ARRIVALSTAR S.A. et al v. USA

Plaintiff: MELVINO TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED and ARRIVALSTAR S.A.
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00784
Filed: November 22, 2011
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due 3/23/2012. No further enlargement of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 14, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion to Notify Interested Party. The Clerk is directed to issue notices as specified in RCFC 14(b)(3) to defendant for service upon Motorola Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 18, 2012 18 Featured Case PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order Preliminary Status Conference set for 6/7/2012 at 2:00 PM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 8, 2012 19 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file a joint motion proposing an order governing the use of electronic discovery and a protective order due by 7/9/2012. The parties shall have a meeting of counsel to discuss issues relating to their preparation of claim charts due by 8/10/12. Plaintiffs shall serve on defendant its Claim Chart and its Proposed Claim Construction Statement due by 8/24/12. Defendant shall serve on plaintiffs its Response Chart and its Response to Proposed Claim Construction Statement due by 9/28/12. The parties shall meet and confer and thereafter file a "Joint Claim Construction Statement" due by 10/22/12.Opening Briefs due by 11/16/2012. Response due by 12/14/2012. Fact Discovery due by 3/29/2013. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 17, 2012 21 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 17, 2012 22 Featured Case PUBLISHED ORDER re: 20 E-discovery management. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 16, 2012 24 Featured Case REVISED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 16, 2012 25 Featured Case DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs shall serve on defendant its Claim Chart and its Proposed Claim Construction Statement" due by 10/9/2012. defendant shall serve on plaintiffs its Response Chart and its Response to Pr oposed Claim Construction Statement" due by 11/13/2012. The parties shall meet and confer and thereafter file a Joint Claim Construction Statement due by 12/7/2012. The parties shall file opening briefs on claim construction due by 1/8/2013. The parties shall file briefs in response to the opening claim construction briefs due by 2/5/2013. Fact Discovery completed by 5/21/2013. Expert Discovery completed by 8/20/2013. Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 20, 2012 26 Featured Case PUBLISHED ORDER: Amended E-Discovery Order re: 22 E-Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 4, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The parties shall file opening briefs no more than 60 pages in length. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 6, 2012 9 Featured Case SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ARRIVALSTAR S.A. et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVINO TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
Represented By: Francis J. Gorman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARRIVALSTAR S.A.
Represented By: Francis J. Gorman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]