012. Exchange initial disclosures by 11/2/2012. Fact Discovery completed by 4/29/2013. Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 16, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 7/22/2013. Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 10, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, in part 29 Motion to Stay. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2013, and every 28 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 22, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MODERN IMAGING SOLUTIONS, INC. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Daniel B. Volk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MODERN IMAGING SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael Alan Gutenplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]